EP2938470 - DEVICE FOR CUTTING FOODSTUFF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2015/45] | FOOD CHOPPING DEVICE | ||
[2017/41] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.07.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.08.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.07.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.05.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.04.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.02.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.10.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU, MK | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Genius GmbH Im Dachsstück 8 65549 Limburg / DE | [2015/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REPAC, Cedomir Fliederweg 24 65611 Brechen / DE | [2015/45] | Representative(s) | Grabovac, Dalibor, et al GH-Patent Patentanwaltskanzlei Bahnhofstraße 2 65307 Bad Schwalbach / DE | [2018/36] |
Former [2015/45] | Grabovac, Dalibor, et al GH-Patent Patentanwaltskanzlei Bahnhofstrasse 2 65307 Bad Schwalbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 13815753.2 | 20.12.2013 | [2015/45] | WO2013EP77792 | Priority number, date | DE201210224520 | 28.12.2012 Original published format: DE102012224520 | [2015/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014102211 | Date: | 03.07.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2938470 | Date: | 04.11.2015 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.07.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2938470 | Date: | 05.09.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.07.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B26D3/18, B26D3/26, B26D7/06, B26D1/30, B26D9/00, A47J43/25, B26D7/18 | [2015/45] | CPC: |
B26D3/185 (EP,US);
B26D1/30 (EP,US);
B26D1/34 (EP,US);
B26D1/38 (EP,US);
B26D3/26 (EP,US);
B26D5/10 (EP,US);
B26D7/1818 (EP,US);
B26D2007/0018 (EP,US);
B26D7/0608 (EP,US);
Y10T83/8727 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/45] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LEBENSMITTELZERKLEINERUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2015/45] | English: | DEVICE FOR CUTTING FOODSTUFF | [2017/41] | French: | APPAREIL POUR DÉCOUPER LES ALLIMENTS | [2017/41] |
Former [2015/45] | FOOD CHOPPING DEVICE | ||
Former [2015/45] | DISPOSITIF POUR RÉDUIRE DES ALIMENTS EN MORCEAUX | Entry into regional phase | 27.07.2015 | National basic fee paid | 27.07.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.07.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.07.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.07.2015 | Examination requested [2015/45] | 08.01.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.04.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.12.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.06.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.07.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.10.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.02.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 19.02.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 19.02.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.05.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.05.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 11.07.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.07.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.01.2016 | Opposition(s) | 06.06.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.12.2013 | AL | 05.09.2018 | CY | 05.09.2018 | CZ | 05.09.2018 | EE | 05.09.2018 | HR | 05.09.2018 | LT | 05.09.2018 | LV | 05.09.2018 | MC | 05.09.2018 | MK | 05.09.2018 | MT | 05.09.2018 | PL | 05.09.2018 | RO | 05.09.2018 | RS | 05.09.2018 | SK | 05.09.2018 | SM | 05.09.2018 | TR | 05.09.2018 | BG | 05.12.2018 | GR | 06.12.2018 | IS | 05.01.2019 | PT | 05.01.2019 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/17] | AL | 05.09.2018 | |
CZ | 05.09.2018 | ||
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
MC | 05.09.2018 | ||
MT | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SK | 05.09.2018 | ||
SM | 05.09.2018 | ||
TR | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
PT | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 05.09.2018 | |
CZ | 05.09.2018 | ||
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
MC | 05.09.2018 | ||
MT | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SK | 05.09.2018 | ||
SM | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
PT | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 05.09.2018 | |
CZ | 05.09.2018 | ||
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
MC | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SK | 05.09.2018 | ||
SM | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
PT | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 05.09.2018 | |
CZ | 05.09.2018 | ||
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SK | 05.09.2018 | ||
SM | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
PT | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AL | 05.09.2018 | |
CZ | 05.09.2018 | ||
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SK | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 05.09.2018 | |
CZ | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
PL | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 05.09.2018 | |
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 05.09.2018 | |
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | HR | 05.09.2018 | |
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 05.09.2018 | Cited in | International search | [XDI]DE202011050041U (REPAC CEDOMIR [DE]) [XD] 1-7,10-14,16-20 * the whole document * [I] 8,9,15; | [AD]DE202010013110U (CEDOMIR REPAC [DE]) [AD] 1-20 * abstract * |