EP2870376 - BEARING BRACKET CONFIGURATION FOR DRUM BRAKE AND METHOD FOR ASSEMBLING A BEARING BRACKET CONFIGURATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Scania CV AB 151 87 Södertälje / SE | [2015/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TIGÉR, Rickard Atterbomsvägen 28 S-112 58 Stockholm / SE | [2015/20] | Representative(s) | Scania CV AB Patents, GP 117kv 151 87 Södertälje / SE | [2015/20] | Application number, filing date | 13813144.6 | 28.06.2013 | WO2013SE50811 | Priority number, date | SE20120050772 | 05.07.2012 Original published format: SE 1250772 | [2015/20] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014007731 | Date: | 09.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2870376 | Date: | 13.05.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.01.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 09.01.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.01.2016 | Classification | IPC: | F16D65/02, F16D65/28 | [2015/20] | CPC: |
F16D51/22 (EP,RU,US);
F16D65/02 (KR,SE);
F16D51/00 (RU,US);
F16D65/0056 (RU,US);
F16D51/24 (EP,RU,US);
F16D65/28 (KR,SE);
B60Y2304/072 (SE);
F16D2051/003 (EP,RU,US);
F16D2125/28 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/20] | Title | German: | LAGERTRÄGERKONFIGURATION FÜR TROMMELBREMSE UND VERFAHREN ZUR MONTAGE EINER LAGERTRÄGERKONFIGURATION | [2015/20] | English: | BEARING BRACKET CONFIGURATION FOR DRUM BRAKE AND METHOD FOR ASSEMBLING A BEARING BRACKET CONFIGURATION | [2015/20] | French: | CONFIGURATION DE CHAISE DE PALIER POUR FREIN À TAMBOUR ET PROCÉDÉ POUR ASSEMBLER UNE CONFIGURATION DE CHAISE DE PALIER | [2015/20] | Entry into regional phase | 05.02.2015 | National basic fee paid | 05.02.2015 | Search fee paid | 05.02.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.02.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.05.2014 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 05.02.2015 | Examination requested [2015/20] | 21.12.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.09.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.12.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.03.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.07.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/33] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.05.2019 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5819885 (GRIFFITHS ALAN GODFREY [GB]) [X] 1-7 * column 1, line 64 - column 3, line 5; figure - *; | [X]US5887687 (WILLIAMS RONALD L [US]) [X] 1-7* column 2, line 24 - column 3, line 10; figure - *; | [X]WO0146600 (DANA CORP [US]) [X] 1-7 * page 3, line 21 - page 7, line 20; figure - * | International search | [A]US3465603 (LINDSTROM KENNETH); | [X]US5819885 (GRIFFITHS ALAN GODFREY [GB]) | by applicant | US2619202 |