EP2864238 - COVALENTLY-BONDED GRAPHENE COATING AND ITS APPLICATIONS THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 30.12.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.12.2016 | Withdrawal of application | published on 01.02.2017 [2017/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Ohio State University 1524 North High Street Columbus, OH 43201 / US | [2015/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Ly James 1109 Millcreek Lane Columbus, OH 43220 / US | 02 /
HUANG, Wenyi 617 Eastlawn Drive Apt. 201 Midland, MI 48640 / US | 03 /
YU, Jianfeng 3108 El Greco Drive Columbus, OH 43204 / US | [2015/18] | Representative(s) | O'Connell, Maura, et al FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Dublin D04 F838 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/18] | O'Connell, Maura, et al FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Ballsbridge Dublin 4 / IE | Application number, filing date | 13809870.2 | 25.06.2013 | WO2013US47627 | Priority number, date | US201261690373P | 25.06.2012 Original published format: US 201261690373 P | [2015/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014004514 | Date: | 03.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2864238 | Date: | 29.04.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.01.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/20, C01B31/04, C03C25/44, C04B41/48, C04B41/83, C04B41/50, C04B41/85, C03C17/22, C04B41/00, B82Y30/00 | [2016/01] | CPC: |
B82Y30/00 (EP,US);
C01B32/184 (EP,US);
C01B32/192 (EP,US);
C01B32/23 (EP,US);
C03C17/22 (EP,US);
C03C25/44 (EP,US);
C04B41/009 (EP,US);
C04B41/5001 (EP,US);
C04B41/85 (EP,US);
H01L21/0237 (EP,US);
H01L21/02527 (EP,US);
H01L21/02601 (EP,US);
H01L21/02628 (EP,US);
H01L21/2007 (EP,US);
C03C2217/28 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C04B41/009, C04B35/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/18] | B82Y30/00, C01B31/04, H01L21/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/18] | Title | German: | KOVALENT GEBUNDENE GRAPHENBESCHICHTUNG UND ANWENDUNGEN DAVON | [2015/18] | English: | COVALENTLY-BONDED GRAPHENE COATING AND ITS APPLICATIONS THEREOF | [2015/18] | French: | REVÊTEMENT DE GRAPHÈNE LIÉ DE FAÇON COVALENTE ET SES APPLICATIONS | [2015/18] | Entry into regional phase | 26.01.2015 | National basic fee paid | 26.01.2015 | Search fee paid | 26.01.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.01.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/18] | 13.10.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.12.2016 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US3172774 (GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY) [I] 1,2 * column 2, line 26 - column 6, line 3; figure 1; claims 1-7 *; | [XP] - HE P ET AL, "Graphene-coated Si mold for precision glass optics molding", OPTICS LETTERS 20130715 OPTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA USA, (20130625), vol. 38, no. 14, doi:10.1364/OL.38.002625, pages 2625 - 2628, XP055227941 [XP] 1,2 * page 2625 - page 2628; figures 1-5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/OL.38.002625 | [T] - HUANG W ET AL, "High-performance nanopapers based on benzenesulfonic functionalized graphenes", ACS NANO 20121127 AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY USA, (20121127), vol. 6, no. 11, doi:10.1021/NN303917P, pages 10178 - 10185, XP055227950 [T] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/nn303917p | International search | [X]US2011171427 (KIM KEUN-SOO [KR], et al); | [Y]US2012164433 (ADVINCULA RIGOBERTO [US]); | [Y]US2011163296 (PACE SALVATORE J [US], et al); | [Y]US2011303121 (GEIM ANDRE [GB], et al); | [A]US2011220415 (JIN HYUN WOO [US], et al) | by applicant | US3172774 | - HE ET AL., "Graphene-coated Si mold for precision glass optics molding", OPTICS LETTERS, (2013), vol. 38, no. 14, pages 2625 - 2628 |