EP2907107 - MULTI-STRUCTURE ATLAS AND/OR USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.05.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.06.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2015/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DWIVEDI, Shekhar c/o High Tech Campus Building 5 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2015/34] | Representative(s) | Steffen, Thomas Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2017/29] |
Former [2015/34] | Steffen, Thomas Philips International B.V. Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 13811006.9 | 27.09.2013 | [2015/34] | WO2013IB58912 | Priority number, date | US201261711405P | 09.10.2012 Original published format: US 201261711405 P | [2015/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2014057383 | Date: | 17.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/16] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2907107 | Date: | 19.08.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.04.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2907107 | Date: | 19.07.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G06T7/11, G06K9/46, G06T7/00 | [2017/07] | CPC: |
G06T7/11 (EP,US);
G06T11/005 (US);
G06T7/0012 (US);
G06T2207/10072 (EP,CN,US);
G06T2207/20104 (US);
G06T2207/20128 (EP,CN,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/34] | G06T7/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/34] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MULTISTRUKTURATLAS UND/ODER VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2015/34] | English: | MULTI-STRUCTURE ATLAS AND/OR USE THEREOF | [2015/34] | French: | ATLAS À STRUCTURES MULTIPLES ET/OU UTILISATION ASSOCIÉE | [2015/34] | Entry into regional phase | 11.05.2015 | National basic fee paid | 11.05.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.05.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.05.2015 | Examination requested [2015/34] | 24.11.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.09.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.06.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 01.06.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.06.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.03.2016 | Opposition(s) | 20.04.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.09.2013 | AL | 19.07.2017 | AT | 19.07.2017 | CY | 19.07.2017 | CZ | 19.07.2017 | DK | 19.07.2017 | EE | 19.07.2017 | ES | 19.07.2017 | FI | 19.07.2017 | HR | 19.07.2017 | IT | 19.07.2017 | LT | 19.07.2017 | LV | 19.07.2017 | MC | 19.07.2017 | MK | 19.07.2017 | NL | 19.07.2017 | PL | 19.07.2017 | PT | 19.07.2017 | RO | 19.07.2017 | RS | 19.07.2017 | SE | 19.07.2017 | SI | 19.07.2017 | SK | 19.07.2017 | SM | 19.07.2017 | TR | 19.07.2017 | IE | 27.09.2017 | LU | 27.09.2017 | MT | 27.09.2017 | BE | 30.09.2017 | CH | 30.09.2017 | LI | 30.09.2017 | FR | 02.10.2017 | BG | 19.10.2017 | GB | 19.10.2017 | NO | 19.10.2017 | GR | 20.10.2017 | IS | 19.11.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/28] | HU | 27.09.2013 | |
AT | 19.07.2017 | ||
CY | 19.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 19.07.2017 | ||
DK | 19.07.2017 | ||
EE | 19.07.2017 | ||
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
IT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LV | 19.07.2017 | ||
MC | 19.07.2017 | ||
MK | 19.07.2017 | ||
NL | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
PT | 19.07.2017 | ||
RO | 19.07.2017 | ||
RS | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
SI | 19.07.2017 | ||
SK | 19.07.2017 | ||
SM | 19.07.2017 | ||
TR | 19.07.2017 | ||
IE | 27.09.2017 | ||
LU | 27.09.2017 | ||
MT | 27.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
FR | 02.10.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
GB | 19.10.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | HU | 27.09.2013 | |
AT | 19.07.2017 | ||
CY | 19.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 19.07.2017 | ||
DK | 19.07.2017 | ||
EE | 19.07.2017 | ||
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
IT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LV | 19.07.2017 | ||
MC | 19.07.2017 | ||
MK | 19.07.2017 | ||
NL | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RO | 19.07.2017 | ||
RS | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
SI | 19.07.2017 | ||
SK | 19.07.2017 | ||
SM | 19.07.2017 | ||
TR | 19.07.2017 | ||
IE | 27.09.2017 | ||
LU | 27.09.2017 | ||
MT | 27.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
FR | 02.10.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
GB | 19.10.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 27.09.2013 | |
AT | 19.07.2017 | ||
CY | 19.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 19.07.2017 | ||
DK | 19.07.2017 | ||
EE | 19.07.2017 | ||
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
IT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LV | 19.07.2017 | ||
MC | 19.07.2017 | ||
MK | 19.07.2017 | ||
NL | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RO | 19.07.2017 | ||
RS | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
SI | 19.07.2017 | ||
SK | 19.07.2017 | ||
SM | 19.07.2017 | ||
IE | 27.09.2017 | ||
LU | 27.09.2017 | ||
MT | 27.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
FR | 02.10.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
GB | 19.10.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 27.09.2013 | |
AT | 19.07.2017 | ||
CY | 19.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 19.07.2017 | ||
DK | 19.07.2017 | ||
EE | 19.07.2017 | ||
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
IT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LV | 19.07.2017 | ||
MC | 19.07.2017 | ||
NL | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RO | 19.07.2017 | ||
RS | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
SI | 19.07.2017 | ||
SK | 19.07.2017 | ||
SM | 19.07.2017 | ||
IE | 27.09.2017 | ||
LU | 27.09.2017 | ||
MT | 27.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
FR | 02.10.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
GB | 19.10.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 27.09.2013 | |
AT | 19.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 19.07.2017 | ||
DK | 19.07.2017 | ||
EE | 19.07.2017 | ||
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
IT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LV | 19.07.2017 | ||
MC | 19.07.2017 | ||
NL | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RO | 19.07.2017 | ||
RS | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
SI | 19.07.2017 | ||
SK | 19.07.2017 | ||
SM | 19.07.2017 | ||
IE | 27.09.2017 | ||
LU | 27.09.2017 | ||
MT | 27.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
FR | 02.10.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
GB | 19.10.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 19.07.2017 | |
CZ | 19.07.2017 | ||
DK | 19.07.2017 | ||
EE | 19.07.2017 | ||
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
IT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LV | 19.07.2017 | ||
MC | 19.07.2017 | ||
NL | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RO | 19.07.2017 | ||
RS | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
SI | 19.07.2017 | ||
SK | 19.07.2017 | ||
SM | 19.07.2017 | ||
IE | 27.09.2017 | ||
LU | 27.09.2017 | ||
MT | 27.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
FR | 02.10.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
GB | 19.10.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/37] | AT | 19.07.2017 | |
CZ | 19.07.2017 | ||
DK | 19.07.2017 | ||
EE | 19.07.2017 | ||
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
IT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LV | 19.07.2017 | ||
MC | 19.07.2017 | ||
NL | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RO | 19.07.2017 | ||
RS | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
SI | 19.07.2017 | ||
SK | 19.07.2017 | ||
SM | 19.07.2017 | ||
IE | 27.09.2017 | ||
LU | 27.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
FR | 02.10.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
GB | 19.10.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/36] | AT | 19.07.2017 | |
CZ | 19.07.2017 | ||
DK | 19.07.2017 | ||
EE | 19.07.2017 | ||
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
IT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LV | 19.07.2017 | ||
MC | 19.07.2017 | ||
NL | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RO | 19.07.2017 | ||
RS | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
SK | 19.07.2017 | ||
SM | 19.07.2017 | ||
IE | 27.09.2017 | ||
LU | 27.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
GB | 19.10.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 19.07.2017 | |
CZ | 19.07.2017 | ||
DK | 19.07.2017 | ||
EE | 19.07.2017 | ||
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
IT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LV | 19.07.2017 | ||
MC | 19.07.2017 | ||
NL | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RO | 19.07.2017 | ||
RS | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
SK | 19.07.2017 | ||
SM | 19.07.2017 | ||
IE | 27.09.2017 | ||
LU | 27.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
GB | 19.10.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/34] | AT | 19.07.2017 | |
CZ | 19.07.2017 | ||
DK | 19.07.2017 | ||
EE | 19.07.2017 | ||
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
IT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LV | 19.07.2017 | ||
MC | 19.07.2017 | ||
NL | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RO | 19.07.2017 | ||
RS | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
SK | 19.07.2017 | ||
SM | 19.07.2017 | ||
IE | 27.09.2017 | ||
LU | 27.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/30] | AT | 19.07.2017 | |
CZ | 19.07.2017 | ||
DK | 19.07.2017 | ||
EE | 19.07.2017 | ||
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
IT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LV | 19.07.2017 | ||
MC | 19.07.2017 | ||
NL | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RO | 19.07.2017 | ||
RS | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
SK | 19.07.2017 | ||
SM | 19.07.2017 | ||
LU | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/26] | AT | 19.07.2017 | |
CZ | 19.07.2017 | ||
DK | 19.07.2017 | ||
EE | 19.07.2017 | ||
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
IT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LV | 19.07.2017 | ||
MC | 19.07.2017 | ||
NL | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RO | 19.07.2017 | ||
RS | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
SK | 19.07.2017 | ||
SM | 19.07.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 19.07.2017 | |
CZ | 19.07.2017 | ||
DK | 19.07.2017 | ||
EE | 19.07.2017 | ||
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
IT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LV | 19.07.2017 | ||
NL | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RO | 19.07.2017 | ||
RS | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
SK | 19.07.2017 | ||
SM | 19.07.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 19.07.2017 | |
CZ | 19.07.2017 | ||
DK | 19.07.2017 | ||
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LV | 19.07.2017 | ||
NL | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RS | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | AT | 19.07.2017 | |
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LV | 19.07.2017 | ||
NL | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RS | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 19.07.2017 | |
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
NL | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RS | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 19.07.2017 | |
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
NL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RS | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | FI | 19.07.2017 | |
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
NL | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 19.07.2017 | |
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
NL | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 19.07.2017 | |
NO | 19.10.2017 | Cited in | International search | [XYI] - SOOMIN SONG ET AL, Segmentation of Abdominal Organs Incorporating Prior Knowledge in Small Animal CT, ADVANCES IN VISUAL COMPUTING, SPRINGER BERLIN HEIDELBERG, BERLIN, HEIDELBERG, PAGE(S) 209 - 218, (20101129), ISBN 978-3-642-17276-2, XP019157636 [X] 12-14 * abstract * * figures 1,2,4,5 * * sections 1,2,2.2,3,4,5 * [Y] 6,16 [I] 1-5,7,15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/978-3-642-17277-9_22 | [I] - FABIAN GIGENGACK ET AL, Atlas-Based Whole-Body PET-CT Segmentation Using a Passive Contour Distance, MEDICAL COMPUTER VISION. RECOGNITION TECHNIQUES AND APPLICATIONS IN MEDICAL IMAGING, SPRINGER BERLIN HEIDELBERG, BERLIN, HEIDELBERG, PAGE(S) 82 - 92, (20121005), ISBN 978-3-642-36619-2, XP047026338 [I] 1,12 * abstract * * figures 1-3,5 * * sections 2,2.1,3.2 * | [I] - BALLANGAN ET AL., "Automated detection and delineation of lung tumors in PET-CT volumes using a lung atlas and Iterative Mean-SUV threshold", PROC. OF SPIE, (20090101), vol. 7259, pages 1 - 8, XP040494794 [I] 1,12 * abstract * * figures 1,4-6 * * sections 2,2.2,2.3 * | [I] - LEI BI ET AL, "Automated and Robust PERCIST-based Thresholding framework for whole body PET-CT studies", ENGINEERING IN MEDICINE AND BIOLOGY SOCIETY (EMBC), 2012 ANNUAL INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE OF THE IEEE, IEEE, (20120828), doi:10.1109/EMBC.2012.6347199, ISBN 978-1-4244-4119-8, pages 5335 - 5338, XP032464142 [I] 1,12 * abstract * * figures 1,2,4 * * sections II.A,II.D,II.E.2),3),II.F,III.B * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/EMBC.2012.6347199 | [YA] - HONGKAI WANG ET AL, "Estimation of Mouse Organ Locations Through Registration of a Statistical Mouse Atlas With Micro-CT Images", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON MEDICAL IMAGING, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20120101), vol. 31, no. 1, doi:10.1109/TMI.2011.2165294, ISSN 0278-0062, pages 88 - 102, XP011491008 [Y] 6,16 * abstract * * figure 1 * * section II.A.1) * [A] 4,15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TMI.2011.2165294 |