EP2928889 - COMPOUNDS HAVING MUSCARINIC RECEPTOR ANTAGONIST AND BETA2 ADRENERGIC RECEPTOR AGONIST ACTIVITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.01.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.02.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.10.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.01.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.02.2019 [2019/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chiesi Farmaceutici S.p.A. Via Palermo, 26/A 43100 Parma / IT | [2015/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RANCATI, Fabio c/o CHIESI FARMACEUTICI S.p.A. Via Palermo 26/A I-43100 Parma / IT | 02 /
LINNEY, Ian c/o CHIESI FARMACEUTICI S.p.A. Via Palermo 26/A I-43100 Parma / IT | [2015/42] | Representative(s) | Bianchetti & Minoja with Trevisan & Cuonzo IPS SRL Via Plinio, 63 20129 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2015/42] | Bianchetti Bracco Minoja S.r.l. Via Plinio, 63 20129 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 13811827.8 | 05.12.2013 | [2015/42] | WO2013EP75661 | Priority number, date | EP20120195891 | 06.12.2012 Original published format: EP 12195891 | [2015/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014086924 | Date: | 12.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2928889 | Date: | 14.10.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.06.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2928889 | Date: | 21.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.06.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C07D453/02 | [2015/42] | CPC: |
C07D453/02 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61K31/439 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61K31/4709 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61K45/06 (CN,KR,US);
A61K9/0073 (KR);
A61K9/12 (KR);
A61M11/005 (CN,US);
A61M15/003 (CN,US);
A61M15/0045 (CN,KR,US);
A61M15/0065 (CN,US);
A61M15/009 (CN,KR,US);
A61M16/14 (CN,KR,US);
A61P11/00 (EP,US);
A61P29/00 (EP,US);
A61M2202/064 (CN,US);
C07D215/38 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/42] | Extension states | BA | 04.06.2015 | ME | 04.06.2015 | Title | German: | VERBINDUNGEN MIT MUSKARINREZEPTORANTAGONISTEN- UND BETA2-ADRENERGEN-REZEPTORAGONISTENAKTIVITÄT | [2017/42] | English: | COMPOUNDS HAVING MUSCARINIC RECEPTOR ANTAGONIST AND BETA2 ADRENERGIC RECEPTOR AGONIST ACTIVITY | [2015/42] | French: | COMPOSÉS DOTÉS DE L'ANTAGONISTE DE RÉCEPTEUR MUSCARINIQUE ET ACTIVITÉ D'AGONISTE DE RÉCEPTEUR ADRÉNERGIQUE BÊTA2 | [2017/42] |
Former [2015/42] | VERBINDUNGEN MIT MUSKARINREZEPTORANTAGONISTEN- UND BETA2-ADRENERGEN-REZEPTORAGONISTEN-AKTIVITÄT | ||
Former [2015/42] | COMPOSÉS AYANT UNE ACTIVITÉ ANTAGONISTE DU RÉCEPTEUR MUSCARINIQUE ET AGONISTE DU RÉCEPTEUR BÊTA2 ADRÉNERGIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 04.06.2015 | National basic fee paid | 04.06.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.06.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.06.2015 | Examination requested [2015/42] | 15.01.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.10.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.05.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.02.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 12.02.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.02.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP18156043.4 / EP3345904 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.07.2016 | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 21.03.2018 | SM | 21.03.2018 | [2018/52] |
Former [2018/46] | AL | 21.03.2018 | Cited in | International search | [YD]WO2005115467 (ALMIRALL PRODESFARMA SA [ES], et al) [YD] 1,3,5-10 * claims 1, 12, 14 *; | [Y]US2009181935 (VILLETTI GINO [IT], et al) [Y] 1,3,5-10 * claims 1, 46 * * examples 1-2 *; | [XDP]WO2012168359 (CHIESI FARMA SPA [IT], et al) [XDP] 1-10 * claims 1, 14-17 * * examples 1-5, 9, 11-20, 1B, 2B, etc. *; | [Y] - ADAM D. HUGHES ET AL, "Discovery of muscarinic acetylcholine receptor antagonist and beta 2 adrenoceptor agonist (MABA) dual pharmacology molecules", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, (20110301), vol. 21, no. 5, doi:10.1016/j.bmcl.2011.01.043, ISSN 0960-894X, pages 1354 - 1358, XP055011968 [Y] 1,3,5-10 * compound 29 * * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bmcl.2011.01.043 | by applicant | US2222128 | WO0069468 | WO2004032921 | WO2004074246 | WO2004074812 | WO2005051946 | WO2005080324 | US2005215590 | WO2005092861 | WO2005115467 | WO2006023457 | WO2006023460 | WO2007107228 | WO2010123766 | WO2011048409 | WO2012168359 | - TETRAHEDRON: ASYMMETRY, (2002), vol. 13, pages 303 - 310 | - REMINGTON, Remington's Pharmaceutical Sciences Handbook, XVII Ed.,, MACK PUB. | WO2012EP60795 |