EP2870232 - PHOTOBIOREACTOR FOR LIQUID CULTURES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.05.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.05.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.06.2021 [2021/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Industrial Plankton Inc. 3378 Burns Ave. Victoria BC V8Z 3P2 / CA | [2015/22] |
Former [2015/20] | For all designated states Roulston, Robert 8781 Forest Park Dr. Victoria, British Columbia V8L 4E8 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Roulston, Robert 3378 Burns Ave. Victoria British Columbia V8Z 3P2 / CA | [2015/22] |
Former [2015/20] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Stöckeler, Ferdinand, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Radlkoferstrasse 2 81373 München / DE | [2015/20] | Application number, filing date | 13812910.1 | 30.06.2013 | WO2013IB55369 | Priority number, date | deleted | [2015/22] |
Former [2015/20] | US201261667699P | 03.07.2012 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014006551 | Date: | 09.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2870232 | Date: | 13.05.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.01.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 09.01.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.02.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C12M1/36, C12M1/00, C12M1/04, C12M1/42, C12M3/00, C12N1/00, C12N1/10, C12N1/12, C12N1/34, C12N5/04, C12Q3/00 | [2015/20] | CPC: |
C12M21/02 (EP,US);
C12M23/22 (US);
C12M23/38 (US);
C12M29/00 (US);
C12M29/06 (EP,US);
C12M31/02 (EP,US);
C12M31/08 (EP,US);
C12M33/00 (US);
C12M37/00 (EP,US);
C12M39/00 (EP,US);
C12M41/00 (US);
C12M41/22 (EP,US);
C12M41/48 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/20] | Title | German: | FOTOBIOREAKTOR FÜR FLÜSSIGKEITSKULTUREN | [2015/20] | English: | PHOTOBIOREACTOR FOR LIQUID CULTURES | [2015/20] | French: | PHOTOBIORÉACTEUR POUR CULTURES LIQUIDES | [2015/20] | Entry into regional phase | 16.01.2015 | National basic fee paid | 16.01.2015 | Search fee paid | 16.01.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.01.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/20] | 17.05.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.02.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.06.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.01.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/23] | 02.02.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2021/23] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.02.2019 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2020 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US6509188 (TROESCH WALTER [DE], et al) [X] 1-5,10,11,13 * figures 1a-1c, 2 * [Y] 12,14,15 [I] 6-9,16-18; | [Y]CN101701180 ; | [Y]WO2006071716 (BIOGEN IDEC INC [US], et al) [Y] 14,15 * figure 1 * | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2010, no. 33, Database accession no. 2010-F20363, XP002753471 & CN101701180 A 20100505 (YUNNAN AIERFA BIOTECHNOLOGIES CO LTD) [Y] 12 * abstract * | International search | [X]US2011136225 (VUNJAK-NOVAKOVIC GORDANA [US], et al); | [A]US7510864 (KRICHEVSKY MICAH I [US], et al); | [A]WO2010017337 (PRAXAIR TECHNOLOGY INC [US], et al); | [A]EP1884562 (BECTON DICKINSON CO [US]); | [A]WO2010129278 (BIOPROCESSH20 LLC [US], et al) |