EP2941339 - BLOCK CARRIER WITH INTEGRATED CONTINUOUS MOULDING DEVICE FOR THERMOSOFTENING PLASTICS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.11.2018 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.11.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.12.2018 [2018/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Maag Automatik GmbH Ostring 19 63762 Großostheim / DE | [2015/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZANG, Harald Am Wingert 27 63801 Kleinostheim / DE | [2015/46] | Representative(s) | Spranger, Stephan Spranger + Burger Patentanwälte Widenmayerstrasse 28 80538 München / DE | [2015/46] | Application number, filing date | 13811792.4 | 17.12.2013 | [2015/46] | WO2013EP03815 | Priority number, date | DE20121025259 | 21.12.2012 Original published format: DE102012025259 | [2015/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014095042 | Date: | 26.06.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2941339 | Date: | 11.11.2015 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.06.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.06.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B29C47/36, B29C47/08, B29C47/74, B29C47/30, B29B9/06 | [2015/46] | CPC: |
B29B9/065 (EP,US);
B29B9/06 (US);
B29C48/0022 (EP,US);
B29C48/05 (EP,US);
B29C48/2556 (EP,US);
B29C48/345 (EP,US);
B29C48/37 (EP,US);
B29C48/745 (EP,US);
B29C2793/009 (EP,US);
B29C48/04 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/46] | Title | German: | BLOCKTRÄGER MIT INTEGRIERTER STRANGGIEßEINRICHTUNG FÜR THERMOPLASTISCHE KUNSTSTOFFE | [2015/46] | English: | BLOCK CARRIER WITH INTEGRATED CONTINUOUS MOULDING DEVICE FOR THERMOSOFTENING PLASTICS | [2015/46] | French: | PORTE-BLOC AVEC SYSTÈME DE COULÉE CONTINUE INTÉGRÉ POUR MATIÈRES SYNTHÉTIQUES THERMOPLASTIQUES | [2015/46] | Entry into regional phase | 17.07.2015 | National basic fee paid | 17.07.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.07.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.07.2015 | Examination requested [2015/46] | 13.04.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.07.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/49] | 27.07.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2017 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]JPS5967215U (N.N) [X] 1,3,11 * figures 1-2 * [Y] 5,6; | [XYI]US4890996 (SHIMIZU NOBUAKI [JP]) [X] 1,2,4,7-10,13-16 * abstract * * column 2, line 31 - column 3, line 6 * * figures 4a, 4b * [Y] 5,6 [I] 12; | [A]JPH06238657 (KOBE STEEL LTD) [A] 1-16 * abstract ** figures 1-3 *; | [Y]JPH0996281 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD) [Y] 5,6 * abstract * * figure 3 *; | [XY]US5723082 (MIZUGUCHI HIDEKI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4,7-9,13-16 * abstract * * column 2, lines 38-49 * * column 3, lines 41-59 * * figures 3a,3b * [Y] 5,6; | [A]EP0894594 (MITSUBISHI CHEMICAL MKV CO [JP]) [A] 1-16 * abstract * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]WO2006041098 (JAPAN STEEL WORKS LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-16 * figure 5 *; | [A]JP2009248533 (JAPAN STEEL WORKS LTD) [A] 1-16 * abstract * * figures 1,4 * |