EP2872749 - FIVE-WAY OIL CONTROL VALVE WITH INTEGRATED VENTING SPOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 29.03.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 01.05.2019 [2019/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Borgwarner Inc. 3850 Hamlin Road Auburn Hills, Michigan 48326 / US | [2015/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BEREZNY, Michael R. 302 E. Bloomfield Avenue Lake Orion, Michigan 48073 / US | 02 /
HOLMES, Garrett R. 3361 Regency Dr. Lake Orion, Michigan 48359 / US | [2015/43] |
Former [2015/21] | 01 /
BEREZNY, Michael R. 3321 Applewood Drive 2209 Orion, Michigan 48359 / US | ||
02 /
HOLMES, Garrett R. 1909 Country Lane Lake Orion, Michigan 48360 / US | Representative(s) | Leckel, Ulf Leckel-Patentanwaltskanzlei Speyerer Straße 6 67227 Frankenthal / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/21] | Leckel, Ulf Leckel Patentanwaltskanzlei P6 Nr.10 (2 Floor) 68161 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 13816797.8 | 03.07.2013 | WO2013US49237 | Priority number, date | US201261671175P | 13.07.2012 Original published format: US 201261671175 P | [2015/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014011472 | Date: | 16.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2872749 | Date: | 20.05.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.01.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 16.01.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.2016 | Classification | IPC: | F01L1/344, F16K11/07 | [2016/10] | CPC: |
F01L1/344 (EP,US);
F01L1/34 (CN,KR);
F01L1/3442 (US);
F01L9/10 (KR);
F16K11/07 (KR);
F16K11/0716 (US);
F01L2001/34423 (CN);
F01L2001/34426 (CN);
F01L2001/3443 (EP,CN,US);
F01L2001/34433 (EP,CN,US);
F01L2001/34436 (CN);
F01L2820/01 (EP,US);
Y10T137/8671 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2015/21] | F01L1/34, F01M1/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/21] | Title | German: | FÜNF-WEGE-ÖLSTEUERUNGSVENTIL MIT INTEGRIERTER LÜFTUNGSSPULE | [2015/21] | English: | FIVE-WAY OIL CONTROL VALVE WITH INTEGRATED VENTING SPOOL | [2015/21] | French: | SOUPAPE DE RÉGULATION D'HUILE UNIVERSELLE À TIROIR D'AÉRATION INTÉGRÉ | [2015/21] | Entry into regional phase | 28.01.2015 | National basic fee paid | 28.01.2015 | Search fee paid | 28.01.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.01.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/21] | 23.08.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.07.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/18] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.02.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JP2012122454 (DENSO CORP) [X] 1,2,5-8,11-13,15 * abstract * [A] 3,4,9,10,14; | [XA]US2010313835 (YAMAGUCHI TAKASHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,5-9,11-13,15 * figures 15-17 * [A] 3,4,10; | [X]US2009133652 (FUJYOSHI TOSHIKI [JP], et al) [X] 1,3,5-7,11-13 * figures 3-7 *; | [A]EP1429035 (DELPHI TECH INC [US]) [A] 1,7,13 * figure - *; | [A]US2009133651 (TAKENAKA AKIHIKO [JP]) [A] 1,7,13 * figures 3-8 * | International search | [A]US2002134444 (ISOBE EIJI [JP]); | [A]JP2009264153 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD); | [A]JP2010285918 (DENSO CORP); | [A]US2012132164 (WATERS JAMES P [US], et al) | by applicant | US7841310 | US7584728 | US6941913 | US6374787 | US6247434 | US5497738 | JP2012122454 | US2010313835 |