blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2863423

EP2863423 - LID OPENING/CLOSING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.07.2020
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  09.08.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  27.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip08.07.2022Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 10.08.2022  [2022/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Murata Machinery, Ltd.
3 Minami Ochiai-cho
Kisshoin
Minami-ku
Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 601-8326 / JP
[2015/17]
Inventor(s)01 / KURATSU Noriyuki
c/o Murata Machinery Ltd.
Ise Plant
100 Takegahana-cho
Ise-shi Mie 516-0005 / JP
 [2015/17]
Representative(s)Zimmermann, Tankred Klaus, et al
Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler
Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB
Patentanwälte
Radlkoferstrasse 2
81373 München / DE
[2015/17]
Application number, filing date13804749.326.03.2013
[2019/37]
WO2013JP58840
Priority number, dateJP2012013483014.06.2012         Original published format: JP 2012134830
[2015/17]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2013187104
Date:19.12.2013
Language:JA
[2013/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2863423
Date:22.04.2015
Language:EN
[2015/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2863423
Date:11.09.2019
Language:EN
[2019/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP19.12.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.02.2016
ClassificationIPC:H01L21/677, B65D55/02, B65D85/86, H01L21/673
[2015/17]
CPC:
H01L21/67772 (EP,CN,US); H01L21/6773 (KR); H01L21/67769 (EP,CN,US);
B65D51/00 (US); H01L21/6732 (KR); H01L21/67359 (EP,US);
H01L21/67373 (EP,US); B65D2585/86 (EP,CN,US); H01L21/67363 (US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/17]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:DECKELÖFFNUNGS- UND SCHLIESSVORRICHTUNG[2015/17]
English:LID OPENING/CLOSING DEVICE[2015/17]
French:DISPOSITIF D'OUVERTURE/FERMETURE D'UN COUVERCLE[2015/17]
Entry into regional phase23.12.2014Translation filed 
23.12.2014National basic fee paid 
23.12.2014Search fee paid 
23.12.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
23.12.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.12.2014Examination requested  [2015/17]
06.07.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.03.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.07.2019Fee for grant paid
29.07.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
29.07.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  28.03.2019
Opposition(s)15.06.2020No opposition filed within time limit [2020/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
25.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
24.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
23.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
26.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU26.03.2013
AL11.09.2019
AT11.09.2019
CY11.09.2019
CZ11.09.2019
DK11.09.2019
EE11.09.2019
ES11.09.2019
FI11.09.2019
HR11.09.2019
IT11.09.2019
LT11.09.2019
LV11.09.2019
MC11.09.2019
MK11.09.2019
MT11.09.2019
NL11.09.2019
PL11.09.2019
RO11.09.2019
RS11.09.2019
SE11.09.2019
SI11.09.2019
SK11.09.2019
SM11.09.2019
TR11.09.2019
BG11.12.2019
NO11.12.2019
GR12.12.2019
IS12.01.2020
PT13.01.2020
GB26.03.2020
LU26.03.2020
BE31.03.2020
CH31.03.2020
FR31.03.2020
LI31.03.2020
[2022/32]
Former [2022/27]HU26.03.2013
AL11.09.2019
AT11.09.2019
CY11.09.2019
CZ11.09.2019
DK11.09.2019
EE11.09.2019
ES11.09.2019
FI11.09.2019
HR11.09.2019
IT11.09.2019
LT11.09.2019
LV11.09.2019
MC11.09.2019
MT11.09.2019
NL11.09.2019
PL11.09.2019
RO11.09.2019
RS11.09.2019
SE11.09.2019
SI11.09.2019
SK11.09.2019
SM11.09.2019
TR11.09.2019
BG11.12.2019
NO11.12.2019
GR12.12.2019
IS12.01.2020
PT13.01.2020
GB26.03.2020
LU26.03.2020
BE31.03.2020
CH31.03.2020
FR31.03.2020
LI31.03.2020
Former [2022/26]AL11.09.2019
AT11.09.2019
CZ11.09.2019
DK11.09.2019
EE11.09.2019
ES11.09.2019
FI11.09.2019
HR11.09.2019
IT11.09.2019
LT11.09.2019
LV11.09.2019
MC11.09.2019
NL11.09.2019
PL11.09.2019
RO11.09.2019
RS11.09.2019
SE11.09.2019
SI11.09.2019
SK11.09.2019
SM11.09.2019
TR11.09.2019
BG11.12.2019
NO11.12.2019
GR12.12.2019
IS12.01.2020
PT13.01.2020
GB26.03.2020
LU26.03.2020
BE31.03.2020
CH31.03.2020
FR31.03.2020
LI31.03.2020
Former [2021/22]AL11.09.2019
AT11.09.2019
CZ11.09.2019
DK11.09.2019
EE11.09.2019
ES11.09.2019
FI11.09.2019
HR11.09.2019
IT11.09.2019
LT11.09.2019
LV11.09.2019
MC11.09.2019
NL11.09.2019
PL11.09.2019
RO11.09.2019
RS11.09.2019
SE11.09.2019
SI11.09.2019
SK11.09.2019
SM11.09.2019
BG11.12.2019
NO11.12.2019
GR12.12.2019
IS12.01.2020
PT13.01.2020
GB26.03.2020
LU26.03.2020
BE31.03.2020
CH31.03.2020
FR31.03.2020
LI31.03.2020
Former [2021/12]AL11.09.2019
AT11.09.2019
CZ11.09.2019
DK11.09.2019
EE11.09.2019
ES11.09.2019
FI11.09.2019
HR11.09.2019
IT11.09.2019
LT11.09.2019
LV11.09.2019
MC11.09.2019
NL11.09.2019
PL11.09.2019
RO11.09.2019
RS11.09.2019
SE11.09.2019
SI11.09.2019
SK11.09.2019
SM11.09.2019
BG11.12.2019
NO11.12.2019
GR12.12.2019
IS12.01.2020
PT13.01.2020
LU26.03.2020
BE31.03.2020
CH31.03.2020
FR31.03.2020
LI31.03.2020
Former [2021/07]AL11.09.2019
AT11.09.2019
CZ11.09.2019
DK11.09.2019
EE11.09.2019
ES11.09.2019
FI11.09.2019
HR11.09.2019
IT11.09.2019
LT11.09.2019
LV11.09.2019
MC11.09.2019
NL11.09.2019
PL11.09.2019
RO11.09.2019
RS11.09.2019
SE11.09.2019
SI11.09.2019
SK11.09.2019
SM11.09.2019
BG11.12.2019
NO11.12.2019
GR12.12.2019
IS12.01.2020
PT13.01.2020
LU26.03.2020
CH31.03.2020
FR31.03.2020
LI31.03.2020
Former [2021/04]AL11.09.2019
AT11.09.2019
CZ11.09.2019
DK11.09.2019
EE11.09.2019
ES11.09.2019
FI11.09.2019
HR11.09.2019
IT11.09.2019
LT11.09.2019
LV11.09.2019
MC11.09.2019
NL11.09.2019
PL11.09.2019
RO11.09.2019
RS11.09.2019
SE11.09.2019
SI11.09.2019
SK11.09.2019
SM11.09.2019
BG11.12.2019
NO11.12.2019
GR12.12.2019
IS12.01.2020
PT13.01.2020
LU26.03.2020
Former [2020/49]AL11.09.2019
AT11.09.2019
CZ11.09.2019
DK11.09.2019
EE11.09.2019
ES11.09.2019
FI11.09.2019
HR11.09.2019
IT11.09.2019
LT11.09.2019
LV11.09.2019
MC11.09.2019
NL11.09.2019
PL11.09.2019
RO11.09.2019
RS11.09.2019
SE11.09.2019
SI11.09.2019
SK11.09.2019
SM11.09.2019
BG11.12.2019
NO11.12.2019
GR12.12.2019
IS12.01.2020
PT13.01.2020
Former [2020/37]AL11.09.2019
AT11.09.2019
CZ11.09.2019
DK11.09.2019
EE11.09.2019
ES11.09.2019
FI11.09.2019
HR11.09.2019
IT11.09.2019
LT11.09.2019
LV11.09.2019
NL11.09.2019
PL11.09.2019
RO11.09.2019
RS11.09.2019
SE11.09.2019
SI11.09.2019
SK11.09.2019
SM11.09.2019
BG11.12.2019
NO11.12.2019
GR12.12.2019
IS12.01.2020
PT13.01.2020
Former [2020/36]AL11.09.2019
AT11.09.2019
CZ11.09.2019
DK11.09.2019
EE11.09.2019
ES11.09.2019
FI11.09.2019
HR11.09.2019
IT11.09.2019
LT11.09.2019
LV11.09.2019
NL11.09.2019
PL11.09.2019
RO11.09.2019
RS11.09.2019
SE11.09.2019
SK11.09.2019
SM11.09.2019
BG11.12.2019
NO11.12.2019
GR12.12.2019
IS12.01.2020
PT13.01.2020
Former [2020/27]AL11.09.2019
AT11.09.2019
CZ11.09.2019
EE11.09.2019
ES11.09.2019
FI11.09.2019
HR11.09.2019
IT11.09.2019
LT11.09.2019
LV11.09.2019
NL11.09.2019
PL11.09.2019
RO11.09.2019
RS11.09.2019
SE11.09.2019
SK11.09.2019
SM11.09.2019
BG11.12.2019
NO11.12.2019
GR12.12.2019
PT13.01.2020
IS24.02.2020
Former [2020/25]AL11.09.2019
AT11.09.2019
CZ11.09.2019
EE11.09.2019
ES11.09.2019
FI11.09.2019
HR11.09.2019
IT11.09.2019
LT11.09.2019
LV11.09.2019
NL11.09.2019
PL11.09.2019
RO11.09.2019
RS11.09.2019
SE11.09.2019
SK11.09.2019
BG11.12.2019
NO11.12.2019
GR12.12.2019
PT13.01.2020
IS24.02.2020
Former [2020/24]AL11.09.2019
AT11.09.2019
EE11.09.2019
ES11.09.2019
FI11.09.2019
HR11.09.2019
IT11.09.2019
LT11.09.2019
LV11.09.2019
NL11.09.2019
PL11.09.2019
RO11.09.2019
RS11.09.2019
SE11.09.2019
BG11.12.2019
NO11.12.2019
GR12.12.2019
PT13.01.2020
IS24.02.2020
Former [2020/23]AL11.09.2019
AT11.09.2019
EE11.09.2019
ES11.09.2019
FI11.09.2019
HR11.09.2019
IT11.09.2019
LT11.09.2019
LV11.09.2019
NL11.09.2019
PL11.09.2019
RO11.09.2019
RS11.09.2019
SE11.09.2019
BG11.12.2019
NO11.12.2019
GR12.12.2019
PT13.01.2020
Former [2020/22]AL11.09.2019
EE11.09.2019
ES11.09.2019
FI11.09.2019
HR11.09.2019
LT11.09.2019
LV11.09.2019
NL11.09.2019
RS11.09.2019
SE11.09.2019
BG11.12.2019
NO11.12.2019
GR12.12.2019
PT13.01.2020
Former [2020/20]AL11.09.2019
ES11.09.2019
FI11.09.2019
HR11.09.2019
LT11.09.2019
LV11.09.2019
NL11.09.2019
RS11.09.2019
SE11.09.2019
BG11.12.2019
NO11.12.2019
GR12.12.2019
Former [2020/15]AL11.09.2019
ES11.09.2019
FI11.09.2019
HR11.09.2019
LT11.09.2019
LV11.09.2019
RS11.09.2019
SE11.09.2019
BG11.12.2019
NO11.12.2019
GR12.12.2019
Former [2020/11]ES11.09.2019
FI11.09.2019
HR11.09.2019
LT11.09.2019
LV11.09.2019
RS11.09.2019
SE11.09.2019
BG11.12.2019
NO11.12.2019
GR12.12.2019
Former [2020/10]FI11.09.2019
LT11.09.2019
SE11.09.2019
BG11.12.2019
NO11.12.2019
Former [2020/09]FI11.09.2019
LT11.09.2019
NO11.12.2019
Former [2020/08]LT11.09.2019
NO11.12.2019
Documents cited:Search[XI]US4746256  (BOYLE EDWARD F [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5 * column 5, line 54 - column 6, line 64; figures 6-10 *[I] 3
International search[Y]JPH0746694B  (ASSIST TECHNOLOGIES, INC.);
 [Y]JP3635061B  (TOKYO ELECTRON LTD.);
 [A]JP3672929B  (EMPAK, INC.);
 [Y]WO2010131414  (MURATA MACHINERY LTD [JP], et al)
by applicantJP3180600B
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.