EP2929307 - SPECTROMETER FOR ANALYSING THE SPECTRUM OF A LIGHT BEAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.11.2019 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.11.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Horiba France SAS 16-18 Rue du Canal 91160 Longjumeau / FR | [2018/52] |
Former [2015/42] | For all designated states Horiba Jobin Yvon S.A.S. 16-18, rue du Canal 91160 Longjumeau / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ACHER, Olivier 18 rue des Châtaigniers F-91190 Gif-sur-Yvette / FR | 02 /
RICHARD, Simon 2 avenue de Bellevue 91120 Palaiseau / FR | 03 /
BRACH, Christian 3b Rue Jean Moulin F-78730 Saint Arnoult en Yvelynes / FR | 04 /
MILLET, Viviane 14 Rue Pasteur F-91310 Linas / FR | 05 /
CORDE, Sébastien Chez Pierre-André Corde 57 rue Hermel F-75018 Paris / FR | 06 /
HERAN, Daphné 286 rue de l'Aiguelongue Bâtiment C 34090 Montpellier / FR | [2019/01] |
Former [2015/42] | 01 /
ACHER, Olivier 18 rue des Châtaigniers F-91190 Gif-sur-Yvette / FR | ||
02 /
RICHARD, Simon D7 résidence du Clos d'Alençon F-91140 Villebon sur Yvette / FR | |||
03 /
BRACH, Christian 3b Rue Jean Moulin F-78730 Saint Arnoult en Yvelynes / FR | |||
04 /
MILLET, Viviane 14 Rue Pasteur F-91310 Linas / FR | |||
05 /
CORDE, Sébastien Chez Pierre-André Corde 57 rue Hermel F-75018 Paris / FR | |||
06 /
HERAN, Daphné 4 rue Théophile Gautier F-92120 Montrouge / FR | Representative(s) | Jacobacci Coralis Harle 32, rue de l'Arcade 75008 Paris / FR | [2019/01] |
Former [2015/42] | Coralis Harle 14-16 Rue Ballu 75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 13808131.0 | 29.11.2013 | [2015/42] | WO2013FR52900 | Priority number, date | FR20120061625 | 04.12.2012 Original published format: FR 1261625 | [2015/42] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014087081 | Date: | 12.06.2014 | Language: | FR | [2014/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2929307 | Date: | 14.10.2015 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.06.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2929307 | Date: | 02.01.2019 | Language: | FR | [2019/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.06.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G01J3/02, G01J3/18, G01J3/447, G02B5/18, G02B27/28 | [2015/42] | CPC: |
G01J3/021 (EP,US);
G01N21/645 (US);
G01J3/0224 (EP,US);
G01J3/18 (EP,US);
G01J3/447 (EP,US);
G02B27/283 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/42] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SPEKTROMETER ZUR SPEKTRENANALYSE EINES LICHTSTRAHLS | [2015/42] | English: | SPECTROMETER FOR ANALYSING THE SPECTRUM OF A LIGHT BEAM | [2015/42] | French: | SPECTROMÈTRE POUR L'ANALYSE DU SPECTRE D'UN FAISCEAU LUMINEUX | [2015/42] | Entry into regional phase | 04.06.2015 | National basic fee paid | 04.06.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.06.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.06.2015 | Examination requested [2015/42] | 09.11.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.07.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.11.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 08.11.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.11.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.07.2018 | Opposition(s) | 03.10.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.11.2013 | AL | 02.01.2019 | AT | 02.01.2019 | CY | 02.01.2019 | CZ | 02.01.2019 | EE | 02.01.2019 | ES | 02.01.2019 | HR | 02.01.2019 | IT | 02.01.2019 | LT | 02.01.2019 | LV | 02.01.2019 | MC | 02.01.2019 | MK | 02.01.2019 | MT | 02.01.2019 | NL | 02.01.2019 | PL | 02.01.2019 | RO | 02.01.2019 | RS | 02.01.2019 | SE | 02.01.2019 | SI | 02.01.2019 | SK | 02.01.2019 | SM | 02.01.2019 | TR | 02.01.2019 | BG | 02.04.2019 | NO | 02.04.2019 | GR | 03.04.2019 | IS | 02.05.2019 | PT | 02.05.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 29.11.2013 | |
AL | 02.01.2019 | ||
AT | 02.01.2019 | ||
CY | 02.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
IT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
MC | 02.01.2019 | ||
MT | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
RS | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
SI | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
SM | 02.01.2019 | ||
TR | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 29.11.2013 | |
AL | 02.01.2019 | ||
AT | 02.01.2019 | ||
CY | 02.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
IT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
MC | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
RS | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
SI | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
SM | 02.01.2019 | ||
TR | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 02.01.2019 | |
AT | 02.01.2019 | ||
CY | 02.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
IT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
MC | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
RS | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
SI | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
SM | 02.01.2019 | ||
TR | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 02.01.2019 | |
AT | 02.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
IT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
MC | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
RS | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
SI | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
SM | 02.01.2019 | ||
TR | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 02.01.2019 | |
AT | 02.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
IT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
RS | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
SI | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
SM | 02.01.2019 | ||
TR | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 02.01.2019 | |
AT | 02.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
IT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
RS | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
SI | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
SM | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 02.01.2019 | |
AT | 02.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
IT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
RS | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
SM | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 02.01.2019 | |
AT | 02.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
IT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
RS | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AT | 02.01.2019 | |
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
IT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RS | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | ES | 02.01.2019 | |
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RS | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | ES | 02.01.2019 | |
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | ES | 02.01.2019 | |
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | ES | 02.01.2019 | |
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | LT | 02.01.2019 | |
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | LT | 02.01.2019 | |
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/30] | NL | 02.01.2019 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE19539004 (ADVANTEST CORP [JP]) [A] 1 * page 2, line 26 - line 37 * * page 3, line 45 - page 4, line 26 * * page 5, line 1 - line 32 ** figure 1 *; | [A]DE102005055679 (NIPPON KOGAKU KK [JP]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0025]; figure 1 *; | [A] - PROVENZANO C ET AL, "Method for artifact-free circular dichroism measurements based on polarization grating", OPTICS LETTERS, OSA, OPTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, WASHINGTON, DC, US, vol. 35, no. 11, doi:10.1364/OL.35.001822, ISSN 0146-9592, (20100601), pages 1822 - 1824, (20100524), XP001554372 [A] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/OL.35.001822 | [A] - JIHWAN KIM ET AL, "Snapshot imaging spectropolarimeter utilizing polarization gratings", PROCEEDINGS OF SPIE, (20080101), doi:10.1117/12.795719, ISSN 0277-786X, page 708603, XP055020635 [A] 1 * pages 708603-4; figures 1,4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.795719 | [A] - ELENA NICOLESCU AND MICHAEL J ESCUTI, "Compact spectrophotometer using polarization-independent liquid crystal tunable optical filters", vol. 6661, doi:10.1117/12.735152, ISSN 0277-786X, (20070101), page 666105, PROCEEDINGS OF SPIE, S P I E - INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR OPTICAL ENGINEERING, US, URL: http://www.ece.ncsu.edu/oleg/files-wiki/5/56/SPIE07Nicolescu-LCPG_spectrometer.pdf, XP007921936 [A] 1 * figures 1,5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.735152 | [A] - NELSON V TABIRYAN ET AL, "The promise of diffractive waveplates", OPTICS AND PHOTONICS NEWS, OSA, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (20100101), vol. 21, no. 3, doi:10.1364/OPN.21.3.000040, ISSN 1047-6938, pages 40 - 45, XP007921937 [A] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/OPN.21.3.000040 |