26.06.2020 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] |
27.01.2020 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
02.09.2019 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
03.08.2019 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
05.07.2019 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
20.02.2019 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
30.06.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.10.2017 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
29.09.2017 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
22.09.2017 |
First examination report |
|
05.07.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.01.2017 |
New entry: Decision on request for further processing |
|
18.01.2017 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
18.01.2017 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
16.01.2017 |
Change - representative |
|
03.01.2017 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
16.12.2016 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
16.12.2016 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
11.10.2016 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
01.07.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.02.2016 |
Change - classification |
published on 09.03.2016 [2016/10] |
05.02.2016 |
Change - classification |
published on 09.03.2016 [2016/10] |
05.02.2016 |
Change - date of supplementary search report |
published on 09.03.2016 [2016/10] |
04.09.2015 |
Change - extension states |
published on 07.10.2015 [2015/41] |
02.07.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.04.2015 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 13.05.2015 [2015/20] |
10.04.2015 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 13.05.2015 [2015/20] |
26.02.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.02.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.02.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.02.2015 |
Change - representative |
|
04.02.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.01.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.01.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|