EP2917016 - MOULDING METHOD AND MOULDING MACHINE FOR SOLID AND TUBULAR STRUCTURES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.09.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.10.2018 [2018/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states McNeight, David Leslie Brow Top Lees Lane Wilmslow, Cheshire SK9 2LR / GB | [2016/44] |
Former [2015/38] | For all designated states Crorme Limited Brow Top Lees Lane Wilmslow, Cheshire SK9 2LR / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ORME, Chesney Richard Lapwing Farm Clayholes Road Kettleshulme Cheshire SK23 7EJ / GB | [2015/38] | Representative(s) | TLIP Limited Murgitroyd House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/38] | TLIP Limited Leeds Innovation Centre 103 Clarendon Road Leeds LS2 9DF / GB | Application number, filing date | 13808162.5 | 12.11.2013 | [2015/38] | WO2013GB00483 | Priority number, date | GB20120020322 | 12.11.2012 Original published format: GB 201220322 | [2015/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014072675 | Date: | 15.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2917016 | Date: | 16.09.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.05.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.05.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B29C47/24, B29C47/86, B29B17/02, B29C47/12 | [2015/38] | CPC: |
B29C48/06 (EP,US);
B29B13/022 (US);
B29B17/02 (EP,US);
B29C41/04 (US);
B29C41/36 (US);
B29C41/46 (US);
B29C41/52 (US);
B29C48/09 (EP,US);
B29C48/33 (EP,US);
B29C48/87 (EP,US);
B29B17/0026 (EP,US);
B29B2017/0203 (EP,US);
B29B2017/0241 (EP,US);
B29C48/0022 (EP,US);
B29C48/023 (EP,US);
B29C48/301 (EP,US);
B29L2023/22 (US);
Y02W30/52 (EP,US);
Y02W30/62 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/38] | Title | German: | FORMVERFAHREN UND FORMMASCHINE FÜR FESTE UND RÖHRENFÖRMIGE STRUKTUREN | [2015/38] | English: | MOULDING METHOD AND MOULDING MACHINE FOR SOLID AND TUBULAR STRUCTURES | [2015/38] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE MOULAGE ET MACHINE DE MOULAGE POUR STRUCTURES TUBULAIRES ET SOLIDES | [2015/38] | Entry into regional phase | 12.06.2015 | National basic fee paid | 12.06.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.06.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.06.2015 | Examination requested [2015/38] | 05.04.2016 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 13.06.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/44] | 27.06.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/44] | Request for further processing for: | 13.06.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 13.06.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.06.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2015 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   27.05.2016 | 30.11.2017 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH08281766 (ISHIKAWAJIMA HARIMA HEAVY IND) [X] 1-6,11-13,16 * abstract * * figure 3 *; | [A]JPH10337729 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 16 * abstract * * figures 1-5 *; | [X]JP2002201796 (EKOPIA KK, et al) [X] 1,11,16 * abstract * * figure 6 *; | [A]EP1260346 (TOYO SEIKAN KAISHA LTD [JP]) [A] 16 * abstract ** figures 1-3 *; | [XI]US6530765 (ZDRAHALA RICHARD J [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5-9,11,12,16 * abstract * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0032] * * figures 1-5 * [I] 3,4,13; | [A]US2008257794 (VALERIO THOMAS A [US]) [A] 16 * abstract * * figures 1-16 *; | [X]EP2136157 (DEMAR HEIWERKEN B V [NL]) [X] 1,6-11,14-16 * paragraph [0055] - paragraph [0062] * * figure 6 *; | [X]WO2011115510 (SEMENIVSKYI PAVLO [PL], et al) [X] 1,3,5-7,11,13,16 * abstract * * claims 13-23 * * figure 11 * | by applicant | GB2437938 |