EP2866619 - COOKWARE SURFACE AND METHOD FOR FORMING COOKWARE SURFACE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.10.2017 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.11.2017 [2017/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PT Maspion JI. Kembang Jepun 38-40 Surabaya 60162 / ID | [2015/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALIM, Prakasa PT Maspion JI. Kembang Jepun 38-40 Surabaya 60162 / ID | [2015/19] | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB Box 1066 251 10 Helsingborg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/19] | Larsson, Malin Awapatent AB Box 1066 251 10 Helsingborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 13808448.8 | 12.03.2013 | WO2013IB00414 | Priority number, date | US201213537948 | 29.06.2012 Original published format: US201213537948 | [2015/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014001858 | Date: | 03.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2866619 | Date: | 06.05.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 03.01.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A47J27/00, A47J36/00, A47J37/00 | [2015/19] | CPC: |
B21K23/00 (EP,US);
A47J36/025 (EP,US);
B32B3/28 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24612 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/19] | Title | German: | KOCHGESCHIRROBERFLÄCHE UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DER KOCHGESCHIRROBERFLÄCHE | [2015/19] | English: | COOKWARE SURFACE AND METHOD FOR FORMING COOKWARE SURFACE | [2015/19] | French: | SURFACE D'USTENSILE DE CUISSON ET PROCÉDÉ DE FORMATION D'UNE SURFACE D'USTENSILE DE CUISSON | [2015/19] | Entry into regional phase | 16.01.2015 | National basic fee paid | 16.01.2015 | Search fee paid | 16.01.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.01.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.01.2015 | Observations by third parties | 16.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/19] | 09.09.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.06.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/48] | 21.07.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/48] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.02.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]US3493726 (BARDEAU WILLIAM M) [X] 9,10,12-17 * column 1, line 62 - column 2, line 63; figures 3, 4 * [A] 1,7 [Y] 2-5,8,11; | [XAY]EP0259056 (MEYER MANUF CO LTD [HK]) [X] 1,6,7 * column 3, line 11 - column 4, line 19; figures 1-3; claims 8, 9 * [A] 9,16,17 [Y] 2-5,8,11; | [XA]KR100804387B (PARK SOO JIN [KR], et al) [X] 9,10,12-14,16,17 * paragraphs [0048] - [0054] *[A] 1-4,6-8; | [E]WO2013035994 (OH GI-WHAN [KR]) [E] 1-17 * paragraphs [0021] - [0025]; figures 1-3; claims 1, 4, 7 * | International search | [X]EP0928588 (MEYER MANUF CO LTD [HK]); | [X]CN201861409U (DEMING QIU); | [X]WO2011069351 (ZHEJIANG AISHIDA ELECTRIC CO [CN], et al) | by applicant | US3493726 | EP0259056 | KR100804387B | WO2013035994 | other | KR100804387B | WO2011069351 |