EP2869930 - SPOUT FOR PRODUCING A FOAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2015/20] | SPOUT, SYSTEM, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING A FOAM | ||
[2020/11] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.07.2021 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.07.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.02.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VKI Technologies Inc. 3200 2e Rue St-Hubert, Québec J3Y 8Y7 / CA | [2015/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOILY, Alain 1721 des Amarantes Carignan, Québec J3L 4Z8 / CA | 02 /
BARBALES, Jorge 6195 Boul. Chevrier No. 1 Brossard, Québec J4Z 0C6 / CA | 03 /
ST-GERMAIN, Marc 112 de Lavaltrie Boucherville, Québec J4B 4X8 / CA | 04 /
VAILLANT, Marc-André 640 Avenue Senecal LaSalle, Québec H8P 2B4 / CA | [2020/12] |
Former [2015/20] | 01 /
BOILY, Alain 1721 des Amarantes Carignan, Québec J3L 4Z8 / CA | ||
02 /
BARBALES, Jorge 6195 Boul. Chevrier No. 1 Brossard, Québec J4Z 0C6 / CA | |||
03 /
ST-GERMAIN, Marc 112 de Lavaltrie Boucherville, Québec J4B 4X8 / CA | |||
04 /
VAILLANT, Marc-andré 640 Avenue Senecal LaSalle, Québec H8P 2B4 / CA | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2020/36] | Plasseraud IP 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2015/20] | Cabinet Plasseraud 52, rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 13812488.8 | 04.07.2013 | [2020/36] | WO2013CA50516 | Priority number, date | US201261667992P | 04.07.2012 Original published format: US 201261667992 P | [2015/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014005228 | Date: | 09.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2869930 | Date: | 13.05.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.01.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2869930 | Date: | 02.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 09.01.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A47J31/44, B01F5/06, B01F3/04, B01F13/10 | [2016/11] | CPC: |
A47J31/4485 (EP,CN,US);
B01F23/235 (EP,US);
B01F25/4521 (EP,CN,US);
B01F25/4523 (EP,CN,US);
B01F33/81 (EP,CN,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/20] | B05B1/22, B05B9/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/20] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUSGIESSTÜLLE ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES SCHAUMSTOFFS | [2020/11] | English: | SPOUT FOR PRODUCING A FOAM | [2020/11] | French: | BUSE POUR LA PRODUCTION D'UNE MOUSSE | [2020/11] |
Former [2015/20] | AUSGIESSTÜLLE, SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES SCHAUMSTOFFS | ||
Former [2015/20] | SPOUT, SYSTEM, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING A FOAM | ||
Former [2015/20] | BUSE, SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ POUR LA PRODUCTION D'UNE MOUSSE | Entry into regional phase | 03.02.2015 | National basic fee paid | 03.02.2015 | Search fee paid | 03.02.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.02.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.02.2015 | Examination requested [2015/20] | 14.12.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.02.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.06.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.07.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.06.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 16.06.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.06.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.10.2018 | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.07.2013 | AL | 02.09.2020 | AT | 02.09.2020 | CY | 02.09.2020 | CZ | 02.09.2020 | DK | 02.09.2020 | EE | 02.09.2020 | ES | 02.09.2020 | FI | 02.09.2020 | HR | 02.09.2020 | LT | 02.09.2020 | LV | 02.09.2020 | MC | 02.09.2020 | MK | 02.09.2020 | MT | 02.09.2020 | NL | 02.09.2020 | PL | 02.09.2020 | RO | 02.09.2020 | RS | 02.09.2020 | SE | 02.09.2020 | SI | 02.09.2020 | SK | 02.09.2020 | SM | 02.09.2020 | TR | 02.09.2020 | BG | 02.12.2020 | NO | 02.12.2020 | GR | 03.12.2020 | IS | 02.01.2021 | PT | 04.01.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 04.07.2013 | |
AL | 02.09.2020 | ||
AT | 02.09.2020 | ||
CY | 02.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2020 | ||
DK | 02.09.2020 | ||
EE | 02.09.2020 | ||
ES | 02.09.2020 | ||
FI | 02.09.2020 | ||
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
MC | 02.09.2020 | ||
MK | 02.09.2020 | ||
NL | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RO | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
SI | 02.09.2020 | ||
SK | 02.09.2020 | ||
SM | 02.09.2020 | ||
TR | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
IS | 02.01.2021 | ||
PT | 04.01.2021 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 04.07.2013 | |
AL | 02.09.2020 | ||
AT | 02.09.2020 | ||
CY | 02.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2020 | ||
DK | 02.09.2020 | ||
EE | 02.09.2020 | ||
ES | 02.09.2020 | ||
FI | 02.09.2020 | ||
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
MC | 02.09.2020 | ||
MK | 02.09.2020 | ||
NL | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RO | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
SI | 02.09.2020 | ||
SK | 02.09.2020 | ||
SM | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
IS | 02.01.2021 | ||
PT | 04.01.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 04.07.2013 | |
AL | 02.09.2020 | ||
AT | 02.09.2020 | ||
CY | 02.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2020 | ||
DK | 02.09.2020 | ||
EE | 02.09.2020 | ||
ES | 02.09.2020 | ||
FI | 02.09.2020 | ||
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
MC | 02.09.2020 | ||
NL | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RO | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
SI | 02.09.2020 | ||
SK | 02.09.2020 | ||
SM | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
IS | 02.01.2021 | ||
PT | 04.01.2021 | ||
Former [2023/29] | HU | 04.07.2013 | |
AL | 02.09.2020 | ||
AT | 02.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2020 | ||
DK | 02.09.2020 | ||
EE | 02.09.2020 | ||
ES | 02.09.2020 | ||
FI | 02.09.2020 | ||
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
MC | 02.09.2020 | ||
NL | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RO | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
SI | 02.09.2020 | ||
SK | 02.09.2020 | ||
SM | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
IS | 02.01.2021 | ||
PT | 04.01.2021 | ||
Former [2022/18] | AL | 02.09.2020 | |
AT | 02.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2020 | ||
DK | 02.09.2020 | ||
EE | 02.09.2020 | ||
ES | 02.09.2020 | ||
FI | 02.09.2020 | ||
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
MC | 02.09.2020 | ||
NL | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RO | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
SI | 02.09.2020 | ||
SK | 02.09.2020 | ||
SM | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
IS | 02.01.2021 | ||
PT | 04.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 02.09.2020 | |
AT | 02.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2020 | ||
DK | 02.09.2020 | ||
EE | 02.09.2020 | ||
ES | 02.09.2020 | ||
FI | 02.09.2020 | ||
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
NL | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RO | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
SI | 02.09.2020 | ||
SK | 02.09.2020 | ||
SM | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
IS | 02.01.2021 | ||
PT | 04.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 02.09.2020 | |
AT | 02.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2020 | ||
EE | 02.09.2020 | ||
ES | 02.09.2020 | ||
FI | 02.09.2020 | ||
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
NL | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RO | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
SI | 02.09.2020 | ||
SK | 02.09.2020 | ||
SM | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
IS | 02.01.2021 | ||
PT | 04.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 02.09.2020 | |
AT | 02.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2020 | ||
EE | 02.09.2020 | ||
ES | 02.09.2020 | ||
FI | 02.09.2020 | ||
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
NL | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RO | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
SK | 02.09.2020 | ||
SM | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
IS | 02.01.2021 | ||
PT | 04.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 02.09.2020 | |
AT | 02.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2020 | ||
EE | 02.09.2020 | ||
ES | 02.09.2020 | ||
FI | 02.09.2020 | ||
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
NL | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RO | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
SM | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
IS | 02.01.2021 | ||
PT | 04.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AT | 02.09.2020 | |
CZ | 02.09.2020 | ||
EE | 02.09.2020 | ||
FI | 02.09.2020 | ||
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
NL | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RO | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
SM | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
PT | 04.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | CZ | 02.09.2020 | |
EE | 02.09.2020 | ||
FI | 02.09.2020 | ||
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
NL | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RO | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
SM | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
PT | 04.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | CZ | 02.09.2020 | |
EE | 02.09.2020 | ||
FI | 02.09.2020 | ||
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
NL | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RO | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
PT | 04.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/21] | FI | 02.09.2020 | |
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
NL | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
PT | 04.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/18] | FI | 02.09.2020 | |
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
NL | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | FI | 02.09.2020 | |
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | FI | 02.09.2020 | |
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | FI | 02.09.2020 | |
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 02.09.2020 | |
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US4219159 (WESNER WALTER H [US]) [X] 1-5,14,16 * abstract * * figures 1-3 * [A] 18 [I] 6,11; | [XAI]GB2060420 (HAMPTONNS AERCRETE LTD) [X] 1-6,14,16 * figures 1-4 * * page 1, line 59 - page 2, line 21 * [A] 18[I] 11; | [XAI]WO2005048977 (BTG INT LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-6,14,16 * abstract * * figures 9-13 * * paragraphs [0223] - [0233] * [A] 18 [I] 11; | [XAI]DE202004014737U (PAV PATENTVERWERTUNG KG [DE]) [X] 1-3,5,14,16,18 * abstract * * figures 1-4b * * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0048] * [A] 4 [I] 6,11; | [XAI]DE202011050649U (CHOU WU CHIAO [TW]) [X] 1,2,5,6,14,16 * abstract * * figures 1-6 * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0022] * [A] 3,4,18 [I] 11; | [XAI]EP2397219 (BARTH VOLKER [DE]) [X] 1,2,5,11,14,16,18 * abstract * * figures 1,5-8 * * paragraphs [0015] , [0 19] - [0028] - [0030] - [0032] * [A] 3,4 [I] 6 | International search | [X]DE102008058934 (BARTH VOLKER [DE]); | [X]CN201658242U (XINBAO ELEC EQUIPMENTS CO LTD); | [X]WO2011138828 (MITANI VALVE CO LTD [JP], et al) | by applicant | EP2397219 |