EP3090087 - LAUNDRY WASHING MACHINE AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A LAUNDRY WASHING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.11.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU, MC | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Electrolux Appliances Aktiebolag S:t Göransgatan 143 105 45 Stockholm / SE | [2016/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZATTIN, Andrea Electrolux Italia S.p.A. Corso Lino Zanussi 30 I-33080 Porcia (PN) / IT | 02 /
STABON, Elisa Electrolux Italia S.p.A. Corso Lino Zanussi 30 I-33080 Porcia (PN) / IT | [2016/45] | Representative(s) | Electrolux Group Patents AB Electrolux Group Patents S:t Göransgatan 143 105 45 Stockholm / SE | [2023/23] |
Former [2016/45] | Electrolux Group Patents AB Electrolux Group Patents 105 45 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 13818234.0 | 30.12.2013 | [2016/45] | WO2013EP78133 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015101389 | Date: | 09.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3090087 | Date: | 09.11.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.07.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3090087 | Date: | 07.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | D06F39/00, // D06F34/28, D06F33/46, D06F101/20, D06F103/20, D06F105/02, D06F105/10, D06F105/42, D06F105/60 | [2022/49] | CPC: |
D06F39/007 (EP,US);
C02F1/42 (US);
D06F37/04 (US);
G05B19/0426 (US);
G05G1/08 (US);
C02F2101/10 (US);
C02F2303/22 (US);
C02F2307/12 (US);
D06F2101/20 (EP,US);
D06F2103/20 (EP,US);
D06F2105/02 (EP,US);
D06F2105/10 (EP,US);
D06F2105/42 (EP,US);
D06F2105/60 (EP,US);
D06F33/46 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/45] | D06F39/00, D06F33/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/45] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WÄSCHEWASCHMASCHINE UND VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG EINER WÄSCHEWASCHMASCHINE | [2016/45] | English: | LAUNDRY WASHING MACHINE AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A LAUNDRY WASHING MACHINE | [2016/45] | French: | MACHINE À LAVER LE LINGE ET PROCÉDÉ POUR COMMANDER UNE MACHINE À LAVER LE LINGE | [2016/45] | Entry into regional phase | 01.08.2016 | National basic fee paid | 01.08.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.08.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.08.2016 | Examination requested [2016/45] | 08.02.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.03.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 23.03.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.03.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.03.2021 | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 03.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 02.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.06.2023 | CZ | 07.06.2023 | DK | 07.06.2023 | EE | 07.06.2023 | ES | 07.06.2023 | FI | 07.06.2023 | HR | 07.06.2023 | LT | 07.06.2023 | LV | 07.06.2023 | MC | 07.06.2023 | NL | 07.06.2023 | RO | 07.06.2023 | RS | 07.06.2023 | SE | 07.06.2023 | SI | 07.06.2023 | SK | 07.06.2023 | SM | 07.06.2023 | NO | 07.09.2023 | GR | 08.09.2023 | IS | 07.10.2023 | PT | 09.10.2023 | LU | 30.12.2023 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/24] | AT | 07.06.2023 | |
CZ | 07.06.2023 | ||
DK | 07.06.2023 | ||
EE | 07.06.2023 | ||
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
FI | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
NL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
SI | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
PT | 09.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 07.06.2023 | |
CZ | 07.06.2023 | ||
DK | 07.06.2023 | ||
EE | 07.06.2023 | ||
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
FI | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
NL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
PT | 09.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 07.06.2023 | |
CZ | 07.06.2023 | ||
EE | 07.06.2023 | ||
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
FI | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
NL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
PT | 09.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 07.06.2023 | |
CZ | 07.06.2023 | ||
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
FI | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
NL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
FI | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
NL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
FI | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
NL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
NL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/52] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
NL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 07.06.2023 | Cited in | International search | [XAYI]EP1085118 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [X] 1-7,13-15,24,26 * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0015] - [0027] - [0051] - [0054] - [0125] - [0127]; claim - * [A] 8-12,16,17 [Y] 25 [I] 18-23; | [YDA]WO2006079417 (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al) [YD] 25 * claim - * [A] 1-24,26; | [XAI]WO2011080241 (ARCELIK AS [TR], et al) [X] 1,13,14,16,17,24,26 * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0009] , [0018] - [0025]; figure -; claim - * [A] 2-4,6-12,15,23,25 [I] 5,18-22; | [A]EP2657387 (ELECTROLUX HOME PROD CORP [BE]) [A] 1-26* paragraphs [0001] , [0032] - [0039] - [0045] , [0050] , [0109] - [0111]; figure -; claim - * |