Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2015300103 | Global Dossier | 22.10.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | NL2009935 | 05.12.2012 | WO2013NL50876 | 05.12.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN104995370B | Global Dossier | 21.12.2018 | B | CN104995370 | 21.10.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | NL2009935 | 05.12.2012 | WO2013NL50876 | 05.12.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2013356776B | Global Dossier | 03.08.2017 | B2 | AU2013356776 | 02.07.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | NL2009935 | 05.12.2012 | WO2013NL50876 | 05.12.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2929127 | Global Dossier | 14.10.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | NL2009935 | 05.12.2012 | WO2013NL50876 | 05.12.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2893865 | 12.06.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | NL2009935 | 05.12.2012 | WO2013NL50876 | 05.12.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2014088417 | Global Dossier | 12.06.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | NL2009935 | 05.12.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | NL2009935C | 10.06.2014 | C2 | Priority number | Date | NL2009935 | 05.12.2012 |