EP2909084 - PROPULSION SYSTEM FOR VESSELS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.10.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL, IS | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Scana Volda AS P.O. Box 205 6101 Volda / NO | For all designated states Inpower AS Britvn. 4 6411 Molde / NO | [2015/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRAUTASET, Henning Åmdal N-6150 Ørsta / NO | 02 /
HÅVIK, Roald Hoeydalsvegen 1413 N-6110 Austefjord / NO | [2016/48] |
Former [2015/35] | 01 /
BRAUTASET, Henning Åmdal N-6150 Ørsta / NO | ||
02 /
HÅVIK, Roald N-6110 Austefjord / NO | Representative(s) | Onsagers AS P.O. Box 1813 Vika 0123 Oslo / NO | [2015/35] | Application number, filing date | 13817984.1 | 18.10.2013 | [2015/35] | WO2013IB59441 | Priority number, date | NO20120001215 | 18.10.2012 Original published format: NO 20121215 | [2015/35] | Filing language | NO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014060994 | Date: | 24.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2909084 | Date: | 26.08.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.04.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2909084 | Date: | 30.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.04.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B63H3/08, B63H21/17 | [2015/35] | CPC: |
B63H3/082 (EP,NO,US);
B63H21/17 (NO,US);
B63H21/386 (NO,US);
B63H23/06 (NO,US);
B63H23/24 (EP,NO,US);
H02K7/003 (NO,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/35] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANTRIEBSSYSTEM FÜR WASSERFAHRZEUGE | [2015/35] | English: | PROPULSION SYSTEM FOR VESSELS | [2015/35] | French: | SYSTÈME DE PROPULSION POUR DES VAISSEAUX | [2015/35] | Entry into regional phase | 06.05.2015 | National basic fee paid | 06.05.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.05.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.08.2014 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.05.2015 | Examination requested [2015/35] | 11.12.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.05.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.09.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 08.09.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.09.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.05.2016 | Opposition(s) | 31.08.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.10.2013 | AL | 30.11.2016 | AT | 30.11.2016 | BE | 30.11.2016 | CY | 30.11.2016 | CZ | 30.11.2016 | EE | 30.11.2016 | LT | 30.11.2016 | LV | 30.11.2016 | MC | 30.11.2016 | MK | 30.11.2016 | RS | 30.11.2016 | SI | 30.11.2016 | SK | 30.11.2016 | SM | 30.11.2016 | BG | 28.02.2017 | NO | 28.02.2017 | IS | 30.03.2017 | PT | 30.03.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2019/52] | HU | 18.10.2013 | |
AT | 30.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CY | 30.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
MC | 30.11.2016 | ||
MK | 30.11.2016 | ||
RS | 30.11.2016 | ||
SI | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
SM | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 28.02.2017 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 18.10.2013 | |
AT | 30.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CY | 30.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
MC | 30.11.2016 | ||
RS | 30.11.2016 | ||
SI | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
SM | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 28.02.2017 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 18.10.2013 | |
AT | 30.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
MC | 30.11.2016 | ||
RS | 30.11.2016 | ||
SI | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
SM | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 28.02.2017 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/30] | AT | 30.11.2016 | |
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
MC | 30.11.2016 | ||
RS | 30.11.2016 | ||
SI | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
SM | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 28.02.2017 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | AT | 30.11.2016 | |
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
RS | 30.11.2016 | ||
SI | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
SM | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 28.02.2017 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 30.11.2016 | |
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
RS | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
SM | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 28.02.2017 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | AT | 30.11.2016 | |
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
RS | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/26] | AT | 30.11.2016 | |
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LV | 30.11.2016 | ||
RS | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 28.02.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 30.11.2016 | Cited in | International search | [YA]US3778187 (WENNBERG P) [Y] 3-5,12 * figures 1,6 * [A] 1,2,7-9; | [XY]JP2002145189 (AITOKU KK, et al) [X] 1,2,6-9,16 * figures 1-3 * [Y] 3-5,12-14; | [YA]DE102008018420 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [Y] 13 * figures 1-3 * [A] 1,6; | [YA]DE102009002265 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE]) [Y] 14 * figures 2,3,4 *[A] 1 |