EP3087375 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR OPTICALLY INSPECTING AND ANALYSING STENT-LIKE OBJECTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.02.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.02.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.03.2020 [2020/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sensofar Medical S.L. Parc Audiovisual de Catalunya Ctra. BV 1274 km. 1 08225 Terrassa / ES | [2016/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAGUARTA BERTRAN, Ferran Barri Bellavista C. Rossinyols 5 E-08241 Manresa / ES | 02 /
BERMÚDEZ PORRAS, Carlos C/ Santa Teresa Nen Jesús 34 E-08670 Navas / ES | 03 /
ARTIGAS PURSALS, Roger Can Puig de la Vall s/n E-08187 Santa Eulàlia De Ronçana / ES | 04 /
CADEVALL ARTIGUES, Cristina C. Prim 92 esc. D 4º 4ª E-08223 Terrassa / ES | [2016/44] | Representative(s) | ZBM Patents - Zea, Barlocci & Markvardsen Rambla de Catalunya, 123 08008 Barcelona / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2016/44] | ZBM Patents - Zea, Barlocci & Markvardsen Plaza Catalunya, 1 2nd floor 08002 Barcelona / ES | Application number, filing date | 13817942.9 | 27.12.2013 | [2016/44] | WO2013EP78085 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015096874 | Date: | 02.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3087375 | Date: | 02.11.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.07.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/952 | [2016/44] | CPC: |
G01N21/952 (EP,US);
G01B11/0675 (US);
G01B11/2408 (US);
G01N21/954 (US);
A61F2/82 (EP,US);
A61F2240/008 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/44] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR OPTISCHEN INSPEKTION UND ANALYSE VON STENTARTIGEN OBJEKTEN | [2016/44] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR OPTICALLY INSPECTING AND ANALYSING STENT-LIKE OBJECTS | [2016/44] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ POUR INSPECTER ET ANALYSER OPTIQUEMENT DES OBJETS DU TYPE STENT | [2016/44] | Entry into regional phase | 27.07.2016 | National basic fee paid | 27.07.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.07.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.07.2016 | Examination requested [2016/44] | 31.01.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.06.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.10.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/12] | 12.11.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/12] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.06.2019 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2019 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2001037694 (FREIFELD DANIEL [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0045] *; | [A]US6690473 (STANKE FRED E [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract ** column 25, line 4; claim 2 *; | [I]US2010309307 (JIN JU [US]) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0055] *; | [ID]US8237789 (MAEHRINGER-KUNZ EDGAR [DE], et al) [ID] 1-15 * abstract * * column 3, line 52 - line 65 * * column 5, lines 4-7 - lines 50-55 * |