EP2854398 - METHOD FOR ENCODING VIDEOS SHARING SAO PARAMETER ACCORDING TO COLOR COMPONENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2015/14] | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ENCODING VIDEOS SHARING SAO PARAMETER ACCORDING TO COLOR COMPONENT | ||
[2017/07] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.10.2018 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.11.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.06.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.04.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.02.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.01.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 19.02.2020 [2020/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR | [2017/50] |
Former [2015/14] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALSHINA, Elena 202-1305 Hwanggol Maeul 2-danji Apt. Yeongtong-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-744 / KR | 02 /
ALSHIN, Alexander 202-1305 Hwanggol Maeul 2-danji Apt. Yeongtong-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-744 / KR | [2015/14] | Representative(s) | Appleyard Lees IP LLP 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | [2017/50] |
Former [2015/14] | Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | Application number, filing date | 13804347.6 | 11.06.2013 | [2017/50] | WO2013KR05112 | Priority number, date | US201261657967P | 11.06.2012 Original published format: US 201261657967 P | [2015/14] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013187654 | Date: | 19.12.2013 | Language: | KO | [2013/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2854398 | Date: | 01.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2854398 | Date: | 13.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 19.12.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/117, H04N19/159, H04N19/176, H04N19/196, H04N19/13, H04N19/91, H04N19/174, H04N19/136, H04N19/186, H04N19/44, H04N19/86, H04N19/82, H04N19/157 | [2015/52] | CPC: |
H04N19/117 (EP,BR,KR,RU,US);
H04N19/13 (BR,KR,RU,US);
H04N19/136 (EP,US);
H04N19/157 (US);
H04N19/159 (US);
H04N19/174 (EP,US);
H04N19/176 (US);
H04N19/186 (EP,BR,KR,US);
H04N19/196 (US);
H04N19/44 (US);
H04N19/46 (EP,BR,US);
H04N19/50 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2015/14] | H04N7/26 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/14] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR CODIERUNG VON VIDEOS DURCH GEMEINSAME NUTZUNG VON SAO-PARAMETERN ENTSPRECHEND EINER FARBKOMPONENTE | [2017/07] | English: | METHOD FOR ENCODING VIDEOS SHARING SAO PARAMETER ACCORDING TO COLOR COMPONENT | [2017/07] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR CODER DES VIDÉOS PARTAGEANT UN PARAMÈTRE DE DÉCALAGE ADAPTATIF D'ÉCHANTILLON (SAO) EN FONCTION D'UN COMPOSANT DE COULEUR | [2017/07] |
Former [2015/14] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR CODIERUNG VON VIDEOS DURCH GEMEINSAME NUTZUNG VON SAO-PARAMETERN ENTSPRECHEND EINER FARBKOMPONENTE | ||
Former [2015/14] | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ENCODING VIDEOS SHARING SAO PARAMETER ACCORDING TO COLOR COMPONENT | ||
Former [2015/14] | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR CODER DES VIDÉOS PARTAGEANT UN PARAMÈTRE DE DÉCALAGE ADAPTATIF D'ÉCHANTILLON (SAO) EN FONCTION D'UN COMPOSANT DE COULEUR | Entry into regional phase | 24.12.2014 | Translation filed | 24.12.2014 | National basic fee paid | 24.12.2014 | Search fee paid | 24.12.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.12.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.12.2014 | Examination requested [2015/14] | 08.06.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.11.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.04.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 21.06.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.11.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 01.11.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.11.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP17199792.7 / EP3297283 | EP17199793.5 / EP3297284 | EP17199794.3 / EP3300364 | EP17199795.0 / EP3300365 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.07.2016 | Opposition(s) | 14.09.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | EE | 13.12.2017 | MC | 13.12.2017 | SM | 13.12.2017 | IS | 13.04.2018 | MT | 11.06.2018 | [2020/08] |
Former [2019/15] | EE | 13.12.2017 | |
MC | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | EE | 13.12.2017 | |
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | EE | 13.12.2017 | |
SM | 13.12.2017 | Cited in | International search | [A]KR100880640B ; | [A]KR20110017721 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | [A]KR101065998B ; | [A]JP2012005113 (MEDIATEK INC); | [A]KR101135293B |