Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP2929127
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
03.07.2020 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] |
17.03.2020 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
30.12.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.09.2019 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
01.03.2019 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
01.03.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.02.2019 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
19.10.2018 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
13.08.2018 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
27.04.2018 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
20.04.2018 |
First examination report |
|
05.01.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.01.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.02.2016 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
12.02.2016 |
Change - extension states |
published on 16.03.2016 [2016/11] |
23.12.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.09.2015 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 14.10.2015 [2015/42] |
11.09.2015 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 14.10.2015 [2015/42] |
10.09.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.08.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.06.2015 |
Change - representative |
|
08.06.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.06.2015 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
20.06.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.06.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.01.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|