EP2936115 - FLUID COMPOSITION ANALYSIS DEVICE AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.01.2018 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.02.2018 [2018/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Danmarks Tekniske Universitet Anker Engelundsvej 1 Bygning 101 A 2800 Lyngby / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2015/44] | For all designated states Danmarks Tekniske Universitet Anker Engelundsvej 1 Bygning 101 A 2800 Lyngby / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OKKELS, Fridolin Halfdansgade 33 2.sal DK-2300 Copenhagen Ø / DK | [2015/44] | Representative(s) | Plougmann Vingtoft a/s Strandvejen 70 2900 Hellerup / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2015/44] | Plougmann & Vingtoft A/S Rued Langgaards Vej 8 2300 Copenhagen S / DK | Application number, filing date | 13811364.2 | 19.12.2013 | [2015/44] | WO2013DK50447 | Priority number, date | EP20120198606 | 20.12.2012 Original published format: EP 12198606 | [2015/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014094791 | Date: | 26.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2936115 | Date: | 28.10.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.06.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.06.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G01N11/08 | [2015/44] | CPC: |
G01N11/08 (EP,US);
G01N11/04 (US);
B01L3/502746 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0816 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0864 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0883 (EP,US);
B01L2400/086 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/44] | Title | German: | ANALYSEVORRICHTUNG UND -VERFAHREN FÜR EINE FLÜSSIGKEITSZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2015/44] | English: | FLUID COMPOSITION ANALYSIS DEVICE AND METHOD | [2015/44] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET MÉTHODE D'ANALYSE DE COMPOSITION DE FLUIDE | [2015/44] | Entry into regional phase | 01.07.2015 | National basic fee paid | 01.07.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.07.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.07.2015 | Examination requested [2015/44] | 05.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.09.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/09] | 19.10.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/09] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.03.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US3952576 (DRZEWIECKI TADEUSZ M, et al) [X] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [A]US4905503 (LANGRICK DAVID J [GB]) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9115750 (CARRI MED LTD [GB]) [A] 1,17* figure 1 *; | [A]US2003182991 (SPAID MICHAEL A [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [X]WO2005086883 (RHEOSENSE INC [US], et al) [X] 1-17 * page 15, line 7 - page 17, line 19; figure 23 *; | [X]US2009090172 (ANGELESCU DAN E [US], et al) [X] 1-17 * the whole document * | Examination | WO2012175093 | by applicant | WO2009061943 | - HELE ET AL., "Blood rheological characterization using the thickness-shear mode resonator", BIOSENSORS AND BIOELECTRONICS, (2004), vol. 19, page 1657 |