EP2931316 - HYDROXYL-POLYMER-DRUG-PROTEIN CONJUGATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.12.2019 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.01.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.07.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.07.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.05.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mersana Therapeutics, Inc. 840 Memorial Drive Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | [2019/08] |
Former [2015/43] | For all designated states Mersana Therapeutics, Inc. 840 Memorial Drive Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YURKOVETSKIY, Aleksander, V. 2 Old Farm Road Littleton, MA 01460 / US | [2018/24] |
Former [2015/43] | 01 /
YURKOVETSKIY, Aleksandr, V. 2 Old Farm Road Littleton, MA 01460 / US | Representative(s) | Cooley (UK) LLP 22 Bishopsgate London EC2N 4BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/43] | Cooley (UK) LLP Dashwood 69 Old Broad Street London EC2M 1QS / GB | Application number, filing date | 13814764.0 | 12.12.2013 | [2015/43] | WO2013US74703 | Priority number, date | US201261736483P | 12.12.2012 Original published format: US 201261736483 P | [2015/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014093640 | Date: | 19.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2931316 | Date: | 21.10.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.06.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2931316 | Date: | 20.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.06.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61K47/56, A61K47/68, C08G81/00, C08G83/00 | [2018/22] | CPC: |
A61K31/4412 (EP,US);
A61K47/64 (US);
A61K31/475 (EP,US);
A61K31/5377 (EP,US);
A61K38/05 (EP,US);
A61K38/08 (EP,US);
A61K47/56 (EP,US);
A61K47/60 (EP,US);
A61K47/6849 (EP,US);
A61K47/6851 (EP,US);
A61K47/6855 (EP,US);
C07K16/2887 (US);
C07K16/32 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2015/43] | A61K47/48 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HYDROXYLPOLYMER-HEILMITTELPROTEINKONJUGATE | [2015/43] | English: | HYDROXYL-POLYMER-DRUG-PROTEIN CONJUGATES | [2015/43] | French: | CONJUGUÉS HYDROXY-POLYMÈRE-MÉDICAMENT-PROTÉINE | [2015/43] | Entry into regional phase | 03.07.2015 | National basic fee paid | 03.07.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.07.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.07.2015 | Examination requested [2015/43] | 08.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.07.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 09.05.2018 | 09.05.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 16.05.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.07.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 30.07.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.11.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 28.11.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.11.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.01.2017 | Opposition(s) | 21.11.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.12.2013 | AL | 20.02.2019 | AT | 20.02.2019 | CY | 20.02.2019 | CZ | 20.02.2019 | DK | 20.02.2019 | EE | 20.02.2019 | ES | 20.02.2019 | FI | 20.02.2019 | HR | 20.02.2019 | IT | 20.02.2019 | LT | 20.02.2019 | LV | 20.02.2019 | MC | 20.02.2019 | MK | 20.02.2019 | MT | 20.02.2019 | NL | 20.02.2019 | PL | 20.02.2019 | RO | 20.02.2019 | RS | 20.02.2019 | SE | 20.02.2019 | SI | 20.02.2019 | SK | 20.02.2019 | SM | 20.02.2019 | TR | 20.02.2019 | BG | 20.05.2019 | NO | 20.05.2019 | GR | 21.05.2019 | IS | 20.06.2019 | PT | 20.06.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 12.12.2013 | |
AL | 20.02.2019 | ||
AT | 20.02.2019 | ||
CY | 20.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2019 | ||
DK | 20.02.2019 | ||
EE | 20.02.2019 | ||
ES | 20.02.2019 | ||
FI | 20.02.2019 | ||
HR | 20.02.2019 | ||
IT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LV | 20.02.2019 | ||
MC | 20.02.2019 | ||
MT | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
PL | 20.02.2019 | ||
RO | 20.02.2019 | ||
RS | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
SI | 20.02.2019 | ||
SK | 20.02.2019 | ||
SM | 20.02.2019 | ||
TR | 20.02.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
NO | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
IS | 20.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2021/33] | HU | 12.12.2013 | |
AL | 20.02.2019 | ||
AT | 20.02.2019 | ||
CY | 20.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2019 | ||
DK | 20.02.2019 | ||
EE | 20.02.2019 | ||
ES | 20.02.2019 | ||
FI | 20.02.2019 | ||
HR | 20.02.2019 | ||
IT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LV | 20.02.2019 | ||
MC | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
PL | 20.02.2019 | ||
RO | 20.02.2019 | ||
RS | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
SI | 20.02.2019 | ||
SK | 20.02.2019 | ||
SM | 20.02.2019 | ||
TR | 20.02.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
NO | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
IS | 20.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 20.02.2019 | |
AT | 20.02.2019 | ||
CY | 20.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2019 | ||
DK | 20.02.2019 | ||
EE | 20.02.2019 | ||
ES | 20.02.2019 | ||
FI | 20.02.2019 | ||
HR | 20.02.2019 | ||
IT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LV | 20.02.2019 | ||
MC | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
PL | 20.02.2019 | ||
RO | 20.02.2019 | ||
RS | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
SI | 20.02.2019 | ||
SK | 20.02.2019 | ||
SM | 20.02.2019 | ||
TR | 20.02.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
NO | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
IS | 20.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/39] | AL | 20.02.2019 | |
AT | 20.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2019 | ||
DK | 20.02.2019 | ||
EE | 20.02.2019 | ||
ES | 20.02.2019 | ||
FI | 20.02.2019 | ||
HR | 20.02.2019 | ||
IT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LV | 20.02.2019 | ||
MC | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
PL | 20.02.2019 | ||
RO | 20.02.2019 | ||
RS | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
SI | 20.02.2019 | ||
SK | 20.02.2019 | ||
SM | 20.02.2019 | ||
TR | 20.02.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
NO | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
IS | 20.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 20.02.2019 | |
AT | 20.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2019 | ||
DK | 20.02.2019 | ||
EE | 20.02.2019 | ||
ES | 20.02.2019 | ||
FI | 20.02.2019 | ||
HR | 20.02.2019 | ||
IT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LV | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
PL | 20.02.2019 | ||
RO | 20.02.2019 | ||
RS | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
SI | 20.02.2019 | ||
SK | 20.02.2019 | ||
SM | 20.02.2019 | ||
TR | 20.02.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
NO | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
IS | 20.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 20.02.2019 | |
AT | 20.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2019 | ||
DK | 20.02.2019 | ||
EE | 20.02.2019 | ||
ES | 20.02.2019 | ||
FI | 20.02.2019 | ||
HR | 20.02.2019 | ||
IT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LV | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
PL | 20.02.2019 | ||
RO | 20.02.2019 | ||
RS | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
SI | 20.02.2019 | ||
SK | 20.02.2019 | ||
SM | 20.02.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
NO | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
IS | 20.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/03] | AL | 20.02.2019 | |
AT | 20.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2019 | ||
DK | 20.02.2019 | ||
EE | 20.02.2019 | ||
ES | 20.02.2019 | ||
FI | 20.02.2019 | ||
HR | 20.02.2019 | ||
IT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LV | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
PL | 20.02.2019 | ||
RO | 20.02.2019 | ||
RS | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
SK | 20.02.2019 | ||
SM | 20.02.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
NO | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
IS | 20.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 20.02.2019 | |
CZ | 20.02.2019 | ||
DK | 20.02.2019 | ||
EE | 20.02.2019 | ||
ES | 20.02.2019 | ||
FI | 20.02.2019 | ||
HR | 20.02.2019 | ||
IT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LV | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
PL | 20.02.2019 | ||
RO | 20.02.2019 | ||
RS | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
SK | 20.02.2019 | ||
SM | 20.02.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
NO | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
IS | 20.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 20.02.2019 | |
CZ | 20.02.2019 | ||
DK | 20.02.2019 | ||
EE | 20.02.2019 | ||
ES | 20.02.2019 | ||
FI | 20.02.2019 | ||
HR | 20.02.2019 | ||
IT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LV | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
RO | 20.02.2019 | ||
RS | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
SK | 20.02.2019 | ||
SM | 20.02.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
NO | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
IS | 20.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 20.02.2019 | |
CZ | 20.02.2019 | ||
DK | 20.02.2019 | ||
EE | 20.02.2019 | ||
ES | 20.02.2019 | ||
FI | 20.02.2019 | ||
HR | 20.02.2019 | ||
IT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LV | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
RO | 20.02.2019 | ||
RS | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
SK | 20.02.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
NO | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
IS | 20.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | DK | 20.02.2019 | |
ES | 20.02.2019 | ||
FI | 20.02.2019 | ||
HR | 20.02.2019 | ||
IT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LV | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
RS | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
NO | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
IS | 20.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 20.02.2019 | |
FI | 20.02.2019 | ||
HR | 20.02.2019 | ||
IT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LV | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
RS | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
NO | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
IS | 20.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | FI | 20.02.2019 | |
HR | 20.02.2019 | ||
IT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LV | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
RS | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
NO | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
IS | 20.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | FI | 20.02.2019 | |
HR | 20.02.2019 | ||
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LV | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
RS | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
NO | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
IS | 20.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | FI | 20.02.2019 | |
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
NO | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | FI | 20.02.2019 | |
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
NO | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | FI | 20.02.2019 | |
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
NO | 20.05.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 20.02.2019 | |
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
NO | 20.05.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2005023294 (GEN HOSPITAL CORP [US], et al) [Y] 1-8* the whole document *; | [Y]WO2011120053 (MERSANA THERAPEUTICS INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [X] - ULBRICH K ET AL, "HPMA copolymers with pH-controlled release of doxorubicin - In vitro cytotoxicity and in vivo antitumor activity", JOURNAL OF CONTROLLED RELEASE, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20030221), vol. 87, no. 1-3, doi:10.1016/S0168-3659(02)00348-6, ISSN 0168-3659, pages 33 - 47, XP004412737 [X] 1-8 * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0168-3659(02)00348-6 | [X] - AKINORI NOGUCHI ET AL, "PREPARATION AND PROPERTIES OF THE IMMUNOCONJUGATE COMPOSED OF ANTI-HUMAN COLON CANCER MONOCLONAL ANTIBODY AND MITOMYCIN C-DEXTRAN CONJUGATE1", BIOCONJUGATE CHEMISTRY, ACS, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (19920301), vol. 3, no. 2, doi:10.1021/BC00014A007, ISSN 1043-1802, pages 132 - 137, XP000262170 [X] 1-8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bc00014a007 | [X] - RIHOVA B ET AL, "Clinical implications of N-(2-hydroxypropyl)methacrylamide copolymers", CURRENT PHARMACEUTICAL BIOTECHNOLOGY, BENTHAM SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, NL, (20031001), vol. 4, no. 5, doi:10.2174/1389201033489711, ISSN 1389-2010, pages 311 - 322, XP008124188 [X] 1-8 * figure 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2174/1389201033489711 | [X] - JENSEN K D ET AL, "Cytoplasmic delivery and nuclear targeting of synthetic macromolecules", JOURNAL OF CONTROLLED RELEASE, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20030221), vol. 87, no. 1-3, doi:10.1016/S0168-3659(02)00352-8, ISSN 0168-3659, pages 89 - 105, XP004412749 [X] 1-8 * figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0168-3659(02)00352-8 | [X] - NATE LARSON ET AL, "Polymeric Conjugates for Drug Delivery", CHEMISTRY OF MATERIALS, (20120313), vol. 24, no. 5, doi:10.1021/cm2031569, ISSN 0897-4756, pages 840 - 853, XP055103531 [X] 1-8 * figure 8 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/cm2031569 | Examination | WO2012171020 | by applicant | US4256746 | US4294757 | US4307016 | US4313946 | US4315929 | US4322348 | US4331598 | US4361650 | US4362663 | US4364866 | US4371533 | US4424219 | US4450254 | US4486414 | US4816444 | US4879278 | EP0354787 | US4978744 | US4986988 | US5070092 | US5076973 | US5101038 | US5138036 | US5187186 | US5208020 | US5410024 | US5416064 | US5475092 | US5504191 | US5521284 | US5530097 | US5554725 | US5585499 | US5595499 | US5599902 | WO9719086 | US5635483 | US5663149 | US5665860 | US5714586 | WO9808849 | WO9813375 | US5739116 | WO9822461 | US5763263 | US5767237 | US5767293 | WO9825929 | US5780588 | US5789405 | WO9838192 | US5846545 | WO9901124 | WO9902514 | WO9903848 | WO9907692 | US5886026 | WO9927890 | WO9928324 | US5969145 | WO9961432 | US6034065 | US6043372 | US6096757 | US6117659 | US6121029 | US6124431 | US6207704 | WO0124763 | US6239104 | US6323315 | US6333410 | US6340701 | US6372738 | US2002103136 | US6436931 | US6441163 | WO02088172 | US6534660 | US6548530 | US2003083263 | US6566541 | US6586618 | US6596757 | US6603812 | US6608053 | US6630579 | US6660742 | WO2004005269 | US6680311 | WO2004010957 | US6716821 | US6747021 | US6756397 | US6884869 | WO2005081711 | US6956036 | US6989450 | US7049316 | USRE39151E | US7276497 | US7303749 | US2008176958 | WO2008138561 | WO2009002993 | WO2009012958 | WO2009026177 | US7498298 | US7517994 | WO2009055562 | US7553816 | WO2009117531 | US7595292 | WO2009134279 | US2010004784 | US2010048490 | WO2010033733 | WO2010034724 | US7754885 | US7776814 | WO2010100430 | US2010240701 | US7816377 | US2010305149 | US2011020343 | US2011021568 | WO2011017249 | US2011070248 | WO2011057805 | US2012321583 | US2013101546 | - RICART, A. D.; TOLCHER, A. W., NATURE CLINICAL PRACTICE, (2007), vol. 4, pages 245 - 255 | - KROP ET AL., J. CLIN. ONCOL., (2010), vol. 28, pages 2698 - 2704 | - LI ET AL., TET LETTS., (2009), vol. 50, pages 2932 - 2935 | - DENNY, EXP. OPIN. THER. PATENTS., (2000), vol. 10, no. 4, pages 459 - 474 | - CHARI ET AL., CANCER RES., (1992), vol. 52, pages 127 - 131 | - J. MED. CHEM., (1986), vol. 29, pages 2358 - 2363 | - J. MED. CHEM., (1980), vol. 23, page 554 | - J. MED. CHEM., (1987), vol. 30, page 1774 | - RODESCHINI ET AL., J ORG. CHEM., (2004), vol. 69, pages 357 - 373 | - LIU ET AL., SCIENCE, (1998), vol. 282, pages 1324 - 1327 | - J. ORG. CHEM., (2004), vol. 69, page 357 | - J.ORG. CHEM., (2005), vol. 70, page 6870 | - J. MED. CHEM., (2006), vol. 49, page 5645 | - BIOORG. MED. CHEM., (2003), vol. 11, page 5051 | - BIOORG. MED. CHEM., (2004), vol. 14, page 91 | - TET. LETT., (1999), vol. 40, page 4797 | - SAPRA, P. ET AL., CLIN. CANCER RES., (2008), vol. 14, pages 1888 - 1896 | - FRANCISCO ET AL., BLOOD, (2003), vol. 102, no. 4, pages 1458 - 1465 | - J. MED. CHEM., (1978), vol. 21, pages 88 - 96 |