EP2861233 - TRANSDERMAL HORMONE REPLACEMENT THERAPIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.09.2020 Database last updated on 05.05.2025 | ||
Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] |
Applicant(s) | For all designated states TherapeuticsMD, Inc. 951 Yamato Road, Suite 220 Boca Raton, FL 33431 / US | ||
[2019/44] | |||
Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERNICK, Brian A. 17601 Middlebrook Way Boca Raton, Florida 33496 / US | ||
02 /
AMADIO, Julia M. 1110 Walnut Terrace Boca Raton, FL 33486 / US | |||
03 /
PERSICANER, Peter H.R. 17070 Royal Cove Way Boca Raton, Florida 33496 / US | |||
04 /
CACACE, Janice Louise 8442 6th St N St Petersburg, FL 33702 / US | |||
05 /
IRANI, Neda 1703 Silverleaf Oak Court Palm Beach Gardens, Florida 33410 / US | |||
[2015/22] | |||
Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | ||
[N/P] | |||
Application number, filing date | 13807463.8 | 18.06.2013 | |
[2019/45] | |||
WO2013US46444 | |||
Priority number, date | US201261661302P | 18.06.2012 Original published format: US 201261661302 P | |
US201261662265P | 20.06.2012 Original published format: US 201261662265 P | ||
US201213684002 | 21.11.2012 Original published format: US201213684002 | ||
WO2013US23309 | 25.01.2013 Original published format: PCT/US2013/023309 | ||
US201313843362 | 15.03.2013 Original published format: US201313843362 | ||
[2015/17] | |||
Filing language | EN | ||
Procedural language | EN | ||
Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | |
No.: | WO2013192250 | ||
Date: | 27.12.2013 | ||
Language: | EN | ||
[2013/52] | |||
Type: | A1 Application with search report | ||
No.: | EP2861233 | ||
Date: | 22.04.2015 | ||
Language: | EN | ||
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.12.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | |||
[2015/17] | |||
Type: | B1 Patent specification | ||
No.: | EP2861233 | ||
Date: | 06.11.2019 | ||
Language: | EN | ||
[2019/45] | |||
Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.12.2013 |
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.09.2015 | |
Classification | IPC: | A61K9/70, A61K31/57, A61K31/565, A61K47/14, A61K45/06 | [2015/41] |
CPC: |
A61K47/14 (EP,US);
A61K31/565 (EP,US);
A61K31/566 (US);
| ||
C-Set: |
A61K31/565, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/57, A61K2300/00 (US,EP) | ||
Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/17] | ||
Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | |
ME | Not yet paid | ||
Title | German: | TRANSDERMALE HORMONERSATZTHERAPIEN | [2015/17] |
English: | TRANSDERMAL HORMONE REPLACEMENT THERAPIES | [2015/17] | |
French: | TRAITEMENT TRANSDERMIQUE DE SUBSTITUTION HORMONALE | [2015/17] | |
Entry into regional phase | 14.10.2014 | National basic fee paid | |
14.10.2014 | Search fee paid | ||
14.10.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | ||
14.10.2014 | Examination fee paid | ||
Examination procedure | 14.10.2014 | Examination requested [2015/17] | |
04.04.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | ||
15.05.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | ||
20.09.2019 | Fee for grant paid | ||
20.09.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | ||
20.09.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | ||
Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.05.2019 | ||
Opposition(s) | 07.08.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/42] | |
Fees paid | Renewal fee | ||
30.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | ||
31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | ||
28.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | ||
25.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | ||
28.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | ||
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | |||
Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.06.2013 | |
AL | 06.11.2019 | ||
AT | 06.11.2019 | ||
CY | 06.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2019 | ||
DK | 06.11.2019 | ||
EE | 06.11.2019 | ||
ES | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
IT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
MC | 06.11.2019 | ||
MK | 06.11.2019 | ||
MT | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RO | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
SI | 06.11.2019 | ||
SK | 06.11.2019 | ||
SM | 06.11.2019 | ||
TR | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
IE | 18.06.2020 | ||
LU | 18.06.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
[2022/32] | |||
Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0279977 (ALZA CORP [US]) [X] 1,19 * example -; table I *; | |
[Y]WO9011064 (CYGNUS RESEARCH CORP [US]) [Y] 1-24 * page 13, paragraphs 1-2 *; | |||
[Y]WO9743989 (DIVERSIFIED PHARMACEUTICALS IN [US], et al) [Y] 1-24* page 38, line 20 - page 42, line 22 *; | |||
[Y]WO0050007 (LIPOCINE INC [US]) [Y] 1-24 * page 65; example 66 *; | |||
[X]WO0187276 (SAMYANG CORP [KR], et al) [X] 1,19 * examples 2,3 *; | |||
[Y]US2003077297 (CHEN FENG-JING [US], et al) [Y] 1-24 * examples 38-47 * | |||
International search | [A]US4384096 (SONNABEND LAWRENCE F); | ||
[A]US6294192 (PATEL MAHESH V [US], et al); | |||
[A]US2005042268 (ASCHKENASY CHAIM [IL], et al); | |||
[A]US2006134188 (PODHAISKY HANS-PETER [DE], et al); | |||
[X]US2007264349 (LEE ROBERT [US], et al) |