EP2861533 - COMPOSITES OF MIXED METAL OXIDES FOR OXYGEN STORAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.12.2020 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.01.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.05.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Corporation 100 Park Avenue Florham Park, NJ 07932 / US | [2020/07] |
Former [2015/17] | For all designated states BASF Corporation 100 Park Avenue Florham Park, NJ 07932 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Xiaoming 18 Clark Ct Basking Ridge, NJ 07920 / US | 02 /
WASSERMANN, Knut 58 Sayre Drive Princeton, NJ 08540 / US | 03 /
ZHENG, Xiaolai 44 Cubberly Rd. Princeton Junction, NJ 08550 / US | [2016/33] |
Former [2015/35] | 01 /
WANG, Xiaoming 18 Clark Ct Basking Ridge, NJ 07920 / US | ||
02 /
WASSERMANN, Knut 58 Sayre Drive Princeton, NJ 08540 / US | |||
Former [2015/17] | 01 /
WANG, Xiaoming 1B Forest Drive Springfield, NJ 07081 / US | ||
02 /
WASSERMANN, Knut 58 Sayre Drive Princeton, NJ 08540 / US | Representative(s) | BASF IP Association BASF SE G-FLP-C006 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2020/07] |
Former [2015/17] | Zumstein, Angela Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13805062.0 | 13.06.2013 | [2020/07] | WO2013US45651 | Priority number, date | US201261660315P | 15.06.2012 Original published format: US 201261660315 P | [2015/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013188664 | Date: | 19.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2861533 | Date: | 22.04.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.12.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2861533 | Date: | 12.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 19.12.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.01.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C01F17/00, C01F7/02, B01J23/44 | [2015/17] | CPC: |
B01J23/63 (EP,KR,US);
B01D53/945 (EP,US);
B01J35/615 (EP,KR,US);
B01J35/635 (EP,US);
B01J35/638 (EP,KR,US);
B01J37/0215 (EP,KR,US);
B01J37/031 (EP,KR,US);
B01J37/10 (EP,KR,US);
C01F17/00 (KR);
C01F7/02 (KR);
C01G25/006 (EP);
B01D2255/2065 (EP,US);
B01D2255/20715 (EP,US);
B01D2255/2092 (EP,US);
B01D2255/908 (EP,US);
B01J2523/00 (EP,KR,US);
C01P2002/50 (EP);
C01P2002/72 (EP);
C01P2004/03 (EP);
C01P2006/12 (EP);
C01P2006/13 (EP);
| C-Set: |
B01J2523/00, B01J2523/31, B01J2523/36, B01J2523/3706, B01J2523/3712, B01J2523/48 (US,EP);
B01J2523/00, B01J2523/31, B01J2523/3706, B01J2523/3712, B01J2523/3718, B01J2523/48 (EP,US);
B01J2523/00, B01J2523/31, B01J2523/3706, B01J2523/3712, B01J2523/3725, B01J2523/48 (US,EP);
B01J2523/00, B01J2523/36, B01J2523/3706, B01J2523/3712, B01J2523/48 (EP,US);
B01J2523/00, B01J2523/3706, B01J2523/3712, B01J2523/3718, B01J2523/48 (EP,US);
B01J2523/00, B01J2523/3706, B01J2523/3712, B01J2523/3725, B01J2523/48 (US,EP) (-) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBUNDSTOFFE AUS GEMISCHTEN METALLOXIDEN ZUR SAUERSTOFFLAGERUNG | [2015/17] | English: | COMPOSITES OF MIXED METAL OXIDES FOR OXYGEN STORAGE | [2015/17] | French: | COMPOSITES D'OXYDES MÉTALLIQUES MIXTES POUR LE STOCKAGE D'OXYGÈNE | [2015/17] | Entry into regional phase | 15.01.2015 | National basic fee paid | 15.01.2015 | Search fee paid | 15.01.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.01.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/17] | 12.08.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.05.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 26.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.09.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 17.09.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.09.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.03.2018 | Opposition(s) | 13.11.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2019 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   02.01.2020 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.06.2013 | AL | 12.02.2020 | CY | 12.02.2020 | CZ | 12.02.2020 | DK | 12.02.2020 | EE | 12.02.2020 | ES | 12.02.2020 | FI | 12.02.2020 | HR | 12.02.2020 | LT | 12.02.2020 | LV | 12.02.2020 | MC | 12.02.2020 | MK | 12.02.2020 | MT | 12.02.2020 | RO | 12.02.2020 | RS | 12.02.2020 | SE | 12.02.2020 | SI | 12.02.2020 | SK | 12.02.2020 | SM | 12.02.2020 | TR | 12.02.2020 | BG | 12.05.2020 | NO | 12.05.2020 | GR | 13.05.2020 | IS | 12.06.2020 | IE | 13.06.2020 | LU | 13.06.2020 | BE | 30.06.2020 | CH | 30.06.2020 | LI | 30.06.2020 | PT | 05.07.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 13.06.2013 | |
AL | 12.02.2020 | ||
CY | 12.02.2020 | ||
CZ | 12.02.2020 | ||
DK | 12.02.2020 | ||
EE | 12.02.2020 | ||
ES | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
MC | 12.02.2020 | ||
MT | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
SI | 12.02.2020 | ||
SK | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
TR | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
IE | 13.06.2020 | ||
LU | 13.06.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 13.06.2013 | |
CY | 12.02.2020 | ||
CZ | 12.02.2020 | ||
DK | 12.02.2020 | ||
EE | 12.02.2020 | ||
ES | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
MC | 12.02.2020 | ||
MT | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
SI | 12.02.2020 | ||
SK | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
TR | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
IE | 13.06.2020 | ||
LU | 13.06.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
Former [2022/26] | CZ | 12.02.2020 | |
DK | 12.02.2020 | ||
EE | 12.02.2020 | ||
ES | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
MC | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
SI | 12.02.2020 | ||
SK | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
TR | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
IE | 13.06.2020 | ||
LU | 13.06.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | CZ | 12.02.2020 | |
DK | 12.02.2020 | ||
EE | 12.02.2020 | ||
ES | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
MC | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
SI | 12.02.2020 | ||
SK | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
IE | 13.06.2020 | ||
LU | 13.06.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | CZ | 12.02.2020 | |
DK | 12.02.2020 | ||
EE | 12.02.2020 | ||
ES | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
MC | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
SI | 12.02.2020 | ||
SK | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
IE | 13.06.2020 | ||
LU | 13.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | CZ | 12.02.2020 | |
DK | 12.02.2020 | ||
EE | 12.02.2020 | ||
ES | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
MC | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
SI | 12.02.2020 | ||
SK | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
LU | 13.06.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/12] | CZ | 12.02.2020 | |
DK | 12.02.2020 | ||
EE | 12.02.2020 | ||
ES | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
MC | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
SI | 12.02.2020 | ||
SK | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 12.02.2020 | |
DK | 12.02.2020 | ||
EE | 12.02.2020 | ||
ES | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
SK | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 12.02.2020 | |
DK | 12.02.2020 | ||
ES | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
SK | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | DK | 12.02.2020 | |
ES | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | DK | 12.02.2020 | |
ES | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | FI | 12.02.2020 | |
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 12.02.2020 | |
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 12.02.2020 | |
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 12.02.2020 | |
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 12.02.2020 | |
NO | 12.05.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JP2001106527 (CATALER CORP) [X] 1,3,6,7,11-15 * the whole document * * abstract * * paragraphs [0007] - [0008] - [0013] - [0025] - [0028] , [0030] - [0034] - [0050] - [0052] - [0056] - [0058] * * claim - * [I] 2,4,5,8-10; | [XI]US6831036 (YAMAZAKI MASATOSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,3,6,7,11-15 * the whole document * * column 2, lines 6-59 * * column 3, lines 22-24 * [I] 2,4,5,8-10; | [XI]CN101954277 (NINGBO KESEN EXHAUST GAS CLEANER MFG CO LTD) [X] 1,3,6,7,10-15 * the whole document * * abstract * * paragraphs [0003] , [0004] , [0012] , [0021] , [0045] * * claim - * [I] 2,4,5,8,9; | [XP]WO2013062842 (JOHNSON MATTHEY PLC [GB], et al) [XP] 1-3,6-8,11-15 * the whole document * * page 4, lines 3-5 * * page 5, lines 16-17 ** claims 1,13,14 * | International search | [A]US5883037 (CHOPIN THIERRY [FR], et al); | [X]US2006052243 (MUHAMMED MAMOUN [SE], et al); | [A] - ZHANG, XIAOYU ET AL., "Ce02-Zr02-La203-AI203 composite oxide and its supported palladium catalyst for the treatment of exhaust of natural gas engined vehicles", JOURNAL OF NATURAL GAS CHEMISTRY, (2009), vol. 18, no. 2, pages 139 - 144, XP026283147 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1003-9953(08)60092-4 | [A] - DI MONTE, ROBERTA ET AL., "Pd/Ce0.6Zr0.402/A1203 as advanced materials for three-way catalysts: Part 1. Catalyst characterisation, thermal stability and catalytic activity in the reduction of NO by CO", APPLIED CATALYSIS B: ENVIRMNMENTAL, (2000), vol. 24, pages 157 - 167, XP055182523 | Examination | JP2011224428 | EP2545990 | by applicant | US4171288 | US5883037 | JP2001106527 | US6831036 | US2006052243 | CN101954277 | JP2011224428 | EP2545990 | WO2013062842 | - SUGIURA et al., Bull. Chem. Soc. Jpn., (20050000), vol. 78, page 752 | - WANG et al., J. Phys. Chem. C, (20080000), vol. 112, page 5113 | - ZHANG et al., Journal of Natural Chemistry, (20090600), vol. 18, no. 2, pages 139 - 144 | - DI MONTE et al., Applied Catalysis B: Environmental, (20000207), vol. 24, no. 3-4, pages 157 - 167 |