EP2900468 - CONDUCTIVE SURFACING MATERIAL FOR COMPOSITE STRUCTURES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.07.2017 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cytec Industries Inc. 5 Garret Mountain Plaza Woodland Park NJ 07424 / US | [2015/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SANG, Junjie, Jeffrey 26 Ohio State Drive Newark, DE 19713 / US | 02 /
KOHLI, Dalip, Kumar 2909 Meadow View Way Churchville, MD 21028 / US | [2015/32] | Representative(s) | Vande Gucht, Anne, et al Solvay S.A. Intellectual Assets Management Rue de Ransbeek, 310 1120 Bruxelles / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/32] | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 13812245.2 | 25.11.2013 | [2016/36] | WO2013US71685 | Priority number, date | US201261733597P | 05.12.2012 Original published format: US 201261733597 P | [2015/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014088866 | Date: | 12.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2900468 | Date: | 05.08.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.06.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2900468 | Date: | 07.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.06.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B32B5/00, C08J5/24, H01B1/22 | [2015/32] | CPC: |
C08J5/243 (EP,RU,US);
B32B15/092 (RU);
H02G13/80 (US);
B32B15/14 (EP,US);
B32B15/20 (EP,US);
B32B37/14 (US);
B32B5/022 (EP,US);
B32B5/12 (EP,US);
B32B5/26 (EP,US);
C08G59/38 (EP,US);
C08J5/249 (EP,RU,US);
C08K7/18 (EP,US);
C08L63/00 (EP,US);
H05K9/0084 (US);
B32B2260/021 (EP,US);
B32B2260/023 (EP,US);
B32B2260/046 (EP,US);
B32B2264/105 (EP,US);
B32B2264/107 (EP,US);
B32B2264/108 (EP,US);
B32B2305/076 (US);
B32B2307/202 (EP,US);
B32B2307/536 (EP,US);
B32B2605/08 (EP,US);
B32B2605/12 (EP,US);
B32B2605/18 (EP,US);
C08L2205/02 (EP,US);
C08L63/04 (RU);
C09D163/00 (EP,US);
H01B1/22 (RU);
Y02T50/40 (EP);
Y10T156/1002 (EP,US);
Y10T428/249974 (EP,US);
Y10T428/252 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08L63/00, C08K7/18, C08L63/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LEITFÄHIGES BESCHICHTUNGSMATERIAL FÜR VERBUNDSTRUKTUREN | [2015/32] | English: | CONDUCTIVE SURFACING MATERIAL FOR COMPOSITE STRUCTURES | [2015/32] | French: | MATIÈRE DE SURFAÇAGE CONDUCTRICE POUR STRUCTURES COMPOSITES | [2015/32] | Entry into regional phase | 29.04.2015 | National basic fee paid | 29.04.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.04.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.04.2015 | Examination requested [2015/32] | 31.07.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.03.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.07.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 19.07.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.07.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.03.2016 | Opposition(s) | 08.06.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.11.2013 | AL | 07.09.2016 | CY | 07.09.2016 | CZ | 07.09.2016 | DK | 07.09.2016 | EE | 07.09.2016 | FI | 07.09.2016 | HR | 07.09.2016 | LT | 07.09.2016 | LV | 07.09.2016 | MC | 07.09.2016 | MK | 07.09.2016 | PL | 07.09.2016 | RO | 07.09.2016 | RS | 07.09.2016 | SI | 07.09.2016 | SK | 07.09.2016 | SM | 07.09.2016 | IE | 25.11.2016 | MT | 25.11.2016 | CH | 30.11.2016 | LI | 30.11.2016 | LU | 30.11.2016 | BG | 07.12.2016 | NO | 07.12.2016 | GR | 08.12.2016 | IS | 07.01.2017 | PT | 09.01.2017 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/43] | HU | 25.11.2013 | |
CY | 07.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2016 | ||
DK | 07.09.2016 | ||
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LV | 07.09.2016 | ||
MC | 07.09.2016 | ||
MK | 07.09.2016 | ||
PL | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
RS | 07.09.2016 | ||
SI | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
SM | 07.09.2016 | ||
IE | 25.11.2016 | ||
MT | 25.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
IS | 07.01.2017 | ||
PT | 09.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 25.11.2013 | |
CY | 07.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2016 | ||
DK | 07.09.2016 | ||
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LV | 07.09.2016 | ||
MC | 07.09.2016 | ||
MK | 07.09.2016 | ||
PL | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
RS | 07.09.2016 | ||
SI | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
SM | 07.09.2016 | ||
IE | 25.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
IS | 07.01.2017 | ||
PT | 09.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | CZ | 07.09.2016 | |
DK | 07.09.2016 | ||
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LV | 07.09.2016 | ||
PL | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
RS | 07.09.2016 | ||
SI | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
SM | 07.09.2016 | ||
IE | 25.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
IS | 07.01.2017 | ||
PT | 09.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/43] | CZ | 07.09.2016 | |
DK | 07.09.2016 | ||
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LV | 07.09.2016 | ||
PL | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
RS | 07.09.2016 | ||
SI | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
SM | 07.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
IS | 07.01.2017 | ||
PT | 09.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | CZ | 07.09.2016 | |
DK | 07.09.2016 | ||
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LV | 07.09.2016 | ||
PL | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
RS | 07.09.2016 | ||
SI | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
SM | 07.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
IS | 07.01.2017 | ||
PT | 09.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/35] | CZ | 07.09.2016 | |
DK | 07.09.2016 | ||
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LV | 07.09.2016 | ||
PL | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
RS | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
SM | 07.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
IS | 07.01.2017 | ||
PT | 09.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | CZ | 07.09.2016 | |
DK | 07.09.2016 | ||
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LV | 07.09.2016 | ||
PL | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
RS | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
SM | 07.09.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
IS | 07.01.2017 | ||
PT | 09.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/32] | CZ | 07.09.2016 | |
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LV | 07.09.2016 | ||
PL | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
RS | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
SM | 07.09.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
IS | 07.01.2017 | ||
PT | 09.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/13] | FI | 07.09.2016 | |
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LV | 07.09.2016 | ||
RS | 07.09.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | FI | 07.09.2016 | |
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
RS | 07.09.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 07.09.2016 | |
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
RS | 07.09.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 07.09.2016 | |
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 07.09.2016 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP1167484 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 1-25* example -; claims 16,17 *; | [A]US2010209690 (SANG JUNJIE JEFFREY [DE], et al) [A] 1-25 * example -; claims 32-36 * |