EP2864077 - LASER DRILLING METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR PRODUCING SHAPED HOLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.08.2024 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.05.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.09.2024 [2024/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IPG Photonics Corporation 50 Old Webster Road Oxford, Massachusetts 01540 / US | [2015/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHINER, William c/o IPG Photonics Corporation 50 Old Webster Road Oxford, MA 01540 / US | 02 /
MAYNARD, Steve c/o IPG Photonics Corporation 50 Old Webster Road Oxford, MA 01540 / US | [2015/18] | Representative(s) | Kobiako von Gamm, Iouri Kobiako-von Gamm Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei PartG mbB Bruckmannstraße 13 80638 München / DE | [2023/42] |
Former [2015/18] | Kobiako von Gamm, Iouri Bettinger Scheffelt Kobiako von Gamm Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnergesellschaft mbB Bavariaring 14 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13806806.9 | 24.06.2013 | [2023/42] | WO2013US47319 | Priority number, date | US201261663267P | 22.06.2012 Original published format: US 201261663267 P | [2015/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013192612 | Date: | 27.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2864077 | Date: | 29.04.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.12.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2864077 | Date: | 18.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 27.12.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.02.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B23K26/046, B23K26/06, B23K26/0622, B23K26/382, B23K101/00 | [2023/17] | CPC: |
B23K26/046 (EP,CN,KR);
B23K26/38 (KR);
B23K26/0622 (EP,KR);
B23K26/0648 (EP,CN,KR);
B23K26/389 (EP,CN,KR);
B23K2101/001 (EP,CN)
|
Former IPC [2015/18] | B23K26/38, B23K26/073, B23K26/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LASERBOHRVERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON PROFILIERTEN LÖCHERN | [2015/18] | English: | LASER DRILLING METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR PRODUCING SHAPED HOLES | [2015/18] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PERÇAGE AU LASER ET SYSTÈME DE PRODUCTION DE TROUS PROFILÉS | [2015/18] | Entry into regional phase | 16.12.2014 | National basic fee paid | 16.12.2014 | Search fee paid | 16.12.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.12.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.12.2014 | Examination requested [2015/18] | 05.09.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.09.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.03.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.08.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 08.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.09.2018 | Opposition(s) | 19.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.10.2023 | CZ | 18.10.2023 | DK | 18.10.2023 | EE | 18.10.2023 | ES | 18.10.2023 | HR | 18.10.2023 | IT | 18.10.2023 | LT | 18.10.2023 | LV | 18.10.2023 | NL | 18.10.2023 | PL | 18.10.2023 | RO | 18.10.2023 | RS | 18.10.2023 | SE | 18.10.2023 | SK | 18.10.2023 | SM | 18.10.2023 | BG | 18.01.2024 | NO | 18.01.2024 | GR | 19.01.2024 | IS | 18.02.2024 | PT | 19.02.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 18.10.2023 | |
CZ | 18.10.2023 | ||
DK | 18.10.2023 | ||
EE | 18.10.2023 | ||
ES | 18.10.2023 | ||
HR | 18.10.2023 | ||
LT | 18.10.2023 | ||
LV | 18.10.2023 | ||
NL | 18.10.2023 | ||
PL | 18.10.2023 | ||
RO | 18.10.2023 | ||
RS | 18.10.2023 | ||
SE | 18.10.2023 | ||
SM | 18.10.2023 | ||
BG | 18.01.2024 | ||
NO | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
PT | 19.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | AT | 18.10.2023 | |
DK | 18.10.2023 | ||
EE | 18.10.2023 | ||
ES | 18.10.2023 | ||
HR | 18.10.2023 | ||
LT | 18.10.2023 | ||
LV | 18.10.2023 | ||
NL | 18.10.2023 | ||
PL | 18.10.2023 | ||
RS | 18.10.2023 | ||
SE | 18.10.2023 | ||
SM | 18.10.2023 | ||
BG | 18.01.2024 | ||
NO | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
PT | 19.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 18.10.2023 | |
DK | 18.10.2023 | ||
ES | 18.10.2023 | ||
HR | 18.10.2023 | ||
LT | 18.10.2023 | ||
LV | 18.10.2023 | ||
NL | 18.10.2023 | ||
PL | 18.10.2023 | ||
RS | 18.10.2023 | ||
SE | 18.10.2023 | ||
SM | 18.10.2023 | ||
BG | 18.01.2024 | ||
NO | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
PT | 19.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 18.10.2023 | |
ES | 18.10.2023 | ||
HR | 18.10.2023 | ||
LT | 18.10.2023 | ||
LV | 18.10.2023 | ||
NL | 18.10.2023 | ||
PL | 18.10.2023 | ||
RS | 18.10.2023 | ||
SE | 18.10.2023 | ||
BG | 18.01.2024 | ||
NO | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
PT | 19.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 18.10.2023 | |
ES | 18.10.2023 | ||
HR | 18.10.2023 | ||
LT | 18.10.2023 | ||
NL | 18.10.2023 | ||
PL | 18.10.2023 | ||
RS | 18.10.2023 | ||
SE | 18.10.2023 | ||
BG | 18.01.2024 | ||
NO | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
PT | 19.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AT | 18.10.2023 | |
ES | 18.10.2023 | ||
HR | 18.10.2023 | ||
LT | 18.10.2023 | ||
NL | 18.10.2023 | ||
RS | 18.10.2023 | ||
SE | 18.10.2023 | ||
BG | 18.01.2024 | ||
NO | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
PT | 19.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 18.10.2023 | |
ES | 18.10.2023 | ||
LT | 18.10.2023 | ||
NL | 18.10.2023 | ||
BG | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
PT | 19.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 18.10.2023 | |
NL | 18.10.2023 | ||
BG | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | NL | 18.10.2023 | |
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/17] | NL | 18.10.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5739502 (ANDERSON THOMAS EDWIN [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * column 2, line 62 - column 4, line 5; figures 5,12,14,15 *; | [A]DE69424606T (FUJIKURA LTD [JP]) [A] 1,11 * figure 1B *; | [A]US2003127438 (RICHTER KARL-HERMANN [DE], et al) [A] 1,9,11-13* paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0032]; claims 6-8 *; | [A]US2010282721 (BUNKER RONALD SCOTT [US], et al) [A] 1,11 * paragraph [0026] * | International search | [A]KR860000128B (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]); | [A]US5593606 (OWEN MARK D [US], et al); | [A]JPH11197871 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [A]JPH11347766 (SUMITOMO HEAVY INDUSTRIES); | [A]KR20100136473 (ELECTRO SCIENT IND INC [US]) | Examination | WO2012067228 | by applicant | WO2012067228 |