EP2871174 - METAL COMPLEX, AND ABSORBENT, OCCLUSION MATERIAL AND SEPARATION MATERIAL PRODUCED THEREFROM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.02.2016 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.02.2016 | Withdrawal of application | published on 23.03.2016 [2016/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kuraray Co., Ltd. 1621, Sakazu Kurashiki-shi Okayama 710-0801 / JP | [2015/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
INUBUSHI, Yasutaka c/o KURARAY CO. LTD. 2045-1 Sakazu Kurashiki-shi Okayama 710-0801 / JP | 02 /
IKEDA, Chikako c/o KURARAY CO. LTD. 2045-1 Sakazu Kurashiki-shi Okayama 710-0801 / JP | 03 /
HORI, Takashi c/o KURARAY CO. LTD. 2045-1 Sakazu Kurashiki-shi Okayama 710-0801 / JP | 04 /
YANE, Takako c/o KURARAY CO. LTD. 2045-1 Sakazu Kurashiki-shi Okayama 710-0801 / JP | [2015/20] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2015/20] | Application number, filing date | 13813620.5 | 28.06.2013 | WO2013JP67912 | Priority number, date | JP20120150840 | 04.07.2012 Original published format: JP 2012150840 | [2015/20] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014007181 | Date: | 09.01.2014 | Language: | JA | [2014/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2871174 | Date: | 13.05.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 09.01.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.02.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C07C63/28, B01D53/02, B01J20/22, B01J20/30, C01B31/20, C07D213/16, C07D213/22, C07F1/08, F17C11/00, B01J20/34, F02M25/08, F02M21/02, B01D53/04, B01D53/047, B60K15/03, B65D81/20 | [2016/10] | CPC: |
B01D53/02 (EP,CN,US);
C07F1/08 (EP,CN,US);
B01J20/223 (CN,US);
B01D53/0462 (US);
B01D53/047 (EP,CN,US);
B01J20/226 (EP,CN,US);
B01J20/3085 (EP,CN,US);
B01J20/3425 (EP,CN,US);
B01J20/3491 (EP,CN,US);
B60K15/03006 (US);
B65D81/20 (US);
C01B32/50 (EP,CN,US);
C07C63/28 (EP,CN,US);
F17C11/005 (EP,CN,US);
B01D2253/204 (EP,CN,US);
B01D2259/4525 (EP,CN,US);
B01D2259/4566 (US);
F02M21/0221 (EP,CN,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/20] | C07C63/28, B01D53/02, B01J20/22, B01J20/30, C01B31/20, C07D213/16, C07D213/22, C07F1/08, F02M21/00, F17C11/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/20] | Title | German: | METALLKOMPLEX UND ABSORBIERENDES OKKLUSIONSMATERIAL SOWIE DARAUS HERGESTELLTES TRENNMATERIAL | [2015/20] | English: | METAL COMPLEX, AND ABSORBENT, OCCLUSION MATERIAL AND SEPARATION MATERIAL PRODUCED THEREFROM | [2015/20] | French: | COMPLEXE MÉTALLIQUE, ET ABSORBANT, MATIÈRE D'OCCLUSION ET MATIÈRE DE SÉPARATION OBTENUS À PARTIR DE CELUI-CI | [2015/20] | Entry into regional phase | 22.12.2014 | Translation filed | 08.01.2015 | National basic fee paid | 08.01.2015 | Search fee paid | 08.01.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.01.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/20] | 08.02.2016 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2016/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5648508 (YAGHI OMAR M [US]) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [A]US2008177098 (BAHNMULLER STEFAN [DE], et al) [A] 1-17* the whole document *; | [A]WO2010148296 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [E]EP2746248 (KURARAY CO [JP]) [E] 1-17 * claims 1-18 * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0058] *; | [E]EP2754488 (KURARAY CO [JP]) [E] 1-17 * claims 1-13 * * Synthesis Example 2; paragraph [0092] - paragraph [0094] * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0039] *; | [E]EP2868649 (KURARAY CO [JP]) [E] 1-17 * claims 1-16 * * Synthesis Examples 1-3; paragraph [0091] - paragraph [0118] * * table 1 * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0058] *; | [E]EP2960227 (KURARAY CO [JP]) [E] 1-17 * claims 1-10 * * examples 1-3 * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0049] * | International search | [A]JP2003342260 (OSAKA GAS CO LTD); | [A]JP2010265243 (KURARAY CO); | [A]JP2011068631 (KURARAY CO, et al); | [A]JP2011190256 (KURARAY CO) | by applicant | - J.J. LOW; A.I. BENIN; P. JAKUBCZAK; J.F. ABRAHAMIAN; S.A. FAHEEM; R.R. WILLIS, JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (2009), vol. 131, pages 15834 - 15842 | - BUNSHINO, Taisho to Gunron, MOLECULAR SYMMETRY AND GROUP THEORY | - Masao Nakazaki, KAGAKU DOJIN CO., LTD., (1973), pages 39 - 40 |