EP2925817 - AMINO SUBSTITUTED PERI-ARYLENE DYE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.06.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.06.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.07.2017 [2017/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ludwig-Maximilians-Universität München Geschwister-Scholl-Platz 1 80539 München / DE | [2015/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LANGHALS, Heinz Eichendorffstr. 40 85521 Ottobrunn / DE | 02 /
HOFER, Alexander Marienburgweg 27 82538 Geretsried / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/41] | 01 /
LANGHALS, Heinz Eichendorffstr. 40 85521 Ottobrunn / DE | ||
02 /
HOFER, Alexander Hohenwaldeckstr. 12 81541 München / DE | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2015/41] | Application number, filing date | 13811806.2 | 26.11.2013 | [2015/41] | WO2013EP74770 | Priority number, date | DE20121023247 | 27.11.2012 Original published format: DE102012023247 | [2015/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2014083011 | Date: | 05.06.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/23] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2925817 | Date: | 07.10.2015 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.06.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.07.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C09B5/62, H01L31/055 | [2015/41] | CPC: |
C09B5/62 (EP);
C07D471/06 (EP);
C07D471/16 (EP);
H10K85/621 (EP);
H01G9/2031 (EP);
H01G9/2059 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/41] | Title | German: | AMINOSUBSTITUIERTE PERI-ARYLENFARBSTOFFE | [2015/41] | English: | AMINO SUBSTITUTED PERI-ARYLENE DYE | [2015/41] | French: | COLORANTS À BASE DE PÉRI-ARYLÈNE À SUBSTITUTION AMINO | [2015/41] | Entry into regional phase | 18.06.2015 | National basic fee paid | 18.06.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.06.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.05.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.06.2015 | Examination requested [2015/41] | 30.08.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.01.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/27] | 15.02.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2017/27] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.08.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2016 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2008222605 ; | [A]DE19848555 (LANGHALS HEINZ [DE]) [A] 6,12-14* page 29; compound 16 *; | [A]DE102007004016 (LANGHALS HEINZ [DE]) [A] 1,6-8,12-14 * figure 7 *; | [AD]WO2009074675 (CIBA HOLDING INC [CH], et al) [AD] 4,5,11-14 * page 1 - page 4; compound - *; | DE102007059683 [ ] (LANGHALS HEINZ [DE]); | [A]WO2011092028 (UNIV MUENCHEN L MAXIMILIANS [DE], et al) [A] 4,5,11-14 * compound - *; | [A] - BATTAGLIARIN, GLAUCO; LI, CHEN; ENKELMANN, VOLKER; MULLEN, KLAUS, "2,5,8,11-Tetraboronic Ester Perylenediimides: A Next Generation Building Block for Dye-Stuff Synthesis", ORGANIC LETTERS, (2011), vol. 13, no. 12, pages 3012 - 3015, XP002724125 [A] 6,9,12-14 * scheme 3; page 3014 * * page 3012 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ol2008457 | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2008, no. 75, Database accession no. 2008-M70308, XP002724126 & JP2008222605 A 20080925 (CHISSO CORP) [A] 6,12-14 * abstract * * page 8 - page 9 * | Examination | DE102005021362 | DE102011018815 |