Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2018056262 | Global Dossier | 01.03.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201261667751 | 03.07.2012 | US201715791516 | 24.10.2017 | US201313927904 | 26.06.2013 | US201414457541 | 12.08.2014 | US201361793078 | 15.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9795940 | Global Dossier | 24.10.2017 | B2 | US2014348710 | 27.11.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201261667751 | 03.07.2012 | US201313927904 | 26.06.2013 | US201414457541 | 12.08.2014 | US201361793078 | 15.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6081588B | Global Dossier | 15.02.2017 | B2 | JP2015531796 | 05.11.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US201261667751 | 03.07.2012 | US201313927904 | 26.06.2013 | US201361793078 | 15.03.2013 | WO2013US48259 | 27.06.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2870220 | Global Dossier | 09.03.2016 | A4 | EP2870220 | 13.05.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201261667751 | 03.07.2012 | US201313927904 | 26.06.2013 | US201361793078 | 15.03.2013 | WO2013US48259 | 27.06.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2878333 | 09.01.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201261667751 | 03.07.2012 | US201313927904 | 26.06.2013 | US201361793078 | 15.03.2013 | WO2013US48259 | 27.06.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX368698 | 11.10.2019 | B | MX2015000007 | 25.04.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201261667751 | 03.07.2012 | US201313927904 | 26.06.2013 | US201361793078 | 15.03.2013 | WO2013US48259 | 27.06.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2014008100 | Global Dossier | 09.01.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201261667751 | 03.07.2012 | US201313927904 | 26.06.2013 | US201361793078 | 15.03.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8801904 | Global Dossier | 12.08.2014 | B2 | US2014008206 | 09.01.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201261667751 | 03.07.2012 | US201313927904 | 26.06.2013 | US201361793078 | 15.03.2013 |