EP2938915 - SEALING ELEMENT AND ARRANGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.12.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.12.2016 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wärtsilä Finland Oy Tarhaajantie 2 65380 Vaasa / FI | [2015/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRANLUND, Ulf Tranbärsvägen 5 65320 Vasa / FI | [2015/45] | Representative(s) | Berggren Oy, Helsinki & Oulu P.O. Box 16 Eteläinen Rautatiekatu 10A 00101 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2017/05] | Berggren Oy P.O. Box 16 Eteläinen Rautatiekatu 10A 00101 Helsinki / FI | ||
Former [2015/45] | Berggren Oy Ab P.O. Box 16 Eteläinen Rautatiekatu 10A 00101 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 13817701.9 | 19.12.2013 | [2015/45] | WO2013FI51185 | Priority number, date | FI20120006394 | 31.12.2012 Original published format: FI 20126394 | [2015/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014102453 | Date: | 03.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2938915 | Date: | 04.11.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.07.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2938915 | Date: | 01.02.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.07.2014 | Classification | IPC: | F16L39/00, F16L41/08 | [2016/37] | CPC: |
F16L39/00 (EP,CN);
F16L41/08 (FI);
F16J15/002 (FI);
F16L41/086 (EP,CN,FI);
F16L41/088 (FI);
F16L41/12 (FI)
|
Former IPC [2015/45] | F16L41/12, F16J15/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/45] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DICHTELEMENT UND -ANORDNUNG | [2015/45] | English: | SEALING ELEMENT AND ARRANGEMENT | [2015/45] | French: | ELÉMENT ET SYSTÈME D'ÉTANCHÉITÉ | [2015/45] | Entry into regional phase | 18.06.2015 | National basic fee paid | 18.06.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.06.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.10.2014 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.06.2015 | Examination requested [2015/45] | 21.09.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.12.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 15.12.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.12.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.09.2016 | Opposition(s) | 03.11.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.12.2013 | AL | 01.02.2017 | AT | 01.02.2017 | CY | 01.02.2017 | CZ | 01.02.2017 | DK | 01.02.2017 | EE | 01.02.2017 | ES | 01.02.2017 | FI | 01.02.2017 | HR | 01.02.2017 | LT | 01.02.2017 | LV | 01.02.2017 | MC | 01.02.2017 | MK | 01.02.2017 | PL | 01.02.2017 | RO | 01.02.2017 | RS | 01.02.2017 | SE | 01.02.2017 | SI | 01.02.2017 | SK | 01.02.2017 | SM | 01.02.2017 | TR | 01.02.2017 | BG | 01.05.2017 | NO | 01.05.2017 | GR | 02.05.2017 | IS | 01.06.2017 | PT | 01.06.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 19.12.2013 | |
AT | 01.02.2017 | ||
CY | 01.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.02.2017 | ||
DK | 01.02.2017 | ||
EE | 01.02.2017 | ||
ES | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
HR | 01.02.2017 | ||
LT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LV | 01.02.2017 | ||
MC | 01.02.2017 | ||
MK | 01.02.2017 | ||
PL | 01.02.2017 | ||
RO | 01.02.2017 | ||
RS | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 01.02.2017 | ||
SI | 01.02.2017 | ||
SK | 01.02.2017 | ||
SM | 01.02.2017 | ||
TR | 01.02.2017 | ||
BG | 01.05.2017 | ||
NO | 01.05.2017 | ||
GR | 02.05.2017 | ||
IS | 01.06.2017 | ||
PT | 01.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/52] | HU | 19.12.2013 | |
AT | 01.02.2017 | ||
CY | 01.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.02.2017 | ||
DK | 01.02.2017 | ||
EE | 01.02.2017 | ||
ES | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
HR | 01.02.2017 | ||
LT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LV | 01.02.2017 | ||
MC | 01.02.2017 | ||
MK | 01.02.2017 | ||
PL | 01.02.2017 | ||
RO | 01.02.2017 | ||
RS | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 01.02.2017 | ||
SI | 01.02.2017 | ||
SK | 01.02.2017 | ||
SM | 01.02.2017 | ||
BG | 01.05.2017 | ||
NO | 01.05.2017 | ||
GR | 02.05.2017 | ||
IS | 01.06.2017 | ||
PT | 01.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 19.12.2013 | |
AT | 01.02.2017 | ||
CY | 01.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.02.2017 | ||
DK | 01.02.2017 | ||
EE | 01.02.2017 | ||
ES | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
HR | 01.02.2017 | ||
LT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LV | 01.02.2017 | ||
MC | 01.02.2017 | ||
PL | 01.02.2017 | ||
RO | 01.02.2017 | ||
RS | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 01.02.2017 | ||
SI | 01.02.2017 | ||
SK | 01.02.2017 | ||
SM | 01.02.2017 | ||
BG | 01.05.2017 | ||
NO | 01.05.2017 | ||
GR | 02.05.2017 | ||
IS | 01.06.2017 | ||
PT | 01.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 19.12.2013 | |
AT | 01.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.02.2017 | ||
DK | 01.02.2017 | ||
EE | 01.02.2017 | ||
ES | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
HR | 01.02.2017 | ||
LT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LV | 01.02.2017 | ||
MC | 01.02.2017 | ||
PL | 01.02.2017 | ||
RO | 01.02.2017 | ||
RS | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 01.02.2017 | ||
SI | 01.02.2017 | ||
SK | 01.02.2017 | ||
SM | 01.02.2017 | ||
BG | 01.05.2017 | ||
NO | 01.05.2017 | ||
GR | 02.05.2017 | ||
IS | 01.06.2017 | ||
PT | 01.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 01.02.2017 | |
CZ | 01.02.2017 | ||
DK | 01.02.2017 | ||
EE | 01.02.2017 | ||
ES | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
HR | 01.02.2017 | ||
LT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LV | 01.02.2017 | ||
MC | 01.02.2017 | ||
PL | 01.02.2017 | ||
RO | 01.02.2017 | ||
RS | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 01.02.2017 | ||
SI | 01.02.2017 | ||
SK | 01.02.2017 | ||
SM | 01.02.2017 | ||
BG | 01.05.2017 | ||
NO | 01.05.2017 | ||
GR | 02.05.2017 | ||
IS | 01.06.2017 | ||
PT | 01.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 01.02.2017 | |
CZ | 01.02.2017 | ||
DK | 01.02.2017 | ||
EE | 01.02.2017 | ||
ES | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
HR | 01.02.2017 | ||
LT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LV | 01.02.2017 | ||
PL | 01.02.2017 | ||
RO | 01.02.2017 | ||
RS | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 01.02.2017 | ||
SI | 01.02.2017 | ||
SK | 01.02.2017 | ||
SM | 01.02.2017 | ||
BG | 01.05.2017 | ||
NO | 01.05.2017 | ||
GR | 02.05.2017 | ||
IS | 01.06.2017 | ||
PT | 01.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 01.02.2017 | |
CZ | 01.02.2017 | ||
DK | 01.02.2017 | ||
EE | 01.02.2017 | ||
ES | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
HR | 01.02.2017 | ||
LT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LV | 01.02.2017 | ||
PL | 01.02.2017 | ||
RO | 01.02.2017 | ||
RS | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 01.02.2017 | ||
SK | 01.02.2017 | ||
SM | 01.02.2017 | ||
BG | 01.05.2017 | ||
NO | 01.05.2017 | ||
GR | 02.05.2017 | ||
IS | 01.06.2017 | ||
PT | 01.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 01.02.2017 | |
CZ | 01.02.2017 | ||
DK | 01.02.2017 | ||
EE | 01.02.2017 | ||
ES | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
HR | 01.02.2017 | ||
LT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LV | 01.02.2017 | ||
PL | 01.02.2017 | ||
RO | 01.02.2017 | ||
RS | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 01.02.2017 | ||
SK | 01.02.2017 | ||
BG | 01.05.2017 | ||
NO | 01.05.2017 | ||
GR | 02.05.2017 | ||
IS | 01.06.2017 | ||
PT | 01.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 01.02.2017 | |
CZ | 01.02.2017 | ||
EE | 01.02.2017 | ||
ES | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
HR | 01.02.2017 | ||
LT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LV | 01.02.2017 | ||
PL | 01.02.2017 | ||
RO | 01.02.2017 | ||
RS | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 01.02.2017 | ||
SK | 01.02.2017 | ||
BG | 01.05.2017 | ||
NO | 01.05.2017 | ||
GR | 02.05.2017 | ||
IS | 01.06.2017 | ||
PT | 01.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | AT | 01.02.2017 | |
CZ | 01.02.2017 | ||
ES | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
HR | 01.02.2017 | ||
LT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LV | 01.02.2017 | ||
PL | 01.02.2017 | ||
RS | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 01.02.2017 | ||
BG | 01.05.2017 | ||
NO | 01.05.2017 | ||
GR | 02.05.2017 | ||
IS | 01.06.2017 | ||
PT | 01.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | AT | 01.02.2017 | |
ES | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
HR | 01.02.2017 | ||
LT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LV | 01.02.2017 | ||
PL | 01.02.2017 | ||
RS | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 01.02.2017 | ||
BG | 01.05.2017 | ||
NO | 01.05.2017 | ||
GR | 02.05.2017 | ||
IS | 01.06.2017 | ||
PT | 01.06.2017 | Cited in | International search | [XAI]US4832511 (NISLEY DONALD L [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * column 1, line 6 - line 8 * * column 4, line 27 - line 23; figure - * [A] 9-12[I] 4-8 | by applicant | US5108132 | EP1909017 | CN201884831U |