EP2868503 - HEAT PUMP DEVICE FOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 29.06.2018 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 01.08.2018 [2018/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2015/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TANIGUCHI, Katsuji c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. IP Management Department 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
NAKAYA, Satoshi c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. IP Management Department 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 03 /
NODA, Yoshitoshi c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. IP Management Department 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 04 /
TERADA, Tomohiro c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. IP Management Department 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2015/19] | Representative(s) | SSM Sandmair Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/19] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Patentanwälte Stuntzstraße 16 81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13809672.2 | 26.06.2013 | WO2013JP04002 | Priority number, date | JP20120147613 | 29.06.2012 Original published format: JP 2012147613 | JP20120179285 | 13.08.2012 Original published format: JP 2012179285 | [2015/19] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014002496 | Date: | 03.01.2014 | Language: | JA | [2014/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2868503 | Date: | 06.05.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.01.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B60H1/32, B60H1/22, F04B39/06, F25B3/00, B60H1/00, B60H1/14, F25B13/00, F25B49/02 | [2016/24] | CPC: |
F04B39/06 (EP,US);
F25B13/00 (US);
B60H1/00899 (EP,US);
B60H1/143 (EP,US);
B60H1/32284 (EP,US);
F25B49/022 (US);
B60H2001/00928 (EP,US);
F25B2339/047 (EP,US);
F25B2400/071 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/19] | B60H1/32, B60H1/22, F04B39/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/19] | Title | German: | WÄRMEPUMPENVORRICHTUNG FÜR EIN FAHRZEUG | [2015/19] | English: | HEAT PUMP DEVICE FOR VEHICLE | [2015/19] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE POMPE À CHALEUR POUR VÉHICULE | [2015/19] | Entry into regional phase | 09.12.2014 | Translation filed | 09.12.2014 | National basic fee paid | 09.12.2014 | Search fee paid | 09.12.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.12.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.12.2014 | Examination requested [2015/19] | 02.12.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.06.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/31] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.03.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2604942 (SCHMIDT KARL DR ING) [X] 1-6,9,10 * pages 5,6; figure 1 *; | [XI]US5289698 (GARIMELLA SRINIVAS [US]) [X] 1-6,9,10 * the whole document * [I] 7,8; | [A]WO0187656 (LLANELLI RADIATORS LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-10 * pages 3,4; figure 3 *; | [A]DE102006004741 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [A] 7,8* the whole document * | International search | [Y]JPH07266857 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [Y]JP2005112247 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD); | [Y]JP2005146987 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO); | [A]JP2007064173 (SANDEN CORP) | by applicant | JP3477868B | - KOWSKY ET AL., "Unitary HPAC System", SAE INTERNATIONAL J. PASSENG. CARS - MECH. SYST., (2012), URL: doi: 10.4271/2012-01-1050 |