EP2928603 - METHOD FOR THE OXIDATIVE DEHYDROGENATION OF N-BUTENES TO BUTADIENE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.07.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.08.2016 [2016/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/42] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRÜNE, Philipp Ifflandstraße 16 68161 Mannheim / DE | 02 /
RÜTTINGER, Wolfgang R7 6 68161 Mannheim / DE | 03 /
HAMMEN, Oliver Kirchstraße 25 67587 Wintersheim / DE | 04 /
WALSDORFF, Christian Wittelsbachstraße 61 67061 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2015/42] | Representative(s) | Schuck, Alexander Patentanwälte Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler PartG mbB Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstraße 4 68163 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/42] | Schuck, Alexander Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler LLP Patentanwälte EASTSITE ONE Seckenheimer Landstraße 4 68163 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 13814454.8 | 04.12.2013 | [2015/42] | WO2013EP75453 | Priority number, date | EP20120195846 | 06.12.2012 Original published format: EP 12195846 | [2015/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014086813 | Date: | 12.06.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2928603 | Date: | 14.10.2015 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.06.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.06.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B01J37/03, B01J23/887, B01J35/00, B01J35/02, B01J35/10, B01J37/02, C07C5/48 | [2015/42] | CPC: |
B01J23/8878 (EP);
B01J23/28 (EP);
B01J35/397 (EP);
B01J35/55 (EP);
B01J37/0221 (EP);
B01J37/033 (EP);
C07C2/06 (EP);
C07C5/32 (EP);
C07C5/48 (EP);
C10G27/04 (EP);
B01J2523/00 (EP);
B01J37/08 (EP);
C07C2521/02 (EP);
C07C2521/06 (EP);
C07C2523/02 (EP);
C07C2523/04 (EP);
C07C2523/06 (EP);
C07C2523/10 (EP);
C07C2523/14 (EP);
C07C2523/16 (EP);
C07C2523/18 (EP);
C07C2523/26 (EP);
C07C2523/28 (EP);
C07C2523/30 (EP);
C07C2523/34 (EP);
C07C2523/745 (EP);
C07C2523/75 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C07C2/06, C07C11/08 (EP);
C07C5/32, C07C11/08 (EP);
C07C5/48, C07C11/167 (EP);
B01J2523/00, B01J2523/13, B01J2523/54, B01J2523/67, B01J2523/68, B01J2523/842, B01J2523/845 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/42] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR OXIDATIVEN DEHYDRIERUNG VON N-BUTENEN ZU BUTADIEN | [2015/42] | English: | METHOD FOR THE OXIDATIVE DEHYDROGENATION OF N-BUTENES TO BUTADIENE | [2015/42] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE DÉSHYDROGÉNATION OXYDATIVE DE N-BUTÈNES EN BUTADIÈNE | [2015/42] | Entry into regional phase | 06.07.2015 | National basic fee paid | 06.07.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.07.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.10.2014 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.07.2015 | Examination requested [2015/42] | 02.02.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/31] | 10.03.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2016/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4438217 (TAKATA MASAHIRO [JP], et al); | [I]DE4442346 (BASF AG [DE]); | [X]US5989412 (OKAGAMI AKIO [JP], et al); | [A]WO2005063658 (BASF AG [DE], et al); | [X]WO2009124945 (BASF SE [DE], et al) |