EP2917346 - BACTERIAL ENGINEERING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.04.2019 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.05.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.03.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.02.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.09.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, MK | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bactevo Ltd Merrifield Centre Rosemary Lane Cambridge Cambridgeshire CB1 3LQ / GB | [2018/23] |
Former [2015/38] | For all designated states Bactevo Ltd Merrifield Centre Rosemary Lane Cambridge Cambridgeshire CB1 3LQ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WILLIAMS, David Hugh c/o Discuva Limited 260 Science Park Milton Road Cambridge Cambridgeshire CB4 0WE / GB | 02 /
TURNER, Arthur Keith c/o Discuva Limited 260 Science Park Milton Road Cambridge Cambridgeshire CB4 0WE / GB | 03 /
WAIN, John Richard c/o Discuva Limited 260 Science Park Milton Road Cambridge Cambridgeshire CB4 0WE / GB | [2015/38] | Representative(s) | Hutchins, Michael Richard Schlich 9 St Catherine's Road Littlehampton, West Sussex BN17 5HS / GB | [2018/23] |
Former [2015/38] | EIP Fairfax House 15 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 13811606.6 | 05.11.2013 | [2015/38] | WO2013GB52893 | Priority number, date | GB20120019989 | 06.11.2012 Original published format: GB 201219989 | [2015/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014072697 | Date: | 15.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2917346 | Date: | 16.09.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.05.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2917346 | Date: | 06.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.05.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/10 | [2015/38] | CPC: |
C12N15/1058 (EP,US);
C12N15/102 (EP,US);
C12N15/1082 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/38] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BAKTERIEN-ENGINEERING | [2015/38] | English: | BACTERIAL ENGINEERING | [2015/38] | French: | INGÉNIERIE BACTÉRIENNE | [2015/38] | Entry into regional phase | 08.06.2015 | National basic fee paid | 08.06.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.06.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.06.2015 | Examination requested [2015/38] | 02.11.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.12.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.06.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.02.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 28.03.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.04.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 25.04.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.04.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.11.2016 | Opposition(s) | 07.03.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.11.2013 | AL | 06.06.2018 | AT | 06.06.2018 | CY | 06.06.2018 | CZ | 06.06.2018 | DK | 06.06.2018 | EE | 06.06.2018 | ES | 06.06.2018 | FI | 06.06.2018 | HR | 06.06.2018 | IT | 06.06.2018 | LT | 06.06.2018 | LV | 06.06.2018 | MC | 06.06.2018 | MK | 06.06.2018 | NL | 06.06.2018 | PL | 06.06.2018 | PT | 06.06.2018 | RO | 06.06.2018 | RS | 06.06.2018 | SE | 06.06.2018 | SI | 06.06.2018 | SK | 06.06.2018 | SM | 06.06.2018 | TR | 06.06.2018 | BG | 06.09.2018 | NO | 06.09.2018 | GR | 07.09.2018 | IS | 06.10.2018 | IE | 05.11.2018 | LU | 05.11.2018 | MT | 05.11.2018 | BE | 30.11.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/28] | AL | 06.06.2018 | |
AT | 06.06.2018 | ||
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
DK | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
IT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
MC | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
PT | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SI | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
TR | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
IE | 05.11.2018 | ||
LU | 05.11.2018 | ||
MT | 05.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 06.06.2018 | |
AT | 06.06.2018 | ||
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
DK | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
IT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
MC | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SI | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
TR | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
IE | 05.11.2018 | ||
LU | 05.11.2018 | ||
MT | 05.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 06.06.2018 | |
AT | 06.06.2018 | ||
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
DK | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
IT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
MC | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SI | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
IE | 05.11.2018 | ||
LU | 05.11.2018 | ||
MT | 05.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 06.06.2018 | |
AT | 06.06.2018 | ||
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
DK | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
IT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
MC | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SI | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
IE | 05.11.2018 | ||
LU | 05.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AT | 06.06.2018 | |
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
DK | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
IT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
MC | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SI | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
IE | 05.11.2018 | ||
LU | 05.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AT | 06.06.2018 | |
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
DK | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
IT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
MC | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SI | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
LU | 05.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/33] | AT | 06.06.2018 | |
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
DK | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
IT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
MC | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SI | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 06.06.2018 | |
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
DK | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
IT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SI | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 06.06.2018 | |
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
IT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 06.06.2018 | |
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | ES | 06.06.2018 | |
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2009104682 (KIM SUN-CHANG [KR], et al) [Y] 2-10 * the whole document *; | [XYI] - GEMMA C LANGRIDGE ET AL, "Simultaneous assay of every Salmonella Typhi gene using one million transposon mutants", vol. 19, no. 12, doi:10.1101/GR.097097.109, ISSN 1088-9051, (20091201), pages 2308 - 2316, GENOME RESEARCH, COLD SPRING HARBOR LABORATORY PRESS, WOODBURY, NY, US, URL: http://genome.cshlp.org/content/19/12/2308, (20091013), XP002682200 [X] 1,11,12,17,18,21-29,31,33,37-43 * Abstract; page 2308, column 2, paragraph l - page 2309, column 1, paragraphs 1,2; table 1 * * page 2310, column 2, paragraph l - page 2312, column 1, paragraph 1; figure 4 * * page 2314, column 1, paragraph l - page 2314, column 2, paragraph 1 * * page 2314, column 2, paragraph l - page 2315, column 2, paragraph 3 * [Y] 2-10,13-16,19,20 [I] 30,32,34-36 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1101/GR.097097.109 | [Y] - MAUS C E ET AL, "Mutation of tlyA Confers Capreomycin Resistance in Mycobacterium tuberculosis", ANTIMICROBIAL AGENTS AND CHEMOTHERAPY, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY, US, (20050201), vol. 49, no. 2, doi:10.1128/AAC.49.2.571-577.2005, ISSN 0066-4804, pages 571 - 577, XP007901245 [Y] 2-10,13-16,19,20 * abstract; page 572, column 1, paragraph 3; figure 1 * * page 572, column 2, paragraph l - page 573, column 2, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/AAC.49.2.571-577.2005 | [Y] - JUN LIN ET AL, "Systematic Identification of Genetic Loci Required for Polymyxin Resistance in Campylobacter jejuni Using an Efficient In Vivo Transposon Mutagenesis System", FOODBORNE PATHOGENS AND DISEASE, MARY ANN LIEBERT, INC. PUBLISHERS, US, vol. 6, no. 2, doi:10.1089/FPD.2008.0177, ISSN 1535-3141, (20090301), pages 173 - 185, (20081223), XP002682201 [Y] 2-10,13-16,19,20 * page 174, column 1, paragraph 2 - page 174, column 2, paragraph 2 * * Abstract; page 175, column 1, paragraph 2 - page 175, column 2, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1089/FPD.2008.0177 | [Y] - HARE R S ET AL, "Genetic footprinting in bacteria", JOURNAL OF BACTERIOLOGY, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY, WASHINGTON, DC; US, (20010301), vol. 183, no. 5, doi:10.1128/JB.183.5.1694-1706.2001, ISSN 0021-9193, pages 1694 - 1706, XP002243541 [Y] 2-10,13-16,19,20 * Abstract; page 1697, column 1, paragraph 2 - page 1698, column 2, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JB.183.5.1694-1706.2001 | [Y] - TONG X ET AL, "Genome-scale identification of conditionally essential genes in E. coli by DNA microarrays", BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, ACADEMIC PRESS INC. ORLANDO, FL, US, (20040910), vol. 322, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.BBRC.2004.07.110, ISSN 0006-291X, pages 347 - 354, XP004526740 [Y] 2-10,13-16,19,20 * Abstract; page 348, column 1, paragraph 4 - page 348, column 2, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bbrc.2004.07.110 | [Y] - JIAO YONGQIN ET AL, "Isolation and characterization of a genetically tractable photo autotrophic Fe(II)-oxidizing bacterium, Rhodopseudomonas palustris strain TIE-1", APPLIED AND ENVIRONMENTAL MICROBIOLOGY, (200508), vol. 71, no. 8, ISSN 0099-2240, pages 4487 - 4496, XP002720185 [Y] 2-10,13-16,19,20 * Abstract; page 4488, column 1, paragraph 2 * * page 4489, column 1, paragraph 4 * * page 4489, column 2, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/AEM.71.8.4487-4496.2005 | [Y] - PUTRINS MARTA ET AL, The impact of ColRS two-component system and TtgABC efflux pump on phenol tolerance of Pseudomonas putida becomes evident only in growing bacteria, BMC MICROBIOLOGY, VOL. 10, PAGE(S) ARTICLE NO.: 110, (201004), ISSN 1471-2180, XP002720186 [Y] 2-10,13-16,19,20 * Abstract; page 2, column 2, paragraph l - page 3, column 1, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1471-2180-10-110 | [Y] - KOMATSU MAMORU ET AL, Genome-minimized Streptomyces host for the heterologous expression of secondary metabolism., PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA 9 FEB 2010, VOL. 107, NR. 6, PAGE(S) 2646 - 2651, (20100209), ISSN 1091-6490, XP002720187 [Y] 13-16,19,20 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.0914833107 | [A] - CIAMPI M S ET AL, "TRANSPOSON TN-10 PROVIDES A PROMOTER FOR TRANSCRIPTION OF ADJACENT SEQUENCES", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, US, (19820801), vol. 79, no. 16, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 5016 - 5020, XP002682203 [A] 1-43 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.79.16.5016 | Examination | - S. J. Salipante ET AL, "GeneHunter, a Transposon Tool for Identification and Isolation of Cryptic Antibiotic Resistance Genes", ANTIMICROBIAL AGENTS AND CHEMOTHERAPY, (20031201), vol. 47, no. 12, doi:10.1128/AAC.47.12.3840-3845.2003, ISSN 0066-4804, pages 3840 - 3845, XP055270336 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/AAC.47.12.3840-3845.2003 | by applicant | WO0107651 | WO2008024129 | - KOMATSU ET AL., PNAS, (2010), vol. 107, no. 6, pages 2646 - 2651 | - LANGRIDGE ET AL., GENOME RESEARCH, (2009), vol. 19, pages 2308 - 2316 | - GAWRONSKI ET AL., PNAS, (2009), vol. 106, pages 16422 - 16427 | - GOODMAN ET AL., CELL HOST MICROBE, (2009), vol. 6, pages 279 - 289 | - VAN OPIJNEN ET AL., NAT. METHODS, (2009), vol. 6, pages 767 - 772 | - GALLAGHER ET AL., MBIO, (2011), vol. 2, no. 1, pages E00315 - 10 | - MADYAGOL ET AL., FOLIA MICROBIOL, (2011), vol. 56, pages 253 - 263 | - TROESCHEL ET AL., METHODS MOL BIOL., (2010), vol. 668, pages 117 - 39 | - KIM ET AL., CURR MICROBIOL., (2008), vol. 57, no. 4, pages 391 - 394 | - ALTSCHUL ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1990), vol. 215, pages 403 - 410 | - ALTSCHUL ET AL., NUCL. ACIDS RES., (1997), vol. 25, pages 3389 - 3402 |