EP2768188 - PCIE-BASED DATA TRANSMISSION SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 18.11.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.11.2016 | Withdrawal of application | published on 21.12.2016 [2016/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2014/34] | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YI, Chang Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
WANG, Jing Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
SU, Dexian Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2014/34] | Representative(s) | Kreuz, Georg Maria Huawei Technologies Duesseldorf GmbH Riesstraße 25 80992 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/34] | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13807883.7 | 07.08.2013 | WO2013CN80943 | Priority number, date | CN20121531995 | 11.12.2012 Original published format: CN201210531995 | [2014/34] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014089980 | Date: | 19.06.2014 | Language: | ZH | [2014/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2768188 | Date: | 20.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 19.06.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.12.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/40 | [2015/03] | CPC: |
G06F13/4022 (EP,US);
G06F2213/0026 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/34] | H04L12/931 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/34] | Title | German: | PCIE-BASIERTES DATENÜBERTRAGUNGSSYSTEM UND -VERFAHREN | [2014/34] | English: | PCIE-BASED DATA TRANSMISSION SYSTEM AND METHOD | [2014/34] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRANSMISSION DE DONNÉES BASÉE SUR PCIE | [2014/34] | Entry into regional phase | 02.01.2014 | Translation filed | 02.01.2014 | National basic fee paid | 02.01.2014 | Search fee paid | 02.01.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.01.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.01.2014 | Examination requested [2014/34] | 12.08.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.11.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.04.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.2016 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2016/51] | 10.11.2016 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 13.12.2016 | 13.12.2016 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.11.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - Kwok Kong, "USING PCI EXPRESS AS THE PRIMARY SYSTEM INTERCONNECT IN MULTIROOT COMPUTE, STORAGE, COMMUNICATIONS AND EMBEDDED SYSTEMS", (20080828), URL: http://www.idt.com/document/whp/idt-pcie-multi-root-white-paper, (20141204), XP055156731 [X] 1-18 * the whole document * | [X] - "IDT(TM) 89HPES16NT2 PCI Express Switch User Manual", (20080415), URL: http://www.idt.com/document/man/89pes16nt2-preliminary-device-user-manual, (20141204), XP055156732 [X] 1-18 * the whole document * | [X] - "IDT(TM) 89HPES64H16 PCI Express Switch User Manual", (20081030), URL: http://www.idt.com/document/man/89pes64h16-device-user-manual, (20141204), XP055156733 [X] 1-18 * the whole document * | International search | [XP]CN103023824 (HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES CO., LTD.); | [A]CN101277196 (HANGZHOU HUASAN COMMUNICATION TECHNOLOGY CO., LTD.); | [A]CN102521182 (SOUTH CHINA NORMAL UNIVERSITY); | [A]US2012005539 (DELL PRODUCTS, LP) |