Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2016279838 | Global Dossier | 29.09.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2013GB00483 | 12.11.2013 | GB201220322 | 12.11.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2917016 | Global Dossier | 16.09.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2013GB00483 | 12.11.2013 | GB201220322 | 12.11.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2014072675 | Global Dossier | 15.05.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB201220322 | 12.11.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB201220322D0 | 26.12.2012 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB201220322 | 12.11.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB201319971D0 | 25.12.2013 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB201220322 | 12.11.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB201319972D0 | 25.12.2013 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB201220322 | 12.11.2012 |