EP2873855 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PREVENTING EXCESSIVE WEAR IN GEAR ASSEMBLIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2015/21] | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PREVENTING EXCESSIVE WASTE IN GEAR ASSEMBLIES | ||
[2019/50] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.05.2021 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.12.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.04.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.06.2021 [2021/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Universitat Politècnica De Catalunya C/ Jordi Girona 31 Til·lers planta 1 08034 Barcelona / ES | [2015/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CASALS TERRÉ, Jasmina C/ Jordi Girona 31 Edificio Til·lers primera planta E-08034 Barcelona / ES | 02 /
FARRÈ LLADÓS, Josep C/ Jordi Girona 31 Edificio Til·lers primera planta E-08034 Barcelona / ES | [2015/21] | Representative(s) | Juncosa Miró, Jaime, et al Torner, Juncosa i Associats, S.L. C/Pau Claris, 108, 1r 1a 08009 Barcelona / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2015/21] | Juncosa Miro, Jaime, et al Torner, Juncosa i Associates, S.L. Gran Via de les Corts Catalanes, 669 bis, 1º, 2ª 08013 Barcelona / ES | Application number, filing date | 13817420.6 | 09.07.2013 | WO2013ES70494 | Priority number, date | ES20120031081 | 10.07.2012 Original published format: ES 201231081 | [2015/21] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014009588 | Date: | 16.01.2014 | Language: | ES | [2014/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2873855 | Date: | 20.05.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | ES | 16.01.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | F16H57/04 | [2016/16] | CPC: |
F16H57/0456 (EP,US);
F16H55/17 (EP,US);
F16H57/043 (US);
F16H57/0431 (EP,US);
F16H57/0493 (EP,US);
F05B2260/98 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/21] | F03D11/00, F16H57/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/21] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERHINDERUNG VON ÜBERMÄSSIGEM VERSCHLEISS BEI GETRIEBEANORDNUNGEN | [2019/50] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PREVENTING EXCESSIVE WEAR IN GEAR ASSEMBLIES | [2019/50] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF POUR EMPÊCHER L'USURE EXCESSIVE DANS LES ENGRENAGES | [2015/21] |
Former [2015/21] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERHINDERUNG VON ÜBERMÄSSIGER VERSCHWENDUNG BEI GETRIEBEANORDNUNGEN | ||
Former [2015/21] | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PREVENTING EXCESSIVE WASTE IN GEAR ASSEMBLIES | Entry into regional phase | 14.01.2015 | Translation filed | 13.01.2015 | National basic fee paid | 13.01.2015 | Search fee paid | 13.01.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.01.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/21] | 03.10.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.01.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.04.2020 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 17.12.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.02.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/26] | 24.02.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2021/26] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.01.2020 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2020 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE20010377U (DEFONTAINE LA BRUFFIERE [FR]) [Y] 8 * page 14; figure 7 *; | [XY]JP2004225768 (KOYO SEIKO CO) [X] 1,4 * figure 3 * [Y] 8; | [A]EP1813839 (HONEYWELL INT INC [US]) [A] 1-8* the whole document * | International search | [A]JPS5614657 (JAPAN NATIONAL RAILWAY); | [A]FR2550599 (FOUEILLASSAR JEAN MARIE [FR]); | [A]EP1764544 (BAIER & KOEPPEL GMBH & CO [DE]); | [A]WO2012048711 (VESTAS WIND SYS AS [DK], et al) | by applicant | EP1764544 | WO2008074320 | CA2655691 | US7699584 | US2011142617 | US2011138951 | - BAIER; KOPPEL, PRODUCT SPECIFICATIONS, (20120507), URL: www.beka lube.de |