EP2861081 - METHOD OF TREATING A DIVIDED CHEESE PRODUCT FOR ANTICAKING AND COMPOSITIONS THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.09.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2019 | Change - classification | published on 13.02.2019 [2019/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Allied Blending & Ingredients Inc. 1005 N. Warson Road Suite 232 St. Louis, MO 63132 / US | [2015/36] |
Former [2015/17] | For all designated states Allied Blending & Ingredients Inc. 1005 N. Warson Road Suite 232 St. Louis, MO 63132 / US | ||
For all designated states Fannon, John E. 1005 N. Warson Road Suite 232 St. Louis, MO 63132 / US | |||
For all designated states Anderson, Kent R. 1005 N. Warson Road Suite 232 St. Louis, MO 63132 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FANNON, John, E. 1005 N. Warson Road Suite 232 St. Louis, MO 63132 / US | 02 /
ANDERSON, Kent, R. 1005 N. Warson Road Suite 232 St. Louis, MO 63132 / US | [2015/17] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/17] | Briscoe, Paul Brian Rouse IP Limited 11th Floor, Exchange Tower 1 Harbour Exchange Square London E14 9GE / GB | Application number, filing date | 13805175.0 | 14.06.2013 | WO2013US45810 | Priority number, date | US201261659809P | 14.06.2012 Original published format: US 201261659809 P | US201261730812P | 28.11.2012 Original published format: US 201261730812 P | [2015/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013188735 | Date: | 19.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2861081 | Date: | 22.04.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.12.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 19.12.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.01.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A23C19/14, A23C19/09, A23P10/43 | [2016/09] | CPC: |
A23C19/14 (EP,US);
A23C2250/15 (EP,US);
A23V2002/00 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A23V2002/00, A23V2200/042, A23V2200/208, A23V2250/1578, A23V2250/18, A23V2250/5118 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/17] | A23C19/14, A23C19/09 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/17] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG EINES GETEILTEN KÄSEPRODUKTES ZUR VERMEIDUNG VON KLUMPENBILDUNG UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN DAVON | [2015/17] | English: | METHOD OF TREATING A DIVIDED CHEESE PRODUCT FOR ANTICAKING AND COMPOSITIONS THEREOF | [2015/17] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT ANTIAGGLOMÉRANT D'UN PRODUIT DE FROMAGE FRAGMENTÉ ET COMPOSITIONS ASSOCIÉES | [2015/17] | Entry into regional phase | 03.12.2014 | National basic fee paid | 03.12.2014 | Search fee paid | 03.12.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.12.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.12.2014 | Examination requested [2015/17] | 26.08.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.01.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.05.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/43] | 20.06.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/43] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.01.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2018 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5626893 (REDDY MALIREDDY S [US]) [Y] 1-10,15-17 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2006210694 (CHAPPELL RULON A [US], et al) [Y] 1-10,15-17* the whole document *; | [XYI]US2010330369 (VEELAERT SARAH [BE]) [X] 1,4,5,7,8,15,16 * claims 8-13 * * paragraphs [0014] - [0019] - [0033] , [0041] , [0044] * * examples 1-4 * [Y] 1-10,15-17 [I] 1-10,15-17; | [X]US2011212149 (LOBEE HENRICUS WILHELMUS JOZEF [NL], et al) [X] 1,4,5,7,8 * claims 11-19 * * paragraphs [0023] , [0041] , [0049] * * examples 1-7 * | International search | [X]US5626893 (REDDY MALIREDDY S [US]); | [A]US6426102 (ISOM LOWELL [US], et al); | [A]US2003021873 (WILLITS RICHARD E [US], et al); | [Y]US2006210694 (CHAPPELL RULON A [US], et al); | [A]US2011229622 (MERRILL RICHARD K [US], et al); | [A]US2011244105 (GALER CHAD D [US], et al) |