28.09.2018 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 31.10.2018 [2018/44] |
26.06.2018 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
05.01.2018 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
15.11.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.09.2016 |
Change - applicant |
published on 02.11.2016 [2016/44] |
30.06.2016 |
New entry: Decision on request for further processing |
|
22.06.2016 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
22.06.2016 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
15.06.2016 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
01.06.2016 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
01.06.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.04.2016 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
04.04.2016 |
New entry: Loss of particular rights: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
15.01.2016 |
Change - extension states |
published on 17.02.2016 [2016/07] |
12.01.2016 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
14.08.2015 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 16.09.2015 [2015/38] |
14.08.2015 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 16.09.2015 [2015/38] |
10.07.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.06.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.06.2015 |
Change - representative |
|
12.06.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.05.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.05.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.03.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.01.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|