EP2867651 - MULTIFUNCTIONAL FLUID METER AND METHOD FOR MEASURING COOLANT, BIO-DIESEL, GAS-ETHANOL AND DEF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.10.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.11.2020 [2020/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Spectro Scientific, Inc. One Executive Drive, Suite 101 Chelmsford, MA 01824 / US | [2016/25] |
Former [2015/19] | For all designated states On-Site Analysis, Inc. 7018 Fairway Drive, Suite 130 Palm Beach Gardens, FL 33418-3768 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GREER, James 14 Blackberry Lane Grafton, MA 01519 / US | 02 /
GUTHRIE, Robert, J. 11 Benton Street Lowell, MA 01851 / US | 03 /
COATES, John 12 North Branch Road Newtown, CT 06470 / US | [2015/19] | Representative(s) | Beetz & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstraße 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/19] | Beetz & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Steinsdorfstraße 10 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13810440.1 | 28.06.2013 | WO2013US48658 | Priority number, date | US201261666446P | 29.06.2012 Original published format: US 201261666446 P | [2015/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014005062 | Date: | 03.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2867651 | Date: | 06.05.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 03.01.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/03, G01N21/31, G01N21/33, G01N21/3577, G01J3/02, G01J3/10, G01J3/42, G01J3/427 | [2016/13] | CPC: |
G01J3/42 (EP,US);
G01J3/0218 (EP,US);
G01J3/0264 (EP,US);
G01J3/027 (EP,US);
G01J3/0291 (EP,US);
G01J3/0294 (EP,US);
G01J3/10 (EP,US);
G01J3/427 (EP,US);
G01N21/0303 (EP,US);
G01N21/31 (EP,US);
G01N21/33 (EP,US);
G01N21/3577 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/19] | G01N21/25 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/19] | Title | German: | MULTIFUNKTIONELLER FLÜSSIGKEITSMESSER UND VERFAHREN ZUR MESSUNG VON KÜHLMITTELN, BIODIESEL, GASETHANOL UND DIESELMOTORFLÜSSIGKEIT | [2015/19] | English: | MULTIFUNCTIONAL FLUID METER AND METHOD FOR MEASURING COOLANT, BIO-DIESEL, GAS-ETHANOL AND DEF | [2015/19] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE MESURE DE FLUIDE MULTIFONCTION ET PROCÉDÉ POUR MESURER UN AGENT DE REFROIDISSEMENT, UN BIO-DIESEL, UN GAZ-ÉTHANOL ET UN FLUIDE DE MOTEUR DIESEL | [2015/19] | Entry into regional phase | 29.01.2015 | National basic fee paid | 29.01.2015 | Search fee paid | 29.01.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.01.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/19] | 13.10.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.11.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/46] | 25.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/46] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.11.2019 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2020 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2010134794 (ODEGARD RUSSELL DAVID [US], et al) [Y] 1-16 * paragraphs [0002] , [0 76] , [0 81] , [ 115] , [ 117] , [ 118] , [ 122] , [ 123] , [ 125] , [ 130] , [ 131] * * figures 9, 12 *; | [Y]US2010305827 (FOURNEL JOHAN [FR], et al) [Y] 1-16* paragraphs [0009] , [0 27] , [0 31] , [0 41] * | International search | [A]RU6630U (TOVARISCHESTVO S OGRANICHENNOI OTVETSTVENNOSTIYU-TSENTR ''SISTEMY I TE); | [A]WO0009985 (TOP SOURCE TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]); | [A]RU65651U (FGOU VPO RYAZANSKAYA GOSUDARSTVENNAYA SELSKOKHOZYAISTVENNAYA AKADEMIYA); | [A]US2008272303 (CHU HAN-WEN [TW], et al) |