EP2872343 - DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING THE PRESSURE IN A VEHICLE TYRE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 22.12.2017 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.12.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 24.01.2018 [2018/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PressureRite (Pty) Ltd 1 Avenue Crescent Airport City, Cape Town 7490 / ZA | [2015/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BECKER, Pierre van Wyk 7 Marconi Road Montague Gardens 7441 Cape Town / ZA | 02 /
MARSHALL, Mark Gregory 7 Marconi Road Montague Gardens 7441 Cape Town / ZA | 03 /
BACON, Brian 2nd Floor Mariendahl House Newlands on Main Newlands 7735 Cape Town / ZA | [2015/21] | Representative(s) | Turner, Craig Robert AA Thornton IP LLP 8th Floor, 125 Old Broad Street London EC2N 1AR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/21] | Turner, Craig Robert A.A. Thornton & Co. 10 Old Bailey London EC4M 7NG / GB | Application number, filing date | 13816955.2 | 10.06.2013 | WO2013IB54732 | Priority number, date | ZA20120005211 | 13.07.2012 Original published format: ZA 201205211 | [2015/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014009822 | Date: | 16.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2872343 | Date: | 20.05.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.01.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AT | 16.01.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B60C23/00, B60C23/12, B60C23/04 | [2016/26] | CPC: |
B60C23/0408 (EP,KR,US);
B60C23/127 (EP,KR,US);
B60C23/137 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/21] | B60C23/00, B60C23/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/21] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR STEUERUNG DES DRUCKES IN EINEM FAHRZEUGREIFEN | [2015/21] | English: | DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING THE PRESSURE IN A VEHICLE TYRE | [2015/21] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE DE PRESSION DANS UN PNEUMATIQUE DE VÉHICULE | [2015/21] | Entry into regional phase | 11.02.2015 | National basic fee paid | 11.02.2015 | Search fee paid | 11.02.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.02.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.02.2015 | Examination requested [2015/21] | 22.12.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.12.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US7013931 (TOIT PIERRE DU [ZA]) [A] 1-8 * column 3 - column 6; figures 1-47 *; | [A]GB2089297 (VENUGOPALAN CHENICHERI VADAKKI) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]US5505080 (MCGHEE C LESTER [US]) [A] 9-15 * columns 8-11; figures 1,4,7 *; | [A]JP2009184461 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES) [A] 9-15 * figures 1-9 * | International search | [X]US7013931 (TOIT PIERRE DU [ZA]); | [Y]WO0236369 (INT TRUCK INTELLECTUAL PROP CO [US]) |