EP2867604 - LOW VOID FRACTION THERMAL STORAGE ARTICLES AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.08.2017 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.08.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.09.2017 [2017/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Saint-Gobain Ceramics & Plastics, Inc. One New Bond Street P.O. Box 15138 Worcester, MA 01615 / US | [2015/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NIKNAFS, Hassan S. Mohammad Hadi Ev 93-76 Baku / AZ | 02 /
SHERMAN, Daniel C. 1583 Amboy Hudson, Ohio 44236 / US | 03 /
SZYMANSKI, Thomas 2705 Blue Heron Drive Hudson, Ohio 44236 / US | [2015/19] | Representative(s) | Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | [2015/19] | Application number, filing date | 13809458.6 | 25.06.2013 | WO2013US47477 | Priority number, date | US201261665957P | 29.06.2012 Original published format: US 201261665957 P | [2015/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014004428 | Date: | 03.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2867604 | Date: | 06.05.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 03.01.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.07.2016 | Classification | IPC: | F28D20/00, F28D17/02, C04B33/04 | [2016/32] | CPC: |
F28D20/0056 (EP,US);
B23P11/00 (US);
C04B33/04 (EP,US);
C04B35/26 (EP,US);
F28D15/00 (US);
F28D17/02 (EP,US);
C04B2235/349 (EP,US);
C04B2235/6021 (EP,US);
C04B2235/945 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/19] | F28D20/00, F24J2/34 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/19] | Title | German: | ARTIKEL UND VERFAHREN ZUR WÄRMESPEICHERUNG MIT GERINGEM BLASENANTEIL | [2015/19] | English: | LOW VOID FRACTION THERMAL STORAGE ARTICLES AND METHODS | [2015/19] | French: | ARTICLES ET PROCÉDÉS DE STOCKAGE THERMIQUE À FAIBLE TAUX DE VIDE | [2015/19] | Entry into regional phase | 22.01.2015 | National basic fee paid | 22.01.2015 | Search fee paid | 22.01.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.01.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.04.2014 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 22.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/19] | 09.02.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/39] | 17.03.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2017 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]JPH09269193 (KAWASAKI STEEL CO, et al) [I] 1-10,12-16,18,21-30,39-42 * abstract * [A] 11,17,19,20,43,44; | [I]EP2395549 (IMEC [BE]) [I] 1-5,7,9,10,12,13,19-22,24,29,30 * columns 5-7; figures 1-6 *; | [I]JPH08247671 (NIPPON KOKAN KK, et al) [I] 1-7,9,10,12,13,19,21,22,24,29,30,39 * abstract *; | [I]US4452229 (POWERS KIM [US]) [I] 1-7,9,10,12,13,19-24,29,30,39 * columns 4-6; figures 2-5 *; | [Y]JPS5896993 (YAMAU SOUGOU KAIHATSU KK) [Y] 1-7,9,10,12,13,19,21-23,29,30 * abstract *; | [Y]JPH10238977 (TRINITY IND CORP) [Y] 1-7,9,10,12,13,19,21-23,29,30 * abstract * | International search | [Y]JPS5896993 (YAMAU SOUGOU KAIHATSU KK); | [Y]JPH10238977 (TRINITY IND CORP); | [Y]JPH0798189 (NHK SPRING CO LTD); | [A]JPH08247671 (NIPPON KOKAN KK, et al); | [A]JP2000161882 (HITACHI LTD) |