EP2872482 - A METHOD OF TREATING BREAST CANCERS WITH SELECTIVE ANDROGEN RECEPTOR MODULATOR (SARM) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2015/21] | A METHOD OF TREATING ANDROGEN RECEPTOR (AR)-POSITIVE BREAST CANCERS WITH SELECTIVE ANDROGEN RECEPTOR MODULATOR (SARMS) | ||
[2020/07] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.05.2021 Database last updated on 05.05.2025 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.06.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.02.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oncternal Therapeutics, Inc. 3525 Del Mar Heights Road Suite 821 San Diego, CA 92130-2122 / US | [2019/40] |
Former [2015/21] | For all designated states GTx, Inc. 175 Toyota Plaza, 7th Floor Memphis TN 38103 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DALTON, James, T. 9896 Rue Bienville Place Lakeland, TN 38002 / US | 02 /
STEINER, Mitchell, S. 2600 Forest-hill Irene Road Germantown, TN 38139 / US | 03 /
NARAYANAN, Ramesh 487 Herring Lane Cordova, TN 38018 / US | 04 /
AHN, Sunjoo 5395 Bentley Place Memphis, TN 38120 / US | [2015/21] | Representative(s) | Pearl Cohen Zedek Latzer Baratz UK LLP The Gridiron Building One Pancras Square London N1C 4AG / GB | [2020/28] |
Former [2015/21] | Pearl Cohen Zedek Latzer Baratz UK LLP The Gridiron Building One Pancras Square London N1C 4AG / GB | Application number, filing date | 13817231.7 | 07.03.2013 | [2020/28] | WO2013US29667 | Priority number, date | US201261671366P | 13.07.2012 Original published format: US 201261671366 P | US201261726274P | 14.11.2012 Original published format: US 201261726274 P | [2015/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2014011220 | Date: | 16.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/03] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2872482 | Date: | 20.05.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.01.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2872482 | Date: | 08.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.03.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.02.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/167, A61K31/325, A61P35/04, A61P35/00 | [2020/07] | CPC: |
A61K31/167 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K31/165 (IL,RU);
C07C271/02 (IL,KR,US);
A61K31/325 (IL,KR,US);
A61K45/06 (IL,KR,US);
A61P15/00 (EP,IL);
A61P15/14 (EP,IL);
A61P19/10 (EP,IL);
A61P35/00 (EP,IL,RU);
|
Former IPC [2016/12] | A01N37/34, A61K31/167, A61K31/325, A61P35/00, A61P35/04 | ||
Former IPC [2015/49] | A01N37/34 | ||
Former IPC [2015/21] | C07C271/02, A61K31/325, A61K45/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON BRUSTKREBSEN MIT SELEKTIVEM ANDROGENREZEPTORMODULATOR (SARM) | [2020/07] | English: | A METHOD OF TREATING BREAST CANCERS WITH SELECTIVE ANDROGEN RECEPTOR MODULATOR (SARM) | [2020/07] | French: | MÉTHODE DE TRAITEMENT DU CANCER DU SEIN AVEC UN MODULATEUR SÉLECTIF DES RÉCEPTEURS ANDROGÈNES (SARM) | [2020/07] |
Former [2015/21] | VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON ANDROGENREZEPTOR (AR)-POSITIVEM BRUSTKREBS MIT SELEKTIVEM ANDROGENREZEPTORMODULATOR (SARMS) | ||
Former [2015/21] | A METHOD OF TREATING ANDROGEN RECEPTOR (AR)-POSITIVE BREAST CANCERS WITH SELECTIVE ANDROGEN RECEPTOR MODULATOR (SARMS) | ||
Former [2015/21] | MÉTHODE DE TRAITEMENT DU CANCER DU SEIN POSITIF AUX RÉCEPTEURS ANDROGÈNES (AR+) AVEC MODULATEUR SÉLECTIF DES RÉCEPTEURS ANDROGÈNES (SARM) | Entry into regional phase | 14.01.2015 | National basic fee paid | 14.01.2015 | Search fee paid | 14.01.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.01.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/21] | 23.09.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.03.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 04.06.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.12.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.06.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 02.06.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.06.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP20179413.8 / EP3733170 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.11.2018 | Opposition(s) | 09.04.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 08.07.2020 | EE | 08.07.2020 | LV | 08.07.2020 | MK | 08.07.2020 | MT | 08.07.2020 | RS | 08.07.2020 | SI | 08.07.2020 | SK | 08.07.2020 | SM | 08.07.2020 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | AL | 08.07.2020 | |
EE | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
MK | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
SI | 08.07.2020 | ||
SK | 08.07.2020 | ||
SM | 08.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 08.07.2020 | |
EE | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
SI | 08.07.2020 | ||
SK | 08.07.2020 | ||
SM | 08.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 08.07.2020 | |
EE | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
SK | 08.07.2020 | ||
SM | 08.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 08.07.2020 | |
EE | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
SM | 08.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/23] | EE | 08.07.2020 | |
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
SM | 08.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | EE | 08.07.2020 | |
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/13] | LV | 08.07.2020 | |
RS | 08.07.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO2004064747 (GTX INC [US], et al); | [XY]US2005137172 (DALTON JAMES T [US], et al); | [XY]US2010249228 (DALTON JAMES T [US], et al); | International search | [Y]US2004167103 (DALTON JAMES T [US], et al); | [X]US2005209320 (MILLER DUANE D [US], et al); | [X]US2008076828 (DALTON JAMES T [US], et al); | [Y]WO2011050353 (HEALTH RESEARCH INC [US], et al); | [Y]US2011150979 (RAY PARTHA S [US], et al); | by applicant | WO2004064747 | US2004167103 | US2005137172 | US2005209320 | US2008076828 | US2010249228 |