EP2877707 - NOZZLE WITH EXTENDED TAB [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.04.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.04.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.05.2017 [2017/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2015/23] | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RENDON, Jacob, Romeo 1 Neumann Way Cincinnati, OH 45215 / US | [2015/23] | Representative(s) | Williams, Andrew Richard GE International Inc. GPO-Europe The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/23] | Williams, Andrew Richard GPO Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 13805972.0 | 22.05.2013 | WO2013US42259 | Priority number, date | US201213480712 | 25.05.2012 Original published format: US201213480712 | [2015/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2014031196 | Date: | 27.02.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/09] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2877707 | Date: | 03.06.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.02.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.05.2014 | Classification | IPC: | F01D11/00, F01D11/12 | [2015/23] | CPC: |
F01D11/001 (EP,US);
F01D11/005 (EP,US);
F01D11/127 (EP,US);
F05D2240/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/23] | Title | German: | DÜSE MIT ERWEITERTER LASCHE | [2015/23] | English: | NOZZLE WITH EXTENDED TAB | [2015/23] | French: | BUSE AVEC PATTE ÉTENDUE | [2015/23] | Entry into regional phase | 05.01.2015 | National basic fee paid | 05.01.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.01.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.12.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/23] | 01.12.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/19] | 04.01.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2016 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4295785 (LARDELLIER ALAIN M J) [Y] 8-12 * column 1, line 30 - line 50; figures 1-3 * * column 2, line 4 - line 39 *; | [XYI]US5154577 (KELLOCK IAIN R [US], et al) [X] 1-6,13,15-20 * abstract * * column 3, line 4 - column 4, line 66 * [Y] 8-12,14 [I] 7; | [Y]EP2348194 (ROLLS ROYCE PLC [GB]) [Y] 14* page 3, column 4, paragraph 22; figures 4-6 * |