EP2953985 - PREPARATION OF POLYOLEFIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.01.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH, LU | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Univation Technologies, LLC 5555 San Felipe Suite 1950 Houston, TX 77056 / US | [2015/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LESTER, C., Dale 4164 Beckwith Road Fayetteville, WV 25840 / US | 02 /
CANN, Kevin, J. 31 Montgomery Avenue Rock Hill, NJ 05883 / US | 03 /
CAO, Phuong, A. 51 North Street Old Bridge, NJ 08857 / US | 04 /
GOODE, Mark, G. 17 Meadowbrook Circle Hurricane, WV 25526-8906 / US | 05 /
HARI, Abarajith, S. 1201 Flora Way Ridgecrest, CA 93555 / US | 06 /
HUSSEIN, F., David 5403 Bennett Drive Cross Lanes, WV 25313 / US | 07 /
MARIOTT, Wesley, R. 12901 Trail Hollow Ct. Pearland, TX 77584 / US | 08 /
MOORHOUSE, John, H. 17 Constable Road Kendall Park, NJ 08824-1151 / US | 09 /
PANNELL, Richard, B. 3902 Hill Springs Drive Kingwood, TX 77345 / US | 10 /
SAVATSKY, Bruce, J. 2303 Pine Blossom Court Kingwood, TX 77345 / US | 11 /
ZILKER, Daniel, P. 2217 High Point Court Easton, PA 18045 / US | [2023/23] |
Former [2015/51] | 01 /
LESTER, C., Dale 4164 Beckwith Road Fayetteville, WV 25840 / US | ||
02 /
CANN, Kevin, J. 31 Montgomery Avenue Rock Hill, NJ 05883 / US | |||
03 /
CAO, Phuong, A. 51 North Street Old Bridge, NJ 08857 / US | |||
04 /
GOODE, Mark, G. 17 Meadowbrook Circle Hurricane, WV 25526-8906 / US | |||
05 /
HARI, Abarajith, S. 1201 Flora Way Ridgecrest, CA 93555 / US | |||
06 /
HUSSEIN, F., David 5403 Bennett Drive Cross Lanes, WV 25313 / US | |||
07 /
MARIOTT, Wesley, R. 12901 Trail Hollow Ct. Pearland, TX 77584 / US | |||
08 /
MOORHOUSE, John, H. 17 Constable Road Kendall Park, NJ 08824-1151 / US | |||
09 /
PANNELL, Richard, B. 3902 Hill Springs Drive Kingwood, TX 77345 / US | |||
10 /
SAVATSKY, Bruce, J. 2303 Pine Blossom Court Kingwood, TX 77345 / US | |||
11 /
ZILKER, Daniel, P. 1336 Johnson Road Charleston, WV 25314 / US | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [2023/23] |
Former [2015/51] | Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 13808302.7 | 20.11.2013 | [2015/51] | WO2013US71020 | Priority number, date | US201361762061P | 07.02.2013 Original published format: US 201361762061 P | [2015/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014123598 | Date: | 14.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2953985 | Date: | 16.12.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.08.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2953985 | Date: | 07.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.08.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C08F210/02, C08F4/659 | [2015/51] | CPC: |
C08F210/16 (EP,US);
C08F210/02 (RU);
C08F4/65925 (US);
C08F10/14 (US);
C08F4/02 (US);
C08F4/659 (RU);
C08F4/65916 (US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08F10/02, C08F4/65916 (US,EP);
C08F10/02, C08F4/65922 (US,EP);
C08F110/06, C08F4/651 (US,EP);
C08F110/06, C08F4/6546 (EP,US); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/51] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | POLYOLEFINHERSTELLUNG | [2015/51] | English: | PREPARATION OF POLYOLEFIN | [2015/51] | French: | PRÉPARATION DE POLYOLÉFINE | [2015/51] | Entry into regional phase | 07.09.2015 | National basic fee paid | 07.09.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.09.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.09.2015 | Examination requested [2015/51] | 21.03.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.05.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.01.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.09.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.01.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.01.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.04.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 27.04.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.04.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP23159436.7 / EP4223802 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.02.2017 | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.06.2023 | CZ | 07.06.2023 | DK | 07.06.2023 | EE | 07.06.2023 | FI | 07.06.2023 | HR | 07.06.2023 | LT | 07.06.2023 | LV | 07.06.2023 | MC | 07.06.2023 | PL | 07.06.2023 | RO | 07.06.2023 | RS | 07.06.2023 | SE | 07.06.2023 | SI | 07.06.2023 | SK | 07.06.2023 | SM | 07.06.2023 | NO | 07.09.2023 | GR | 08.09.2023 | IS | 07.10.2023 | PT | 09.10.2023 | LU | 20.11.2023 | CH | 30.11.2023 | [2024/34] |
Former [2024/32] | AT | 07.06.2023 | |
CZ | 07.06.2023 | ||
DK | 07.06.2023 | ||
EE | 07.06.2023 | ||
FI | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
MC | 07.06.2023 | ||
PL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
SI | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
PT | 09.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AT | 07.06.2023 | |
CZ | 07.06.2023 | ||
DK | 07.06.2023 | ||
EE | 07.06.2023 | ||
FI | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
PL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
SI | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
PT | 09.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 07.06.2023 | |
CZ | 07.06.2023 | ||
DK | 07.06.2023 | ||
EE | 07.06.2023 | ||
FI | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
PL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
PT | 09.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 07.06.2023 | |
CZ | 07.06.2023 | ||
EE | 07.06.2023 | ||
FI | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
PL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
PT | 09.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 07.06.2023 | |
CZ | 07.06.2023 | ||
FI | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | FI | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | FI | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | HR | 07.06.2023 | |
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | HR | 07.06.2023 | |
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | SE | 07.06.2023 | |
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | SE | 07.06.2023 | |
NO | 07.09.2023 | Cited in | International search | [X]US2006293470 (CAO PHUONG A [US], et al); | [X]WO2008002524 (UNIVATION TECH LLC [US], et al); | [X]WO2011089017 (BASELL POLYOLEFINE GMBH [DE], et al); | [I]WO2011103402 (UNIVATION TECH LLC [US], et al); | [I]WO2012074709 (UNIVATION TECH LLC [US], et al) | by applicant | US3709853 | BE839380 | US4003712 | US4011382 | US4302566 | US4543399 | US4555370 | US4665208 | EP0229368 | US4701432 | EP0279586 | US4803251 | US4808561 | US4874734 | US4882400 | US4908463 | US4912075 | US4924018 | US4925821 | US4937217 | US4952540 | US4968827 | US5008228 | US5041584 | US5091352 | US5103031 | US5157137 | US5204419 | US5206199 | US5235081 | US5238892 | US5240894 | EP0561476 | US5248801 | US5283278 | EP0586665 | EP0594218 | US5308815 | WO9410180 | US5318935 | US5329032 | US5332706 | US5346925 | US5352749 | US5391793 | US5391529 | WO9514044 | US5422325 | US5466649 | US5466766 | US5468702 | US5473202 | WO9532995 | WO9606187 | US5529965 | US5541270 | US5554704 | WO9702297 | US5625015 | US5629253 | US5639835 | WO9722635 | US5643847 | US5648310 | US5665665 | EP0802203 | EP0802202 | US5688880 | US5693838 | US5698487 | US5714424 | US5723400 | US5723402 | US5731261 | US5731253 | US5731451 | US5744656 | US5759940 | US5767032 | US5770755 | US5770664 | WO9846651 | US5847177 | US5854166 | US5856256 | WO9901460 | EP0893454 | EP0894005 | US5889128 | WO9915534 | US5939346 | WO0069922 | WO0130860 | WO0130861 | US6242545 | WO0144322 | US6271325 | US6333389 | WO0246246 | WO0250088 | US6689847 | WO2004026921 | US6884748 | US6943134 | US6958306 | US6995109 | WO2006019494 | US7129302 | US7157531 | US7169864 | US7179876 | US2008045663 | WO2009064404 | WO2009064452 | WO2009064482 | US7741417 | WO2011017092 | US8084560 |