EP2919934 - CORNER RADIUS END MILL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.09.2018 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.09.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.05.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.02.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Iscar Ltd. P.O. Box 11 24959 Tefen / IL | [2015/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUDDA, Eliyahu 4 Hasavion Street 25123 Neve Ziv / IL | 02 /
KHINA, Alexander 12 Dror Street 25147 Kfar Vradim / IL | [2015/39] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2015/39] | Application number, filing date | 13811012.7 | 05.11.2013 | [2015/39] | WO2013IL50905 | Priority number, date | US201213676974 | 14.11.2012 Original published format: US201213676974 | [2015/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014076691 | Date: | 22.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2919934 | Date: | 23.09.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2919934 | Date: | 01.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.05.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B23C5/10 | [2015/39] | CPC: |
B23C5/10 (EP,CN,RU,US);
B23C5/1009 (US);
B23C2210/0492 (EP,CN,US);
B23C2210/082 (EP,CN,US);
B23C2210/123 (EP,CN,US);
B23C2210/282 (EP,CN,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/39] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ECKENRADIUS-SCHAFTFRÄSER | [2015/39] | English: | CORNER RADIUS END MILL | [2015/39] | French: | FRAISE À QUEUE À RAYON DE BEC | [2015/39] | Entry into regional phase | 13.06.2015 | National basic fee paid | 13.06.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.06.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.06.2015 | Examination requested [2015/39] | 29.12.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.08.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.02.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 16.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 30.03.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.09.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 15.09.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.09.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.07.2016 | Opposition(s) | 02.08.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.11.2013 | AL | 01.11.2017 | CY | 01.11.2017 | DK | 01.11.2017 | EE | 01.11.2017 | ES | 01.11.2017 | FI | 01.11.2017 | HR | 01.11.2017 | LT | 01.11.2017 | LV | 01.11.2017 | MC | 01.11.2017 | MK | 01.11.2017 | RO | 01.11.2017 | RS | 01.11.2017 | SI | 01.11.2017 | SK | 01.11.2017 | SM | 01.11.2017 | IE | 05.11.2017 | LU | 05.11.2017 | MT | 05.11.2017 | CH | 30.11.2017 | LI | 30.11.2017 | BG | 01.02.2018 | NO | 01.02.2018 | GR | 02.02.2018 | IS | 01.03.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2019/51] | HU | 05.11.2013 | |
CY | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
ES | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
MC | 01.11.2017 | ||
MK | 01.11.2017 | ||
RO | 01.11.2017 | ||
RS | 01.11.2017 | ||
SI | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
IE | 05.11.2017 | ||
LU | 05.11.2017 | ||
MT | 05.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 05.11.2013 | |
CY | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
ES | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
MC | 01.11.2017 | ||
RO | 01.11.2017 | ||
RS | 01.11.2017 | ||
SI | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
IE | 05.11.2017 | ||
LU | 05.11.2017 | ||
MT | 05.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | CY | 01.11.2017 | |
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
ES | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
MC | 01.11.2017 | ||
RO | 01.11.2017 | ||
RS | 01.11.2017 | ||
SI | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
IE | 05.11.2017 | ||
LU | 05.11.2017 | ||
MT | 05.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | CY | 01.11.2017 | |
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
ES | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
RO | 01.11.2017 | ||
RS | 01.11.2017 | ||
SI | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
IE | 05.11.2017 | ||
LU | 05.11.2017 | ||
MT | 05.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/45] | CY | 01.11.2017 | |
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
ES | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
RO | 01.11.2017 | ||
RS | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
IE | 05.11.2017 | ||
LU | 05.11.2017 | ||
MT | 05.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CY | 01.11.2017 | |
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
ES | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
RO | 01.11.2017 | ||
RS | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
LU | 05.11.2017 | ||
MT | 05.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | CY | 01.11.2017 | |
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
ES | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
RO | 01.11.2017 | ||
RS | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
LU | 05.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/38] | CY | 01.11.2017 | |
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
ES | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
RS | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
LU | 05.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 01.11.2017 | |
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
ES | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
RS | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 01.11.2017 | |
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
ES | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
RS | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | ES | 01.11.2017 | |
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
RS | 01.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | ES | 01.11.2017 | |
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP1348508 (HITACHI TOOL ENG [JP]) [A] 1-25 * figure - *; | [A]JP2006297495 (DIJET IND CO LTD) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [A]EP1759795 (OSG CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1* figures 1,9 *; | [A]JP5016737B (.) [A] 1-25 * figures 2,4,11 * | by applicant | US2011217132 |