EP3080179 - FORMALDEHYDE-FREE RESINS BASED ON GLYOXYLIC ACID ESTERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.06.2017 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.06.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.07.2017 [2017/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastraße 27c 80686 München / DE | [2016/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BÖRNER, Frank Heiligenseestrasse 139 13503 Berlin / DE | 02 /
JOBMANN, Monika Beim Kloster 65B 21614 Buxtehude / DE | 03 /
HAHN, Mathias An der Bahn 2 14552 Michendorf / DE | [2016/42] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/42] | Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13815704.5 | 12.12.2013 | [2016/42] | WO2013EP76367 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015086073 | Date: | 18.06.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3080179 | Date: | 19.10.2016 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.06.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C08G12/06, B01J13/14, C08G12/26, C08G12/32 | [2016/42] | CPC: |
C08G12/32 (EP);
C08G12/06 (EP);
C08G12/26 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/42] | Title | German: | FORMALDEHYD-FREIE HARZE BASIEREND AUF GLYOXYLSÄUREESTERN | [2016/42] | English: | FORMALDEHYDE-FREE RESINS BASED ON GLYOXYLIC ACID ESTERS | [2016/42] | French: | RÉSINES EXEMPTES DE FORMALDÉHYDE À BASE D'ESTERS D'ACIDE GLYOXYLIQUE | [2016/42] | Entry into regional phase | 30.06.2016 | National basic fee paid | 30.06.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.06.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.06.2016 | Examination requested [2016/42] | 31.01.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/30] | 07.03.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2017/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4379911 (PAREKH GIRISH G, et al) [X] 1-17* column 1, line 7 - column 4, line 34; example -; claims 1-2 *; | [X]WO2004085506 (AMI AGROLINZ MELAMINE INT GMBH [AT], et al) [X] 1-17 * page 1, line 7 - page 18, line 31; example -; claims 1-18 *; | [X]WO2009100553 (GIVAUDAN SA [CH], et al) [X] 1-17 * page 1, line 3 - page 15, line 22; example -; claims 1-11 *; | [X]WO2011161618 (FIRMENICH & CIE [CH], et al) [X] 1-17 * page 1, line 4 - page 19, line 20; example -; claims 1-17 * | by applicant | DE3041580 | US5750634 | US5891983 | DE102004050395 | US2006093843 | WO2006127818 | WO2006134083 | DE60125602T | US2008108732 | WO2008068180 | WO2009100553 | US2010247941 | EP2265684 | WO2011161618 | WO2013068255 |