EP3049259 - DEVICE AND ASSEMBLY FOR DETECTING TIRE PARAMETERS OF TRANSITING VEHICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.07.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.08.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.03.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | 19.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STE Industries s.r.l. Via Oslavia 17 Interno 8/D 20134 Milano / IT | [2023/37] |
Former [2022/11] | For all designated states STE Industries s.r.l. Via Oslavia 17 Interno 8/D 20134 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2016/31] | For all designated states STE s.r.l. Via Bistolfi 49 20134 Milano / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOIRAGHI, Paolo Maria Via delle Betulle 3 I-27020 Marcignago Frazione Divisa / IT | 02 /
CORTESE, Mauro Via Leonardo da Vinci 61 I-20812 Limbiate / IT | [2016/31] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Modiano & Partners Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | [2023/37] |
Former [2016/31] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Modiano Gardi Patents SAS Via Meravigli 16 20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 13811013.5 | 25.09.2013 | [2016/31] | WO2013IT00256 | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015044966 | Date: | 02.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3049259 | Date: | 03.08.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.04.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3049259 | Date: | 13.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.04.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G07C5/00, B60C23/04 | [2023/10] | CPC: |
B60C23/0479 (EP,KR,US);
B60C23/04 (RU);
B60C23/0433 (US);
B61L1/08 (RU);
G07C5/008 (EP,KR,US);
H04Q2209/40 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2016/31] | B60C23/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/31] | Extension states | BA | 20.04.2016 | ME | 20.04.2016 | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND ANORDNUNG ZUR ERFASSUNG VON REIFENPARAMETERN VON DURCHFAHRENDEN FAHRZEUGEN | [2016/31] | English: | DEVICE AND ASSEMBLY FOR DETECTING TIRE PARAMETERS OF TRANSITING VEHICLES | [2016/31] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET ENSEMBLE POUR DÉTECTER DES PARAMÈTRES DE PNEUMATIQUES DE VÉHICULES EN MOUVEMENT | [2016/31] | Entry into regional phase | 20.04.2016 | National basic fee paid | 20.04.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.04.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.04.2016 | Examination requested [2016/31] | 05.12.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.07.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.10.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 03.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.07.2022 | Opposition(s) | 14.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 18.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2020 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   02.11.2020 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 13.09.2023 | HR | 13.09.2023 | MC | 13.09.2023 | RO | 13.09.2023 | RS | 13.09.2023 | SK | 13.09.2023 | SM | 13.09.2023 | IE | 25.09.2023 | CH | 30.09.2023 | NO | 13.12.2023 | GR | 14.12.2023 | IS | 13.01.2024 | [2024/34] |
Former [2024/33] | CZ | 13.09.2023 | |
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
MC | 13.09.2023 | ||
RO | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SK | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
IE | 25.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | CZ | 13.09.2023 | |
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
MC | 13.09.2023 | ||
RO | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SK | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | CZ | 13.09.2023 | |
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
RO | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SK | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HR | 13.09.2023 | |
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/11] | HR | 13.09.2023 | |
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | NO | 13.12.2023 | |
GR | 14.12.2023 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2005072993 (TRANSENSE TECHNOLOGIES PLC [GB], et al); | [XY]JP2008100613 (BRIDGESTONE CORP); | [Y]US2012176233 (PETRUCELLI STEVEN [US], et al) | Examination | EP1787831 | US2011298603 |