10.07.2020 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] |
27.02.2020 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
06.02.2020 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
11.09.2019 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
29.04.2019 |
Change - representative |
|
04.01.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.02.2018 |
Change - applicant |
published on 14.03.2018 [2018/11] |
03.01.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.03.2017 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
03.01.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.11.2016 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
04.11.2016 |
First examination report |
|
29.02.2016 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
29.02.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.02.2016 |
Change - extension states |
published on 23.03.2016 [2016/12] |
04.02.2016 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
18.09.2015 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 21.10.2015 [2015/43] |
18.09.2015 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 21.10.2015 [2015/43] |
22.07.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.07.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.06.2015 |
Change - representative |
|
05.06.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.06.2015 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
27.06.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.06.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.01.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|