Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9492448 | Global Dossier | 15.11.2016 | B2 | US2015322081 | 12.11.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201314409793 | 20.06.2013 | US201261662268 | 20.06.2012 | WO2013US46740 | 20.06.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11945825 | Global Dossier | 02.04.2024 | B2 | US2022017537 | 20.01.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201261662268 | 20.06.2012 | US201615341961 | 02.11.2016 | US201414409793 | 19.12.2014 | US202016900489 | 12.06.2020 | WO2013US46740 | 20.06.2013 | US201916387268 | 17.04.2019 | US202117365528 | 01.07.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11066415 | Global Dossier | 20.07.2021 | B2 | US2020369683 | 26.11.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201615341961 | 02.11.2016 | US201261662268 | 20.06.2012 | US201414409793 | 19.12.2014 | US202016900489 | 12.06.2020 | WO2013US46740 | 20.06.2013 | US201916387268 | 17.04.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10683306 | Global Dossier | 16.06.2020 | B2 | US2019330232 | 31.10.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201615341961 | 02.11.2016 | US201261662268 | 20.06.2012 | US201414409793 | 19.12.2014 | WO2013US46740 | 20.06.2013 | US201916387268 | 17.04.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10479800 | Global Dossier | 19.11.2019 | B2 | US2017240563 | 24.08.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201615341961 | 02.11.2016 | US201261662268 | 20.06.2012 | US201414409793 | 19.12.2014 | WO2013US46740 | 20.06.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2863910 | Global Dossier | 11.03.2020 | B1 | EP2863910 | 20.07.2016 | A4 | EP2863910 | 29.04.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201261662268 | 20.06.2012 | WO2013US46740 | 20.06.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2784223T | 23.09.2020 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US201261662268 | 20.06.2012 | WO2013US46740 | 20.06.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2013192388 | Global Dossier | 27.12.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201261662268 | 20.06.2012 |