EP2925694 - GLASS CONTAINERS WITH DELAMINATION RESISTANCE AND IMPROVED DAMAGE TOLERANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.06.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.06.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.02.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU, MK | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Corning Incorporated 1 Riverfront Plaza Corning, New York 14831 / US | [2018/31] |
Former [2015/41] | For all designated states Corning Incorporated 1 Riverfront Plaza Corning, New York 14831 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHANG, Theresa 21 Katie Lane Painted Post, NY 14870 / US | 02 /
DANIELSON, Paul, Stephen 5347 Dutch Street Dundee, NY 14837 / US | 03 /
DEMARTINO, Steven, Edward 10202 Bennett Road Painted Post, NY 14870 / US | 04 /
FADEEV, Andrei, Gennadyevich 214 Lancelot Drive Elmira, NY 14903 / US | 05 /
MORENA, Robert, Michael 10904 Browntown Road Lindley, NY 14858 / US | 06 /
PAL, Santona 53 South Oakwood Drive Painted Post, NY 14870 / US | 07 /
PEANASKY, John, Stephen 2730 County Line Drive Big Flats, NY 14814 / US | 08 /
SCHAUT, Robert, Anthony 8 Jacqueline Drive Painted Post, NY 14870 / US | 09 /
VENKATARAMAN, Natesan 3 Tara Place Painted Post, NY 14870 / US | 10 /
VERKLEEREN, Ronald, Luce 356 Eacher Hollow Road Horseheads, NY 14845 / US | 11 /
TIMMONS, Christopher, Lee 2897 Downing Street Big Flats, NY 14814 / US | 12 /
BOOKBINDER, Dana Craig 2675 Davis Road Corning New York 14830 / US | [2017/29] |
Former [2015/41] | 01 /
CHANG, Theresa 21 Katie Lane Painted Post, NY 14870 / US | ||
02 /
DANIELSON, Paul, Stephen 5347 Dutch Street Dundee, NY 14837 / US | |||
03 /
DEMARTINO, Steven, Edward 10202 Bennett Road Painted Post, NY 14870 / US | |||
04 /
FADEEV, Andrei, Gennadyevich 214 Lancelot Drive Elmira, NY 14903 / US | |||
05 /
MORENA, Robert, Michael 10904 Browntown Road Lindley, NY 14858 / US | |||
06 /
PAL, Santona 53 South Oakwood Drive Painted Post, NY 14870 / US | |||
07 /
PEANASKY, John, Stephen 2730 County Line Drive Big Flats, NY 14814 / US | |||
08 /
SCHAUT, Robert, Anthony 8 Jacqueline Drive Painted Post, NY 14870 / US | |||
09 /
VENKATARAMAN, Natesan 3 Tara Place Painted Post, NY 14870 / US | |||
10 /
VERKLEEREN, Ronald, Luce 356 Eacher Hollow Road Horseheads, NY 14845 / US | |||
11 /
TIMMONS, Christopher, Lee 2897 Downing Street Big Flats, NY 14814 / US | Representative(s) | Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/31] | Scott, Mark Andrew, et al Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | ||
Former [2015/41] | Greene, Simon Kenneth Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 13812242.9 | 22.11.2013 | [2015/41] | WO2013US71460 | Priority number, date | US201261731767P | 30.11.2012 Original published format: US 201261731767 P | US201313780754 | 28.02.2013 Original published format: US201313780754 | US201313912457 | 07.06.2013 Original published format: US201313912457 | US201314075620 | 08.11.2013 Original published format: US201314075620 | [2015/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014085246 | Date: | 05.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2925694 | Date: | 07.10.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.06.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2925694 | Date: | 01.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.06.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C03C17/00, C03C17/30, C03C17/32, C03C17/42, C03C21/00, B32B17/06, B65D25/14, C09D179/08, B65D23/08, B65D1/40 | [2015/41] | CPC: |
B65D1/0207 (EP,US);
C03C17/005 (EP,KR,RU,US);
A61J1/1468 (RU,US);
A61J1/065 (RU,US);
B32B17/06 (US);
B65D1/0215 (EP,RU,US);
B65D1/40 (EP,KR,US);
B65D1/42 (RU);
B65D23/02 (EP,RU,US);
B65D23/0814 (EP,KR,US);
B65D23/0821 (EP,RU,US);
B65D25/14 (US);
B65D25/34 (KR,US);
B65D65/42 (US);
C03B23/04 (US);
C03C15/02 (EP,US);
C03C17/22 (RU,US);
C03C17/30 (KR,RU,US);
C03C17/32 (KR,US);
C03C17/3405 (EP,US);
C03C17/42 (EP,KR,US);
C03C21/002 (EP,RU,US);
C08G73/105 (KR);
C08G73/1071 (KR);
C09D179/08 (US);
C03C2217/78 (EP,KR,US);
C03C2218/111 (EP,KR,US);
Y10T428/13 (EP,US);
Y10T428/131 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1317 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/41] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GLASARTIKEL MIT REIBUNGSARMEN BESCHICHTUNGEN | [2018/06] | English: | GLASS CONTAINERS WITH DELAMINATION RESISTANCE AND IMPROVED DAMAGE TOLERANCE | [2015/41] | French: | ARTICLES EN VERRE AYANT DES REVÊTEMENTS À FAIBLE FROTTEMENT | [2018/06] |
Former [2015/41] | GLASBEHÄLTER MIT DELAMINIERUNGSFESTIGKEIT UND VERBESSERTER SCHADENSTOLERANZ | ||
Former [2015/41] | RÉCIPIENTS EN VERRE AYANT UNE RÉSISTANCE AU DÉLAMINAGE ET UNE TOLÉRANCE À L'ENDOMMAGEMENT AMÉLIORÉE | Entry into regional phase | 28.05.2015 | National basic fee paid | 28.05.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.05.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.05.2015 | Examination requested [2015/41] | 18.01.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.09.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.06.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 21.06.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.06.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP18176115.6 / EP3406578 | EP21163729.3 / EP3858797 | EP21194885.6 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.02.2017 | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.11.2013 | AL | 01.08.2018 | AT | 01.08.2018 | CY | 01.08.2018 | CZ | 01.08.2018 | DK | 01.08.2018 | EE | 01.08.2018 | ES | 01.08.2018 | FI | 01.08.2018 | HR | 01.08.2018 | LT | 01.08.2018 | LV | 01.08.2018 | MC | 01.08.2018 | MK | 01.08.2018 | NL | 01.08.2018 | PL | 01.08.2018 | PT | 01.08.2018 | RO | 01.08.2018 | RS | 01.08.2018 | SE | 01.08.2018 | SI | 01.08.2018 | SK | 01.08.2018 | SM | 01.08.2018 | TR | 01.08.2018 | BG | 01.11.2018 | NO | 01.11.2018 | GR | 02.11.2018 | IE | 22.11.2018 | LU | 22.11.2018 | MT | 22.11.2018 | BE | 30.11.2018 | CH | 30.11.2018 | LI | 30.11.2018 | IS | 01.12.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/28] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
AT | 01.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
DK | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
MC | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PT | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SI | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
SM | 01.08.2018 | ||
TR | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IE | 22.11.2018 | ||
LU | 22.11.2018 | ||
MT | 22.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
AT | 01.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
DK | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
MC | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SI | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
SM | 01.08.2018 | ||
TR | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IE | 22.11.2018 | ||
LU | 22.11.2018 | ||
MT | 22.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
AT | 01.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
DK | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
MC | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SI | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
SM | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IE | 22.11.2018 | ||
LU | 22.11.2018 | ||
MT | 22.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
AT | 01.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
DK | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
MC | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SI | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
SM | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IE | 22.11.2018 | ||
LU | 22.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
AT | 01.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
DK | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
MC | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SI | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
SM | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IE | 22.11.2018 | ||
LU | 22.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
AT | 01.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
DK | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
MC | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SI | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
SM | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
LU | 22.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
AT | 01.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
DK | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
MC | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SI | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
SM | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
LU | 22.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
AT | 01.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
DK | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
MC | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
SM | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
LU | 22.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/33] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
AT | 01.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
DK | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
MC | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
SM | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
AT | 01.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
DK | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
SM | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
AT | 01.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
AT | 01.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
AT | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 01.08.2018 | |
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 01.08.2018 | |
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | FI | 01.08.2018 | |
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 01.08.2018 | |
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 01.08.2018 | Cited in | International search | [Y]SU990700 (BRUSS TI KIROVA [SU]); | RO83460 [ ] (INST DE CHIMIE [RO]); | [Y]US4689085 (PLUEDDEMANN EDWIN P [US]); | [Y]EP0515801 (BASF LACKE & FARBEN [DE]); | [Y]DE29702816U (SCHOTT GLASWERKE [DE]); | [Y]EP2031124 (TNO [NL]); | [IP]WO2013063290 (CORNING INC [US]); | [IP]WO2013130724 (CORNING INC [US]); | [E]WO2014005030 (CORNING INC [US], et al); | by applicant | US2106744 | US3577256 | US4023953 | US4055441 | US4595548 | US4680373 | US4880895 | US6232428 | US6277950 | US6444783 | US6715316 | WO2007016516 | US2008214777 | US7619042 | US2011165393 | US8053492 | US2012282449 | US2013122306 |